Palmer v. Wexford Medical et al

Plaintiff: Donald Ray Palmer
Defendant: Wexford Medical, Elise Stowell and Charles L Ryan
Case Number: 3:2012cv08214
Filed: October 22, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: Navajo
Referring Judge: Michelle H Burns (PS)
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 6, 2014 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Defendant Ryan's Motion for Summary Judgment 59 and Defendant Stowell's Motion for Summary Judgment 61 . Defendant Ryan's Motion for Summary Judgment 59 is grant ed; Count II is dismissed with prejudice. Defendant Stowell's Motion for Summary judgment 61 is granted in part and denied in part as follows: (a) the Motion is granted as to Count I, and Count I is dismissed with prejudice; and (b) the Motion is denied as to the request for attorneys fees under 42 U.S.C. § 1988. (4) The Clerk of Court must enter judgment accordingly and terminate the action. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 11/6/2014.(ALS)
July 22, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER the reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction and Request for Hearing 12 . Granting 32 Defendant's Motion for Clarification; Defendant need not file a response to Plaintiff's Statement of Facts; denying 12 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Hearing. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/22/13.(TLJ)
March 15, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (Service Packet) Plaintiff's 12/19/12 Motion to Strike Amended Complaint 10 is granted; the Clerk of Court must strike the 12/13/12 First Amended Complaint 8 . Plaintiff's 12/13/12 Motion for Preliminary Injunction 9 is denied. D efendants Stowell and Ryan must answer the 1/7/13 First Amended Complaint 11 . Defendants Stowell and Ryan must file a response to the 1/7/13 Motion for Preliminary Injunction 12 within 20 days of the date of service of this Order. The Clerk of Co urt must send Plaintiff a service packet for Defendants Stowell and Ryan. Plaintiff must complete and return the service packet to the Clerk of Court within 21 days of the date of filing of this Order. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Michelle H. Burns. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/15/13. (TLJ)
December 11, 2012 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying 4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The Complaint (Doc. 1) is dismissed for failure to state a claim. Plaintiff has 30 days from the date this Order is filed to file a f irst amended complaint in compliance with this Order. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must, without further notice, enter a judgment of dismissal of this action with prejudice that states that the dismissal may count as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. § 1915 (g). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/11/12.(DMT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Palmer v. Wexford Medical et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Ray Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wexford Medical
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elise Stowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles L Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?