Wood et al v. Betlach et al

Plaintiff: Flint Wood, Phonesagnam Silivongxay, Cynthia Roberts and Flisha Mumaw
Defendant: Thomas J Betlach and Kathleen Sebelius
Case Number: 3:2012cv08098
Filed: May 21, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: Apache
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 3, 2014 131 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 119 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/3/2014.(DGC, nvo)
July 26, 2013 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiffs' 106 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment is denied. The Secretary's 113 Motion for Summary Judgment is granted. The Clerk is directed to enter Judgment and terminate this action. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/26/2013.(LFIG)
February 7, 2013 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Secretary's 29 Motion for Summary Judgment is denied; Plaintiffs' 67 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment is granted with respect to their first claim for relief and denied with respect to their second claim. The Secretary& #039;s approval of Arizona's demonstration project on October 21, 2011 is remanded without vacatur for the Secretary to address the deficiencies set forth in this order. Director Betlach's 85 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment on Pl ainiff's second claim for relief is granted; Plaintiffs' 77 Motion for Judicial Notice and Director Betlach's 80 Cross-Motion for Judicial Notice are denied; Plaintiffs' 90 Motion to Strike the declaration of Diana Alvarez is denied as moot. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/6/13.(LFIG)
October 5, 2012 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/5/2012.(NVO)
September 24, 2012 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 26 Motion to Dismiss Counts/Claims. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/24/2012.(NVO)
July 12, 2012 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 36 Motion to Strike ; granting 41 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/12/2012.(NVO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wood et al v. Betlach et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flint Wood
Represented By: Ellen Sue Katz
Represented By: Martha Jane Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phonesagnam Silivongxay
Represented By: Ellen Sue Katz
Represented By: Martha Jane Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Roberts
Represented By: Ellen Sue Katz
Represented By: Martha Jane Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flisha Mumaw
Represented By: Ellen Sue Katz
Represented By: Martha Jane Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas J Betlach
Represented By: Logan T Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Sebelius
Represented By: Joel McElvain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?