Levingston v. Earle et al

Plaintiff: Lynnell Levingston
Defendant: Raymon L Piburn, Unknown Parties, Victoria L Earle, Law Office of Victoria L Earle LLC and Patricia V Piburn
Case Number: 3:2012cv08165
Filed: August 16, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: Apache
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 4, 2014 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Defendants' 42 Motion to Reopen Case. ORDERED denying Defendants' 44 Renewed Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 9/4/2014.(LFIG)
March 26, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 23 in full with prejudice; denying Plaintiff's Motion to Disqualify the Honorable Judge Teilborg 31 ; Defendants may move for attorneys' fees as prescribed in the Court's earlier Order. See (Doc. 30 at 8). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall terminate this case. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 3/26/2014.(ALS)
November 21, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - ORDERD that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 23 ) is granted in part; the motion remains pending, in part, subject to supplemental briefing. Defendants Motion for Attorney's Fees (Doc. 23 ) is denied without prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file a response to address only fair use as discussed in this Order within fourteen days of the date of this Order. Defendant may reply within seven days from when Plaintiff responds. If Plaintiff does not respond, the M otion to Dismiss will be deemed granted in full with prejudice, and the Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment consistent with this Order. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Costs, Attorney's Fees, Expense, Out-of-pocket Costs, a nd to Convert to a Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 24 ) is denied. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Default (Doc. 27 ) is denied because Defendants responded to the Amended Complaint (Doc. 22 ) with a Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 23 ).FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Compliance with Rule 16 (Doc. 29 ) is denied because a Rule 16 Conference has not been held. FINALLY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motions for Sanctions (Docs. 24 and 26 ) are denied because there are no grounds to impose sanctions. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 11/20/2013.(TLB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Levingston v. Earle et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymon L Piburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victoria L Earle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Office of Victoria L Earle LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia V Piburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynnell Levingston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?