White v. Lindermen et al

Plaintiff: Demetrius M White
Defendant: E White, Mike Lindermen, Nick Desmond and Charles L Ryan
Case Number: 3:2011cv08152
Filed: September 29, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: Cochise
Referring Judge: Edward C Voss (PS)
Presiding Judge: Robert C Broomfield
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 28, 2014 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 80 Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 3/28/14.(MAP)
March 6, 2014 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 81 Motion to Seal. ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement and the Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement, shall be filed Under Seal. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 3/5/14.(MAP)
January 15, 2014 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER pursuant to the parties' 78 Stipulation of Dismissal: dismissing this action with prejudice. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 1/13/2014. (KMG)
October 28, 2013 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 72 Motion for Enlargement of the Deadline to File a Proposed Joint Final Pretrial Order. ORDERED that the deadline for the parties to lodge a Proposed Joint Final Pretrial Order is enlarged for thirty (30) days after the Settlement Conference in this matter if a Proposed Joint Final Pretrial Order is still necessary. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 10/28/2013.(TLB)
August 28, 2013 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn and the parties shall lodge a Proposed Joint Final Pretrial Order no later than October 28, 2013. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 8/28/13. (LSP)
August 22, 2013 68 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER - The reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 48 ). The motion (Doc. 48) is granted as to Plaintiff's requests for damages under RLUIPA and moratory damages; the remainder of the motion is denied. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 8/20/2013. (KMG)
August 20, 2013 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER The reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 48 ). The motion (Doc. 48) is granted as to Plaintiff's requests for damages under RLUIPA and moratory damages; the remainder of the motion is denied. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 8/20/2013.(KMG)
October 18, 2012 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the reference is withdrawn as to Plaintiff's Motion for Injunction or Temporary Restraining Order (Doc. 30 ), and the motion is denied. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 10/18/2012.(KMG)
November 30, 2011 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The portion of Count One that alleges a violation of the Religious Freedom Restoration Act, and Counts Three and Four, are dismissed without prejudice. Defendants Ryan and White are dismissed without prejudice. Defendants Desmond and Linderma n must answer Counts One and Two. The Clerk of Court must send Plaintiff a service packet including the First Amended Complaint (Doc. 12), this Order, and both summons and request for waiver forms for Defendants Desmond and Linderman. Plaintiff must complete and return the service packet to the Clerk of Court within 21 days of the date of filing of this Order. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Edward C. Voss for all pretrial proceedings as authorized under 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1). Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 11/29/11. (ESL)
October 28, 2011 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Demetrius M. White. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 10/28/11. (ESL)
October 5, 2011 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Plaintiff must either pay the $350.00 filing fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and a certified six-month trust account statement. If Plaintiff fails to comply, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice to Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 10/05/11. (ESL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. Lindermen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Lindermen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nick Desmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles L Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demetrius M White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?