Larsgard v. Unknown Parties

Plaintiff: Liv H Larsgard
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Case Number: 3:2012cv08013
Filed: January 24, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 5, 2012 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 26 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying 30 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; granting 31 Motion for clarification. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/5/2012.(NVO)
September 13, 2012 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's motion to extend time (Doc. 23 ) is granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiff shall file her second amended complaint on or before October 12, 2012. This case has been pending for nearly a year without any forward progress. Therefore, the Court is not inclined to grant further extensions in this case absent truly extraordinary circumstances. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/13/2012.(KMG)
August 28, 2012 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER The Winslow Defendants' motion to dismiss (Doc. 15 ) is granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiff's claim against Winslow (Claim Two) is dismissed without prejudice. Defendant Mendoza's motion to dismiss (Doc. 16 ) is grant ed. Plaintiff's intentional infliction of emotional distress claim against Defendant Mendoza (Claim Three) is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff may file a second amended complaint on or before September 7, 2012. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/27/2012.(KMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Larsgard v. Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liv H Larsgard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?