Coulbourn et al v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Plaintiff: George Coulbourn and Sandra Brown Coulbourn
Defendant: Elliott Turbo Machinery Company, York International Corporation, Coen Company Incorporated, BW/IP International Incorporated, Dover Corporation, SB Decking Incorporated, Yarway Corporation, Asten Johnson Incorporated, Pfizer Incorporated, Uniroyal Holding Incorporated, Ingersoll-Rand Company, William Powell Company, Crown Cork & Seal Company Incorporated, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Warren Pumps LLC, Crosby Valve Incorporated, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, John Crane Incorporated, Blackmer Pump Company, Flowserve Corporation, Anchor Darling Valve Company, Elliott Company, Goulds Pumps Incorporated, Higbee Incorporated, General Electric Company, Viking Pump Incorporated, Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Cleaver-Brooks Incorporated, Carrier Corporation, BNS Company, Clyde Bergemann Incorporated, Crane Environmental Incorporated, Coffin Turbo Pump Incorporated, Weir Valves & Controls USA Incorporated, Jerguson Gage & Valve Company, Viad Corporation, Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC, Watts Water Technologies Incorporated, Flowserve US Incorporated, IMO Industries Incorporated, Armstrong International Incorporated, O.C. Keckley Company, Alfa Laval Incorporated, Scapa Waycross Incorporated, Crane Company, Heat Transfer Products Incorporated, Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, FMC Corporation, Copes Vulcan Incorporated, CSK Auto Incorporated, Cameron International Corporation, Parker-Hannifin Corporation, Honeywell International Incorporated, Velan Valve Corporation, Thrush Company Incorporated, Union Carbide Corporation, Caterpillar Incorporated, CBS Corporation, Hopeman Brothers Incorporated, Trane US Incorporated and Amtrol Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2013cv08141
Filed: June 4, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: Mohave
Presiding Judge: Susan R Bolton
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Asbestos Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2018 Filing 959 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Kyle Tracy. Reason for return: Return to Sender: No Longer at Address. Document number 957. (REK)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 958 ORDER granting #956 Motion to Dismiss Party and Release Appeal Bond. See Order for further details. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 8/15/18. (MSA)
August 15, 2018 Filing 957 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #956 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Crane Co. with Prejudice and Release Appeal Bond Number 106527181 [Proposed] Order by Defendant Crane Company. (Hendricks, John)
August 15, 2018 Filing 956 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Crane Co. with Prejudice and Release Appeal Bond Number 106527181 by Crane Company. (Hendricks, John)
April 20, 2018 Filing 955 MANDATE of USCA Affirming District Court decision re: 16-16925 as to #926 Notice of Appeal filed by Crane Company. (Copies mailed by Ninth Circuit) (Attachments: #1 Memorandum)(DXD)
January 26, 2018 Filing 953 MANDATE of USCA that the appeal is voluntarily dismissed pursuant to stipulation re: #924 Notice of Appeal filed by William Powell Company. The parties shall bear their costs and attorneys' fees on appeal. A copy of this order shall serve as and for the mandate of this court. (Attachments: #1 NDA) (LAD)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 952 ORDER vacating portions of its final Judgment applicable to and/or against Wm Powell Company and dismissing with prejudice all of Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant Wm. Powell Company. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 1/23/18. (EJA)
January 22, 2018 Filing 951 RESPONSE to Motion re: #950 MOTION dismissal re: #924 Notice of Appeal Notice of Non-Opposition re Powell's Motion filed by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
January 12, 2018 Filing 950 MOTION dismissal re: #924 Notice of Appeal by William Powell Company. (Boblick, Jason)
December 6, 2016 Filing 949 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL PARTIAL TRANSCRIPT of JURY TRIAL - Day #1 (JURY IMPANELING) proceedings for date of 04/05/2016 before Judge Susan R. Bolton re: #924 Notice of Appeal, #926 Notice of Appeal. (Court Reporter: Elizabeth A. Lemke). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/27/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/6/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/6/2017. (RAP)
December 6, 2016 Filing 948 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE proceedings for date of 01/27/2016 before Judge Susan R. Bolton re: #924 Notice of Appeal, #926 Notice of Appeal. (Court Reporter: Elizabeth A. Lemke). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/27/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/6/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/6/2017. (RAP)
