Robertson et al v. DLJ Mortgage Capital Incorporated et al

Plaintiff: Sherwin Dennis Robertson and Irma Robertson
Defendant: Fairbanks Capital Corporation, Credit Suisse Financial Corporation, Unknown Parties, Select Portfolio Servicing Incorporated, Credit Suisse (USA) Incorporated and DLJ Mortgage Capital Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2012cv08033
Filed: February 22, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: Yavapai
Presiding Judge: Lawrence O Anderson
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 13, 2012 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Court certifies that this appeal is not taken in good faith. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion for Permission to Appeal InForma Pauperis, doc. 69 , is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 11/13/2012.(KMG)
October 11, 2012 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, doc. 61 , is DENIED in part and GRANTED in part. The Court denies Defendants' Rule 12(b)(1) motion that the District Court of Arizona lacks subject matter jurisdiction over this action, but grant s Defendants' Rule 12(b)(6) motion that Plaintiffs have failed to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. This action is dismissed with prejudice against all Defendants. The Clerk is kindly directed to enter Judgment in favor of Defendants and against Plaintiffs and terminate this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 10/11/2012.(KMG)
June 25, 2012 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to demonstrate subject-matter jurisdiction on its face and allege plausible claims upon which relief may be granted. If Plaintiffs elect to file a proposed amended complaint, it must be consistent with this order, set forth sufficient specific facts regarding each party's citizenship, domicile, and, as to each corporate defendant, identify the state where it is incorporated and the state of its principle place of business. FURTHER ORDERED that if Plaintiffs seek to bring an amended complaint, the amended complaint must be filed on or before Friday, July 13, 2012, or Plaintiffs' leave to amend is denied ab initio. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Black and White Cor porations 1-100 in the Complaint are dismissed without prejudice. These individual or corporate defendants are dismissed because the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure do not provide for the use of fictitious parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 6/25/2012. (KMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robertson et al v. DLJ Mortgage Capital Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fairbanks Capital Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse Financial Corporation
Represented By: Bradford E Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing Incorporated
Represented By: Bradford E Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse (USA) Incorporated
Represented By: Bradford E Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DLJ Mortgage Capital Incorporated
Represented By: Bradford E Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherwin Dennis Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irma Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?