Jones v. Mohave, County of et al

Plaintiff: James Luther Jones, Jr.
Defendant: Mohave, County of and Carol Meier
Case Number: 3:2011cv08093
Filed: June 14, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: Mohave
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 2, 2012 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 45 Plaintiff's Motion to Set Aside Judgment; denying 46 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions; denying 47 Plaintiff's Motion to Disqualify Judge. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 11/2/12.(TLJ)
June 22, 2012 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 29 ) is granted. This case is dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment accordingly. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all other pending motions (Doc. 34 , Doc. 36 , Doc. 37 ) are denied as moot. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 6/22/2012.(KMG)
January 11, 2012 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 14 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint no later than 21 days from the date of this Order. The Clerk shall dismiss this case with prejudice if Plaintiff fails to comply. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying as moot 8 and 11 Motions for Summary Judgment for Writ of Execution and denying 21 Plaintiff's Motion for Evidentiary Hearing and Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 1/11/12.(LSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Mohave, County of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Luther Jones, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohave, County of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Meier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?