R. Prasad Industries v. Flat Irons Environmental Solutions Corporation et al

Plaintiff: R. Prasad Industries
Defendant: Flat Irons Environmental Solutions Corporation, Unknown Keylon, James Keylon, Unknown Miller, Gary Miller, Unknown Carlile and Robert Carlile
Case Number: 3:2012cv08261
Filed: December 30, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 9, 2014 145 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Michele Di Carlo and MPP Consulting's 135 Motion to Re-Open Time to File an Appeal is DENIED. Ms. Di Carlo and MPP Consulting are barred from appealing from this Court's Order denying her motion to quash the subpoena Plai ntiff issued to Union Bank of California. ORDERED that Plaintiff's 134 Amended Motion to Compel Union Bank of California's Compliance with Subpoena is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Union Bank of California shall comply with the subpoena issued by Plaintiff on March 7, 2014. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 12/9/2014.(LFIG)
November 10, 2014 141 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Defendants shall file a sur-reply to Plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment by 11/14/14, addressing only the new evidence and arguments offered by Plaintiff in its reply to its motion for partial summary judgment. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 11/10/14. (REW)
September 23, 2014 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Hovore's Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) 85 is granted; final judgment is entered in favor of the Hovore Defendants and against the Carlile Defendants with respect to Counts I, II, III, and IV; final judgment is entered in favor of the Hovore Defendants and against all Defendants with respect to Count V; Hovore's Motion for Sanctions 84 is granted; Hovore is awarded attorneys' fees in the amount of $37,909.00 from attorney Frederic M Douglas; Prasad's Motion for Sanctions 89 is denied. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 9/23/14. (REW)
June 20, 2014 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the 102 Motion to Quash Subpoena is DENIED; however, production is limited as specified in this Order. ORDERED that within seven days of the issuance of this Order, Prasad shall deliver a copy of this Order to UBOC and specifically communicate the above temporal limitation on the previously issued subpoena. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 6/19/2014.(LFIG)
May 20, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 16 Motion to Dismiss. Count Three is dismissed with prejudice. Counts Four, Twelve, and Thirteen are dismissed without prejudice. The Motion is denied in all other respects. ORDERED that the 26 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer is granted in part and denied in part to the limited extent that all Defendants shall answer the Complaint by June 21, 2013. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 5/20/2013. (LFIG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: R. Prasad Industries v. Flat Irons Environmental Solutions Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flat Irons Environmental Solutions Corporation
Represented By: Frederic M Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Keylon
Represented By: John E DeWulf
Represented By: Pamela Lynn Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Keylon
Represented By: John E DeWulf
Represented By: Pamela Lynn Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Miller
Represented By: Frederic M Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Miller
Represented By: Frederic M Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Carlile
Represented By: Frederic M Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Carlile
Represented By: Frederic M Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. Prasad Industries
Represented By: Franklin Thomas Hovore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?