Vicente v. Prescott, City of et al

Plaintiff: John Paul Vicente
Defendant: Steven Norwood, Unknown Norwood, Laurie Hadley, Unknown Hadley, Unknown Parties, Unknown Kuykendall, Bruce Martinez, Unknown Martinez, Donald Devendorf, Unknown Devendorf, Mary Jacobsen, Unknown Jacobsen, Marlin Kuykendall, Prescott, City of and Prescott Fire Department
Case Number: 3:2011cv08204
Filed: December 16, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: Yavapai
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 13, 2014 252 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER re: 251 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Sanctions, Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, Order on Motion to Compel. Counsel shall take note that this amended order modifies footnote 8 and eliminates footnote 10 in the original order entered 8/8/2014.. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/13/2014. (DGC, nvo)
August 8, 2014 251 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 204 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 206 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 216 Motion for Sanctions; finding as moot 236 Motion to Strike ; finding as moot 242 Motion to Amend/Correct; finding as moot 243 Motion to Amend/Correct; granting 244 Motion to Compel. The Court will set a final pretrial conference by separate order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/8/2014.(DGC, nvo)
April 3, 2014 208 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 184 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/3/2014.(DGC, nvo)
June 27, 2013 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 76 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction as to defendant Public Safety Personnel Retirement System. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/27/2013.(TCA)
November 21, 2012 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 39 Motion to Join Indispensable Party; granting 39 Motion to Amend/Correct: Defendants shall file their amended answer on or before November 28, 2012. Plaintiff's spouse is joined as a Plaintiff for purposes of any eventual award of fees and costs, and the Board is joined as a Defendant for purposes of injunctive relief only. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/21/12.(SJF)
April 26, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/26/2012.(NVO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vicente v. Prescott, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Norwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Norwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurie Hadley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Hadley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Kuykendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Devendorf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Devendorf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Jacobsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Jacobsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marlin Kuykendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prescott, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prescott Fire Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Paul Vicente
Represented By: Michael William Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?