Grand Canyon Skywalk Development LLC v. 'Sa' Nyu Wa Incorporated et al

Plaintiff: Grand Canyon Skywalk Development LLC
Defendant: Duane Yellowhawk, Jaci Dugan, 'Sa' Nyu Wa Incorporated, Grand Canyon Resort Corporation, Richard Walerma, Sr., Wynona Sinyella, Ruby Steele, Candida Hunter, Barney Rocky Imus, Waylon Honga, Charles Vaughn, Sr. and Wanda Easter
Case Number: 3:2012cv08030
Filed: February 16, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 21, 2012 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 63 SNW's Motion for Transfer. The Clerk shall transfer Case No. CV-12-8183-FJM to this Court. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/21/12.(TLJ)
March 26, 2012 58 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER re 54 Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Motion for TRO. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/26/2012. (NVO)
March 19, 2012 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Plaintiff's Complaint is stayed in the interest of requiring Plaintiff to exhaust tribal court remedies; Plaintiff's motion for an emergency TRO 4 is denied; Defendant's motion to strike 40 is denied as moot; Defendants Louise Benson, Jolene Cooney Marshall, and Sheri Yellowhawk are dismissed; the Parties shall file a joint status report, not to exceed ten pages, by 9/10/12. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/19/12.(REW)
February 28, 2012 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. The parties shall provide additional briefing, not to exceed 10 pages each, on the applicability of the bad faith exception no later than the close of business on 3/1/2012. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/28/2012. (NVO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grand Canyon Skywalk Development LLC v. 'Sa' Nyu Wa Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duane Yellowhawk
Represented By: Paul Kipp Charlton
Represented By: Jeffrey David Gross
Represented By: Glen Carlton Hallman
Represented By: Christopher William Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaci Dugan
Represented By: Paul Kipp Charlton
Represented By: Jeffrey David Gross
Represented By: Glen Carlton Hallman
Represented By: Christopher William Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 'Sa' Nyu Wa Incorporated
Represented By: Christopher William Thompson
Represented By: Glen Carlton Hallman
Represented By: Jeffrey David Gross
Represented By: Paul Kipp Charlton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grand Canyon Resort Corporation
Represented By: Glen Carlton Hallman
Represented By: Jeffrey David Gross
Represented By: Paul Kipp Charlton
Represented By: Christopher William Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Walerma, Sr.
Represented By: Paul Kipp Charlton
Represented By: Jeffrey David Gross
Represented By: Glen Carlton Hallman
Represented By: Christopher William Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wynona Sinyella
Represented By: Paul Kipp Charlton
Represented By: Jeffrey David Gross
Represented By: Glen Carlton Hallman
Represented By: Christopher William Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruby Steele
Represented By: Paul Kipp Charlton
Represented By: Jeffrey David Gross
Represented By: Glen Carlton Hallman
Represented By: Christopher William Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Candida Hunter
Represented By: Paul Kipp Charlton
Represented By: Jeffrey David Gross
Represented By: Glen Carlton Hallman
Represented By: Christopher William Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barney Rocky Imus
Represented By: Paul Kipp Charlton
Represented By: Jeffrey David Gross
Represented By: Glen Carlton Hallman
Represented By: Christopher William Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waylon Honga
Represented By: Paul Kipp Charlton
Represented By: Jeffrey David Gross
Represented By: Glen Carlton Hallman
Represented By: Christopher William Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Vaughn, Sr.
Represented By: Paul Kipp Charlton
Represented By: Jeffrey David Gross
Represented By: Glen Carlton Hallman
Represented By: Christopher William Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wanda Easter
Represented By: Paul Kipp Charlton
Represented By: Jeffrey David Gross
Represented By: Glen Carlton Hallman
Represented By: Christopher William Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grand Canyon Skywalk Development LLC
Represented By: Tracy Lynn Weiss
Represented By: Mark G Tratos
Represented By: Robert S Thompson, IV
Represented By: Pamela M Overton
Represented By: Troy A Eid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?