Center for Biological Diversity v. United States Forest Service

Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Defendant: United States Forest Service
Case Number: 3:2012cv08088
Filed: May 9, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: Coconino
Presiding Judge: Paul G Rosenblatt
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:4332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 22, 2013 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting the Forest Service's 33 Motion for Summary Judgment and denying Plaintiff's 27 Motion for Summary Judgment. ORDERED denying the Forest Service's 38 Motion to Strike. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk to enter judgment for the Forest Service. Signed by Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 1/22/2013.(LFIG)
November 8, 2012 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER vacating the December 5, 2012 oral argument date. Oral Argument on the parties' summary judgment motions is reset to Tuesday, December 18, 2012 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 601, before Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt. Signed by Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 11/8/2012. (LFIG)
July 31, 2012 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 17 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 7/30/12.(LSP)
June 18, 2012 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER pursuant to 10 Stipulation: the October 1, 2012, scheduling conference is vacated and the filing of a joint case management report is waived. See PDF document for additional new deadlines. A hearing on the parties' summary judgment motions, to be filed at a future date, is set for 11/20/2012 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 601, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt. Signed by Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 6/18/12. (LSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Center for Biological Diversity v. United States Forest Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Forest Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Marc D Fink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?