Gordon v. Ryan et al

Plaintiff: Dante Shon Gordon
Defendant: Darla Elliot, Charles L Ryan and Robert Poland
Case Number: 3:2011cv08153
Filed: October 6, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: Mohave
Referring Judge: Jay R Irwin (PS)
Presiding Judge: Paul G Rosenblatt
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 29, 2012 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Having reviewed the Magistrate Judge's R & R, and no objections having been filed by any party thereto, the court hereby incorporates and adopts the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation in its entirety (Doc. 26 ). In accordance therewith, IT IS ORDERED that pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4(m), the claims as against defendants Darla Elliot and Robert Pollard are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 11/28/2012. (KMG)
August 28, 2012 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER The reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 18). Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 18 ) is granted. Count I is dismissed without prejudice for failure to exhaust; in the alternative, it is dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Local Rule of Civil Procedure 7.2(i). Count II against Pollard and Elliott remains. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 8/28/2012.(KMG)
July 2, 2012 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 16 Report and Recommendation - Consistent with the foregoing authority, and no objections having been filed by any party thereto, the court has not engaged in a de novo review; and instead, the court having "satisf[ied] itself that t here is no clear error on the face of the record[,]" hereby ACCEPTS, ADOPTS AND INCORPORATES BY REFERENCE in its entirety, as if fully set forth herein, the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation (Doc. 16). See FED.R.CIV.P. 72, Advisory Committee Notes, 1983 Addition. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 7/2/2012. (KMG)
April 27, 2012 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (Service Packet), Counts II and III and Defendants Ryan and Elliott are dismissed without prejudice. Defendant Polland must answer Count I. The Clerk of Court must send Plaintiff a service packet including the Complaint (Doc. 1), this Order, an d both summons and request for waiver forms for Defendant Polland. Plaintiff must complete and return the service packet to the Clerk of Court within 21 days of the date of filing of this Order. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge James F. Metcalf pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for all pretrial proceedings as authorized under 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1). Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 4/26/2012. (KMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gordon v. Ryan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darla Elliot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles L Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Poland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dante Shon Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?