December 6, 2016 Filing 947 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of MOTION HEARING proceedings for date of 01/30/2015 before Judge Susan R. Bolton re: #924 Notice of Appeal, #926 Notice of Appeal. (Court Reporter: Elizabeth A. Lemke). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/27/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/6/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/6/2017. (RAP)
December 6, 2016 Filing 946 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of SCHEDULING CONFERENCE proceedings for date of 09/16/2013 before Judge Susan R. Bolton re: #924 Notice of Appeal, #926 Notice of Appeal. (Court Reporter: Elizabeth A. Lemke). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/27/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/6/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/6/2017. (RAP)
November 21, 2016 Filing 945 Surety BOND in the amount of $3,500,000.00 posted by William Powell Company. (REW)
November 18, 2016 Filing 944 NOTICE re: of Lodging Original Supersedeas Bond by William Powell Company . (Boblick, Jason)
November 17, 2016 Filing 943 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Crane Company for proceedings held on 9/16/2013; 1/30/2015; 12/22/2015; 1/27/2016 and proceedings prior to opening statements on 4/5/2016, Judge Susan R Bolton hearing judge(s). (Hendricks, John)
November 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 942 ORDER: per the Unopposed Application for Approval of Supersedeas Bond and for an Order Staying Enforcement of Judgment Pending Appeal #937 , approving the $3.5 million supersedeas bond obtained by Defendant Wm. Powell Company; Defendant Wm. Powell shall lodge the original supersedeas bond in paper form with this Court within 7 days of the entry of this Order; enforcement of the judgment against Wm. Powell Company #921 , is stayed pending final disposition of Wm. Powell Company's appeal #924 . Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 11/17/16. (REW)
November 16, 2016 Filing 941 NOTICE re: of Lodging Proposed Order by William Powell Company re: #937 Application for Approval of Superdedeas Bond for Order Staying Enforcement of Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Boblick, Jason)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 940 ORDER: pursuant to the Parties' #936 Stipulation of Dismissal, all claims filed in this action are dismissed with prejudice as to HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC. only; each party to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 11/14/16. (REW)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 939 ORDER: pursuant to the Parties' #935 Stipulation of Dismissal, all claims filed in this action are dismissed without prejudice as to CRANE ENVIRONMENTAL, INC. only; each party to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 11/14/16. (REW)
November 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 938 ORDER: On November 10, 2016, Defendant Wm. Powell Company filed an Unopposed Application for Approval of Supersedeas Bond and for an Order Staying Enforcement of Judgment Pending Appeal (Doc. #937 ). IT IS ORDERED that the Unopposed Application for Approval of Supersedeas Bond and for an Order Staying Enforcement of Judgment Pending Appeal will be denied within 3 days of the date of this order if counsel does not comply with the ECF Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, Section II(G), specifically, subparagraph 1b.. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 11/14/16. (MAW)
November 10, 2016 Filing 937 *MOTION for Approval of Supersedeas Bond and for Order Staying Enforcement of Judgment of Pending Appeal by Defendant William Powell Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Boblick, Jason) *Modified to correct event on 11/17/2016* (REW).
November 9, 2016 Filing 936 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Honeywell International, Inc. by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
November 9, 2016 Filing 935 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Crane Environmental, Inc. by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
November 7, 2016 Filing 934 AMENDED TRANSCRIPT REQUEST pursuant to Notice of Deficiency 933 by William Powell Company for proceedings held on 9/16/13; 1/30/15; 12/22/15; 1/27/16; 4/5/16, Judge Susan R Bolton hearing judge(s) re: #924 Notice of Appeal. (Boblick, Jason)
November 7, 2016 Filing 933 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #932 Amended Document (NOT Motion/Complaint) filed by William Powell Company. Incorrect event selected: Amended Document found in the Other Documents category. Correct event: Transcript Request - Appeal found in the Appeal Documents category. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Re-filed the document using the correct event. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REW)
November 4, 2016 Filing 932 *AMENDED DOCUMENT by William Powell Company. Amendment to #930 Transcript Request. (Boblick, Jason) *Modified on 11/7/2016; incorrect event, attorney notified to re-file* (REW).
