Grand Canyon Skywalk Development LLC v. 'Sa' Nyu Wa Incorporated

Petitioner: Grand Canyon Skywalk Development LLC
Respondent: 'Sa' Nyu Wa Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2012cv08183
Filed: September 11, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 9:9
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 11, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Petitioner Grand Canyon Skywalk Development, LLC's application for confirmation of an arbitration award (Doc. 1) is granted. Respondent 'Sa' Nyu Wa, Inc.'s motion to vacate the arbitration award and dismiss this matter (Doc . 7 ) is denied. Respondent 'Sa' Nyu Wa, Inc. shall remit damages in the amount of $28,572,810.25 to Grand Canyon Skywalk Development, LLC, as set forth in the August 16, 2012 Arbitration Order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/8/2013. (KMG)
January 18, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Petitioner to submit copies of pleadings of both parties leading up to the order of the Hualapai Tribal Court entered on 8/3/12. Documents must be filed with the court no later than 12:00 noon on 1/22/2012. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/18/2013. (NVO)
November 21, 2012 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Defendant SNW's Motion for Transfer [doc. 63 filed in CV-12-8030-PCT-DGC] is granted. The Clerk shall transfer Case No. CV-12-8183-FJM to this Court. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/21/12. (TLJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grand Canyon Skywalk Development LLC v. 'Sa' Nyu Wa Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Grand Canyon Skywalk Development LLC
Represented By: Troy A Eid
Represented By: Pamela M Overton
Represented By: Mark G Tratos
Represented By: Tracy Lynn Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: 'Sa' Nyu Wa Incorporated
Represented By: Jeffrey David Gross
Represented By: Paul Kipp Charlton
Represented By: Glen Carlton Hallman
Represented By: Christopher William Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?