Lowry et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank NA et al

Plaintiff: Gary F Lowry and Marian Carol
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank NA and JPMorgan Chase & Company
Case Number: 3:2011cv08177
Filed: November 10, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: Yavapai
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 2, 2016 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 78 Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction. ORDERED that Defendants may proceed with a trustee's sale and foreclosure of Plaintiffs' property in accordance with all applicable laws. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 12/1/16.(EJA)
May 27, 2015 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 69 Defendants' Motion to Quash Stay. ORDERED that the stay entered on 4/23/2015 (Doc. 58) and made subject to the posting of a bond (Doc. 62) is VACATED. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants may proceed with a trustee's sale and foreclosure of Plaintiffs' residence in accordance with all applicable laws. See attached Order. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 5/27/2015.(TLB)
May 20, 2015 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 63 Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration, captioned as "Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction." See attached Order. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 5/20/2015.(TLB)
May 8, 2015 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 46 Plaintiffs' Motion and Request for Preliminary Injunction. ORDERED that the stay previously ordered by the Court is subject to the following: (1) Plaintiffs shall post a bond with the Clerk of the Court in the amoun t of $2,000.00 by 8:15 A.M., Thursday, 5/14/2015 and (2) Plaintiffs shall post another bond in the same amount on the 14th of each month thereafter (or the following Monday if the 14th falls on a weekend or holiday). If Plaintiffs fail to comply with these bond requirements, defendants may petition the Court to quash the stay. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 5/7/2015.(TLB)
March 6, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiffs' 31 Motion to Stay is denied as moot. ORDERED that Defendants' 25 Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint is granted. The Clerk of Court shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 3/5/2013.(LFIG)
August 8, 2012 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiffs' 9 Motion to Remand to State Court and denying Defendants' 14 Motion to Strike. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED granting Defendants' 6 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs shall file an amended complaint within 20 da ys of the date of this Order. If Plaintiffs fail to comply, the Clerk of Court shall dismiss this case with prejudice without further notice and enter judgment for Defendants. ORDERED denying Plaintiffs' 22 Motion for Status of Case as moot. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 8/8/2012.(LFIG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lowry et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary F Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marian Carol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank NA
Represented By: Douglas Cameron Erickson
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Reiter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase & Company
Represented By: Douglas Cameron Erickson
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Reiter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?