Coleman v. Ryan et al

Plaintiff: Lon Roger Coleman
Defendant: Unknown Blackard, Charles L Ryan, Michael Holland, Unknown Sullivan, Unknown Palosaari, T Gordanier, Unknown Morrish, Unknown Schitter, L Schiff, J A Clenney, Unknown Party, Unknown Puckett, Unknown Ryder and Unknown Krakenbuhl
Case Number: 3:2012cv08199
Filed: October 1, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: Pima
Referring Judge: James F Metcalf (PS)
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 17, 2014 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ACCEPTING AND ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 46 - IT IS FURTHER ORDERED dismissing this matter as to all Defendants without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying as moot Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration (Doc. 20 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED dismissing as moot the Magistrate Judge's other outstanding Report and Recommendation (Doc. 40 ), entered March 31, 2014, involving the dismissal of Defendants Blackard and Gordanier. (See document for full details). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 7/17/14. (LAD)
September 11, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (Service Packet) - Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Doc. 14 ) is granted. Plaintiffs Motion to Appoint Counsel (Doc. 4 ) is denied. Plaintiff's "Notice of Non-Compliance, Motion for TRO Reconsideration, M otion for Assignment of Counsel" (Doc. 13 ) is denied. Counts One, Three, Four, and Five; the grievance and disciplinary portions of Count Two; and the retaliation, grievance, and conditions of confinement portions of Count Seven are dismissed without prejudice. Defendants Ryan, Holland, Sullivan, Palosaari, Morrish, Schitter, Clenney, Unknown Grievance Coordinator, Krakenbuhl, and Ryder are dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk of Court must send Plaintiff a service packet including th e Complaint (Doc. 1 ), this Order, and both summons and request for waiver forms for Defendants Schiff, Gordanier, Puckett, and Blackard. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge James F. Metcalf pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for all pretrial proceedings as authorized under 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1). (See document for full details). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/11/13. (LAD)
April 17, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Doc. 7 ) is denied without prejudice. Within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Plaintiff must either pay the $350.00 filing fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and a certified six-month trust account statement. Plaintiff's Motion for Ruling on Temporary Restraining Order (Doc. 9 ) is granted. Plaintiff's request for a temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction, contained in the Complaint, is denied without prejudice. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/17/13. (LAD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coleman v. Ryan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Blackard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles L Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Palosaari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T Gordanier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Morrish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Schitter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L Schiff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J A Clenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Puckett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Ryder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Krakenbuhl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lon Roger Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?