Kuc v. BAC Home Loans Servicing LP et al

Plaintiff: Anthony J Kuc, Jr.
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Incorporated, BAC Home Loans Servicing LP, Bank of America, Saxon Mortgage Services Incorporated and Old Republic National Title Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2012cv08024
Filed: February 8, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: Mohave
Presiding Judge: Frederick J Martone
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 23, 2012 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 31 Bank of America, N.A., Bank of America Corp., and MERS' Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens. That the lis pendens pertaining to real property located in Mohave County at 5804 Kingman Reef Lane in Kingman, Arizona and recorded at docket 2012002538 is EXPUNGED. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 8/22/12.(DMT)
May 22, 2012 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 23 Plaintiff's Motion to Disqualify Judge; denying 24 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 5/21/12.(DMT)
April 16, 2012 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 9 plaintiff's motion to remand. Granting Bank of America, N.A., Bank of America Corp., and MERS's motion to dismiss 6 . Granting Old Republic's motion to dismiss 7 ). The action is dismissed against all defendants. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 4/16/12.(DMT)
April 4, 2012 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Plaintiff's motions 13 for entry of default against MERS, 14 Old Republic National Title Insurance, 15 BAC Home Loans Servicing, and 16 Saxon Mortgage Service. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 4/4/12. (see order for full details)(DMT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kuc v. BAC Home Loans Servicing LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Incorporated
Represented By: Cara Molly Louise Eskay
Represented By: Sean Keenan McElenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAC Home Loans Servicing LP
Represented By: Sean Keenan McElenney
Represented By: Cara Molly Louise Eskay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America
Represented By: Sean Keenan McElenney
Represented By: Cara Molly Louise Eskay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saxon Mortgage Services Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Republic National Title Insurance Company
Represented By: Eric Lawrence Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony J Kuc, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?