Bergdale v. Countrywide Bank FSB et al

Plaintiff: Rozann G Bergdale
Defendant: Countrywide Bank FSB, Bank of America NA and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 3:2012cv08057
Filed: March 27, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: Yavapai
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 25, 2014 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendants' 47 Motion for Summary Judgment. ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall enter judgment in favor of Defendants and terminate this case. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 6/25/2014.(LFIG)
January 9, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the 27 Motion to Dismiss filed by the Defendants is granted in part and denied in part. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 1/9/2013. (See Order for details.)(LFIG)
September 18, 2012 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the 14 Motion to Dismiss filed by the Defendants is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have thirty (30) days from the date of this Order in which to file a Second Amended Complaint. If Plaintiff fails to comply, the Clerk of Court is directed to terminate this matter. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 9/18/2012.(LFIG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bergdale v. Countrywide Bank FSB et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Bank FSB
Represented By: Robert W Shely
Represented By: Gregory Bryan Iannelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America NA
Represented By: Gregory Bryan Iannelli
Represented By: Robert W Shely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rozann G Bergdale
Represented By: Beth Findsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?