November 4, 2016 Filing 931 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: AO435 #930 Transcript Request filed by William Powell Company. Item 17 - TRANSCRIPT REQUESTED: The listed date of proceeding 09/30/2015 is incorrect. The actual date is 01/30/2015. Item 18 - ORDER: Appeal Designation verbiage is not specific. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile with the corrected date of proceeding in Item 17 and with specific dates of appeal designation. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (RAP)
November 4, 2016 Filing 930 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by William Powell Company for proceedings held on 9/6/13; 9/30/15; 12/22/15; 1/27/16; 4/5/16, Judge Susan R Bolton hearing judge(s). (Boblick, Jason)
October 25, 2016 Filing 929 USCA Case Number re: #926 Notice of Appeal. Case number 16-16925, NInth Circuit. (copies sent by the Ninth Circuit) (REW)
October 18, 2016 Filing 928 APPEAL DOCUMENT by Crane Company re: #926 Notice of Appeal Notice of Posting Supersedeas Bond. (Hendricks, John)
October 18, 2016 Filing 927 REPRESENTATION STATEMENT by Crane Company re: #926 Notice of Appeal. (Hendricks, John)
October 18, 2016 Filing 926 *NOTICE OF APPEAL to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals re: #922 Order, #921 Clerk's Judgment, #920 Order, #897 Clerk's Judgment, by Crane Company. Filing fee received: $ 505.00, receipt number 0970-13514860. (Hendricks, John) *Modified to add document linkage on 10/19/2016 (ATD).
October 5, 2016 Filing 925 USCA Case Number re: #924 Notice of Appeal; Ninth Circuit Case number 16-16796. (Copies sent by the Ninth Circuit) (ATD)
October 5, 2016 Filing 924 NOTICE OF APPEAL to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals re: #921 Clerk's Judgment, #922 Order by William Powell Company. Filing fee received: $ 505.00, receipt number 0970-13470053. (Boblick, Jason) Modified on 10/6/2016 (REW).
October 4, 2016 Filing 923 Taxation Judgment in amount of $17,205.57 against defendant. Signed by Chief Deputy Clerk Michael O'Brien on 10/04/2016. (CSL)
September 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 922 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED denying Defendant Wm. Powell Company's Rule 50(B) Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law #908 . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying Defendant Wm. Powell Company's Rule 59(A) Motion for New Trial #909 . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying Crane Co.'s Combined Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, a New Trial, and/or Remittitur #907 [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 9/20/16.(MAW)
September 7, 2016 Filing 921 *Portions Vacated pursuant to (Doc. #952 ) AMENDED CLERK'S JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Court's Order filed May 12, 2016 and the jury's verdict finding defendant Crane Co. twenty percent liable for plaintiffs' full compensatory damages, judgment is entered for plaintiffs and against Crane as follows: Sandra Brown Coulbourn, $1,200,000.00; George Coulbourn Jr., $200,000.00; Scott Alan Coulbourn, $200,000.00; and Shannon Coulbourn Moses, $200,000.00. Plaintiffs are also awarded punitive damages against Crane in the amount of $5,000,000.00. The total amount owed by Crane to plaintiffs is $6,800,000.00 plus any pre- and post-judgment interest that may be afforded by law. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Court's Order filed May 12, 2016 and the jury's verdict finding the defendant The William Powell Company five percent liable for plaintiffs' full compensatory damages, judgment is entered for plaintiffs and against The William Powell Company as follows: Sandra Brown Coulbourn, $300,000.00; George Coulbourn Jr., $50,000.00; Scott Alan Coublourn $50,000.00; and Shannon Coulbourn Moses, $50,000.00. Plaintiffs are also awarded punitive damages against The William Powell Company in the amount of $3,000,000.00. The total amount owed by The William Powell Company to plaintiffs is $3,450,000.00 plus any pre- and post-judgment interest that may be afforded by law. (EJA) Modified on 1/23/2018 (EJA).
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 920 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiffs' Motion to Correct Clerical Error in Judgment Entered May 12, 2016 (Doc. #899 ). ORDERED denying as moot Defendant Crane Co.'s Motion to Correct Clerical Mistake in Judgment (Doc. #900 ). ORDERED denying as moot William Powell's Response to Motions to Correct Judgment and Motion to Amend Judgment (Doc. #904 ). FURTHER ORDERED denying without prejudice Defendant Crane Co.'s Motion to Stay Execution of Judgment (Doc. #898 ). Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 8/25/16.(EJA)
July 8, 2016 Filing 919 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #908 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed by William Powell Company. (Boblick, Jason)
July 8, 2016 Filing 918 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #909 MOTION for New Trial filed by William Powell Company. (Boblick, Jason)
July 5, 2016 Filing 917 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #907 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law (Combined Renewed), A New Trial, and/or Remittitur by Defendant Crane Company. (Hendricks, John) *Modified to correct event on 7/6/2016* (REW).
