Pinnacle Pines Community Association v. Lexington Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Pinnacle Pines Community Association
Defendant: Lexington Insurance Company, Everest National Insurance Company, Allied World National Assurance Company, Chartis Specialty Insurance Company, Hanover Insurance Company and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 3:2012cv08202
Filed: October 1, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgment (Insurance)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 9, 2014 145 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 115 and 117 Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment; denying 119 and 120 Plaintiff's Motions for Summary Judgment; and denying as moot 124 Defendant's Motion to Strike. The Clerk is directed to terminate this action. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/9/14.(LSP)
December 13, 2013 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 96 Motion to Strike. Mr. Oliva is precluded from testifying at trial, Mr. Deatheredge and Mr. Dinslage will not be permitted to state opinions under Federal Rule of Evidence Rule 702, and Mr. Feldman has been withdrawn as an expert witness in this case. The Court will not award fees or costs for the bringing of this motion. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/13/2013.(TCA)
March 12, 2013 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 33 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/12/2013.(NVO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pinnacle Pines Community Association v. Lexington Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexington Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Everest National Insurance Company
Represented By: Lynn M Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied World National Assurance Company
Represented By: Darrell S Dudzik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chartis Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hanover Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pinnacle Pines Community Association
Represented By: Nicholas James Scavio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?