September 17, 2015 |
Filing
96
ORDER denying 93 Plaintiff's Motion for Waiver of Transcript Fee. See attached Order. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 9/17/2015.(TLB)
|
May 20, 2015 |
Filing
89
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED granting Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 76 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment for Defendants and terminate this case. (See document for further details). Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 5/20/15.(LAD)
|
August 1, 2014 |
Filing
64
ORDER denying 63 Defendants' Motion to Strike Plaintiff's "Amended Complaint" filed 7/1/2014 (Doc. 63). FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall not file an answer or other responsive pleading to Plaintiff's July 1, 2014 "Amend Complaint" (Doc. 58), which the Court deems not to be an amended complaint. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 7/31/2014.(TLB)
|
June 26, 2014 |
Filing
57
ORDER denying 52 Plaintiffs motion to compel; denying 52 Plaintiffs motion for release of part of the record; denying Plaintiff's 53 second motion to compel; striking 54 Defendants' Answer to Plaintiff's "Amend Complaint" Filed June 11, 2014. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 6/26/2014.(ALS)
|
April 30, 2014 |
Filing
40
ORDER - The Court construes Plaintiff's motion as a motion for referral to aMagistrate Judge for a settlement conference. The Court refers parties to a Magistrate Judge only if the request is jointly made. Therefore, ORDERED denying 39 Plaintiff's Motion for Settlement Conference, without prejudice to reurging the motion if both parties agree it would be beneficial. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 4/30/2014.(TLB)
|
March 25, 2014 |
Filing
38
ORDER - denying Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel. ORDERED granting 36 Motion to Continue Court Appointed Dates. ORDERED continuing Rule 16 Scheduling Conference from 4/30/2014 to 6/4/2014 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 503, 401 West Washingto n Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Senior Judge James A Teilborg). ORDERED denying 37 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration (docketed as Supplement re: Motion to Continue Court Appointed Dates and Motion to Appoint Counsel). Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 3/25/2014.(TLB)
|
March 6, 2014 |
Filing
34
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 29 Defendants' Motion toDismiss; granting 30 Defendant Torel Nichols' Second Motion to Dismiss. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED dismissing with prejudice all claims against Defendants Douglass, McNeil, and Nichols; dismissing with prejudice all claims against Defendants Williams, Fechtelkotter, Spears, and Roby except excessive force. Thus, Plaintiffs sole remaining claims are the excessive force claims against Defendants Williams, Fechtelkotter, Spears, and Roby. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED striking Plaintiff's "Reply to Defendants Counsel Motion to Dismiss" [sic] (Doc. 33 ). Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 3/6/2014. (ALS)
|
June 10, 2013 |
Filing
27
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 14 Motion to Dismiss; denying 22 Motion for Extension of Time/Third Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying as moot 26 Motion for Hearing or Conference. ORDER that Defendants Show Low Police Department, Steven L. Williams, Jason O Spear, Shawn T. Roby, Cory L. Fechtelkotter, Kenneth E. Douglas, and Jeff McNeil's Joinder in Defendant Torel Nichols' Motion to Dismiss 24 is denied in part and granted in part. ORDER that Defendant Show Low Police Department is dismissed without prejudice because it is a non-jural entity. ORDER that Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint within 20 days of the date of this Order. If Plaintiff fails to comply, this case case will be dismissed with prjudice. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 6/10/13.(TLJ)
|
January 24, 2013 |
Filing
6
*ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of Court must send Plaintiff a service packet for the Defendant(s). Plaintiff must complete and return the service packet to the Clerk of Court within 30 days of the date of filing of this Order. ORDER denying 3 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 1/24/13.(TLJ) *Modified to reflect defendant(s)on 1/24/2013 (TLJ).
|