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 916 ORDER pursuant to #915 Stipulation: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED extending the time for Defendant Wm. Powell Company to file any replies in support of its Rule 50(b) #908 and Rule 59 #909 motions from July 5, 2016, to July 8, 2016. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 6/30/16. (MAW)
June 29, 2016 Filing 915 STIPULATION to Extend the Time to File Replies in Support of It's Rule 50(b) and Rule 59 Motions by William Powell Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Boblick, Jason) Modified on 6/30/2016 (REW).
June 23, 2016 Filing 914 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #909 MOTION for New Trial filed by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
June 23, 2016 Filing 913 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #908 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
June 23, 2016 Filing 912 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #907 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law (Combined Renewed), A New Trial, and/or Remittitur, and Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
June 23, 2016 Filing 911 OBJECTION to Plaintiffs' Bill of Costs by Defendant William Powell Company. (Boblick, Jason)
June 23, 2016 Filing 910 OBJECTION/ANSWER/RESPONSE to BILL OF COSTS by Plaintiffs re: #901 by Crane Company. (Hendricks, John)
June 9, 2016 Filing 909 MOTION for New Trial by William Powell Company. (Boblick, Jason)
June 9, 2016 Filing 908 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by William Powell Company. (Boblick, Jason)
June 9, 2016 Filing 907 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law (Combined Renewed), A New Trial, and/or Remittitur, and Memorandum of Law in Support by Crane Company. (Hendricks, John)
June 9, 2016 Filing 906 AFFIDAVIT/SUPPORTING DOCUMENT to BILL OF COSTS re: #901 by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B Part 1 of 4, #3 Exhibit B Part 2 of 4, #4 Exhibit B Part 3 of 4, #5 Exhibit B Part 4 of 4)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
June 3, 2016 Filing 905 RESPONSE to Motion re: #899 MOTION to Amend/Correct CLERICAL ERROR IN JUDGMENT Entered on May 12, 2016 filed by Crane Company. (Hendricks, John)
May 31, 2016 Filing 904 RESPONSE to Motion re: #899 MOTION to Amend/Correct CLERICAL ERROR IN JUDGMENT and Motion to Amend Judgment filed by William Powell Company. (Boblick, Jason)
May 31, 2016 Filing 903 MINUTE ORDER: LRCiv 54.1 (a) requires documentation of requested costs in all categories to be attached to the Bill of Costs. Counsel is directed to file a memorandum listing itemized costs within ten (10) days, by June 10, 2016. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (CSL)
May 26, 2016 Filing 902 RESPONSE to Motion re: #898 MOTION to Stay Execution of Judgment filed by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
May 26, 2016 Filing 901 BILL OF COSTS by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
May 24, 2016 Filing 900 MOTION to Amend/Correct Clerical Mistake in Judgment by Crane Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hendricks, John)
May 24, 2016 Filing 899 MOTION to Amend/Correct CLERICAL ERROR IN JUDGMENT ENTERED ON MAY 12, 2016 by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
May 24, 2016 Filing 898 MOTION to Stay Execution of Judgment by Crane Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hendricks, John)
May 12, 2016 Filing 897 CLERK'S JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Court's Order filed May 12, 2016 and the jury verdict, judgment is entered in favor of plaintiffs and against defendants as follows: Sandra Brown Coulbourn, $6,000,000.00; George Coulbourn Jr., $1,000,000.00; Scott Alan Coulbourn, $1,000,000.00; and Shannon Coulbourn Moses, $1,000,000.00. Plaintiffs are awarded punitive damages against the following in the amounts listed: Crane Company, $5,000,000.00 and The William Powell Company, $3,000,000.00. (ATD)
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 896 ORDER denying Defendant Crane Co. and William Powell Company's Motions for Judgment as a Matter of Law. (Docs. #837 , #852 , #855 ). The Clerk is directed to enter judgment in accordance with the verdict of the jury. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 5/12/2016. (ATD)
May 10, 2016 Filing 895 SUPPLEMENT PLAINTIFFS' SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTIONS FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW re: #861 Response in Opposition to Motion, #853 Response in Opposition to Motion by Plaintiff Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
May 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 887 ORDER re: rulings on objections to designations of deposition of George Coulbourn made during trial. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 5/3/16. (Attachments: #1 Rulings part 1, #2 Rulings part 2)(KGM)
May 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 886 ORDER, pursuant to (Doc. #806 ), dismissing this case as to Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation only with prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 5/3/16. (KGM) Modified on 5/3/2016 (KGM).
