Schenk et al v. Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation

Plaintiff: Paul Schenk and Gail Schenk
Defendant: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Case Number: 3:2012cv08223
Filed: November 8, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: Navajo
Presiding Judge: Paul G Rosenblatt
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 27, 2014 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that parties' joint Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice (Doc. 114 ) pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) is rejected. See order for details. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 8/27/14. (NKS) Modified on 8/29/2014 to WO per order (SJF).
August 14, 2014 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation's Motion to Preclude Plaintiffs' Punitive Damages Claim (Doc. 53 ) is denied. See order for details. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 8/14/14. (NKS)
July 23, 2014 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation's First Motion to Strike Expert Report of Robert Marx, D.D.S. (Doc. 39 ) is granted. FURTHER ORDERED that Novartis' Motion to Exclude Dr. Robert Marx's Specific Causation Opinions (Doc. 60 ) is granted. FURTHER ORDERED that Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation's Second Motion to Strike Expert Report of Robert Marx, D.D.S (Doc. 75 ) is stricken. See order for complete details. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 7/23/14. (NKS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schenk et al v. Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Schenk
Represented By: John Julian Vecchione
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail Schenk
Represented By: John Julian Vecchione
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Represented By: Katharine R Latimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?