Foust et al v. Page, City of et al

Plaintiff: Shannon E Foust, Brynn Foust D'Avello and Toni D Foust
Defendant: Page Police Department, Shawn Wilson, Unknown Wilson, Charles Dennis, Unknown Dennis, William Diak, Unknown Diak, Unknown Parties and Page, City of
Case Number: 3:2012cv08115
Filed: June 14, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 5, 2014 153 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Setting firm trial date of 12/10/2014 at 9:00 a.m. for 7 days (12/10-12 and 12/16-19/2014). Final conference shall be held o 12/8/2014 at 4:30 p.m. before The Honorable David G. Campbell, 401 West Washington Street, Courtroom 603, Phoenix, A rizona 85003. Granting in part and denying in part 114 Motion in Limine; denying 115 Motion in Limine; granting 116 Motion in Limine; denying 117 Motion in Limine; granting 118 Motion in Limine; granting 119 Motion in Limine; grant ing 120 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 122 Motion in Limine; denying 123 Motion to Bifurcate; granting 128 Motion in Limine; denying 129 Motion in Limine; denying 130 Motion in Limine; denying 131 Motion in Limine.. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/5/2014.(DGC, nvo)
July 8, 2014 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 101 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/8/2014.(DGC, nvo)
May 6, 2014 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 84 Motion re filing Exhibit F in non-electronic format; granting in part and denying in part 85 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 91 Motion to Amend/Correct. The Court will set a final pretrial conference by separate order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/6/2014.(DGC, nvo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foust et al v. Page, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon E Foust
Represented By: Greg Clark
Represented By: John Jeffrey Bouma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brynn Foust D'Avello
Represented By: John Jeffrey Bouma
Represented By: Greg Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toni D Foust
Represented By: John Jeffrey Bouma
Represented By: Greg Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Page Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Dennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Dennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Diak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Diak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Page, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?