Taylor et al v. Zurich American Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Martha Taylor, Thomas Thomson and Kayci Thomson
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company, Zurich American Insurance Company of Illinois and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 3:2011cv08110
Filed: July 8, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: Mohave
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 1, 2013 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 69 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. Plaintiff shall file the amended complaint within seven (7) days of the date of this Order. FURTHER ORDERED extending discovery deadline to 7/8/2013 and extending dispositive motion deadline to 7/29/2013. Due to the age of this case, there will be NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS of these deadlines. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 4/1/2013.(TLB)
October 18, 2012 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendant's motion for summary judgment (Doc. 56 ) is granted to the extent that the Court finds that the insurance policy in this case is subject to ERISA, and accordingly, all state law based claims in the complaint are preempted by ERISA; therefore Defendant is entitled to judgment on all Plaintiffs' state law based claims. However, the Clerk of the Court shall not enter judgment at this time. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs have 20 days from the date of this Order to file a motion to amend the complaint, as specified above. If Plaintiffs fail to move to amend within 20 days, the Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment for Defendant, Plaintiffs to take nothing. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 10/18/2012.(KMG)
September 2, 2011 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the 8 Motion to Dismiss Defendant Zurich American Insurance Company of Illinois is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court shall dismiss Defendant Zurich American Insurance Company of Illinois from this action with prejudice. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 09/02/11. (ESL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor et al v. Zurich American Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Taylor
Represented By: Douglas Dean Sutherland, IV
Represented By: Edward P Moriarity
Represented By: Bradley L Booke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Thomson
Represented By: Edward P Moriarity
Represented By: Bradley L Booke
Represented By: Douglas Dean Sutherland, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kayci Thomson
Represented By: Bradley L Booke
Represented By: Edward P Moriarity
Represented By: Douglas Dean Sutherland, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company
Represented By: Bradley Joseph Baumgart
Represented By: Philip Ashley Overcash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company of Illinois
Represented By: Bradley Joseph Baumgart
Represented By: Philip Ashley Overcash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?