April 22, 2016 Filing 894 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of JURY TRIAL - Day #12 (Pages 2480 through 2488, Inclusive.) proceedings held on 04/22/2016, before Judge Susan R. Bolton. (Court Reporter: Elizabeth A. Lemke). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/13/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/23/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/21/2016. (RAP)
April 22, 2016 Filing 881 Defendant William Powell's Exhibit List. (KGM)
April 22, 2016 Filing 880 Defendant/Respondent Exhibit List. (KGM)
April 22, 2016 Filing 879 Exhibit List. (Attachments: #1 Part 2)(KGM)
April 22, 2016 Filing 878 MINUTE ORDER re: Exhibits. (KGM)
April 22, 2016 Filing 877 Jury Notes/Questions (public document). (KGM)
April 22, 2016 Filing 876 Final Jury Instructions. (KGM)
April 22, 2016 Filing 875 Preliminary Jury Instructions. (KGM)
April 22, 2016 Filing 874 Sealed Jury Verdict. (MAP)
April 22, 2016 Filing 873 Sealed Jury List. (MAP)
April 22, 2016 Filing 872 Sealed Jury List (Defendants'). (MAP)
April 22, 2016 Filing 871 Sealed Jury List (Plaintiffs'). (MAP)
April 22, 2016 Filing 870 Sealed Judge's (Jury) List. (MAP)
April 22, 2016 Filing 869 Sealed Jury Panel Summary Report. (MAP)
April 22, 2016 Filing 868 Witness List by William Powell Company. (MAW)
April 22, 2016 Filing 867 Witness List by Crane Company. (MAW)
April 22, 2016 Filing 866 Witness List by George Coulbourn and Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (MAW)
April 22, 2016 Filing 865 JURY VERDICT. (MAW)
April 22, 2016 Filing 864 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Susan R Bolton: Jury Trial [Day 12] completed on 4/22/2016. Verdict is read. At the request of Plaintiffs' counsel, the jury is polled. The Court advises the jury the admonition has been lifted and that they are discharged from their jury service. (Court Reporter Liz Lemke) Hearing held 10:35 AM to 10:39 AM.(MAW)
April 21, 2016 Filing 893 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of JURY TRIAL - DAY 11 - P.M. SESSION (Pages 2431 through 2479, inclusive.) proceedings held on 04/21/2016, before Judge Susan R. Bolton. (Court Reporter: Linda Schroeder). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/12/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/23/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/20/2016. (RAP)
April 21, 2016 Filing 892 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of JURY TRIAL - Day #11 - A.M. SESSION (Pages 2315 through 2430, Inclusive.) proceedings held on 04/21/2016, before Judge Susan R. Bolton. (Court Reporter: Elizabeth A. Lemke). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/12/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/23/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/20/2016. (RAP)
April 21, 2016 Filing 891 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of JURY TRIAL - Day #10 - P.M. SESSION (Pages 2151 through 2314, Inclusive.) proceedings held on 04/20/2016, before Judge Susan R. Bolton. (Court Reporter: Elizabeth A. Lemke). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/12/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/23/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/20/2016. (RAP)
April 21, 2016 Filing 890 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of JURY TRIAL - DAY 10 - A.M. SESSION (Pages 2046 through 2150, inclusive.) proceedings held on 04/20/2016, before Judge Susan R. Bolton. (Court Reporter: Linda Schroeder). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/12/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/23/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/20/2016. (RAP)
April 21, 2016 Filing 863 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Susan R Bolton: Jury Trial [Day 11] held on 4/21/2016. Trial continued to 4/22/2016 [see attached minute entry for details]. (Court Reporter Liz Lemke [a.m.]; Linda Schroeder [p.m.]) Hearing held 8:51 AM to 4:36 PM.(MAW)
April 21, 2016 Filing 861 *RESPONSE in Opposition re: #852 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan) *Document is not in compliance with L.R.Civ 7.1(c); attorney notified on 4/22/2016 (EJA).
April 21, 2016 Filing 856 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #855 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law and Memorandum of Law in Support [Proposed] Order on Defendant Crane Co.'s Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law by Defendant Crane Company. (Hendricks, John)
April 21, 2016 Filing 855 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law and Memorandum of Law in Support by Crane Company. (Hendricks, John)
April 20, 2016 Filing 889 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of JURY TRIAL - DAY 9 - P.M. SESSION (Pages 1902 through 2045, inclusive.) proceedings held on 04/19/2016, before Judge Susan R. Bolton. (Court Reporter: Linda Schroeder). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/11/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/23/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/19/2016. (RAP)
April 20, 2016 Filing 859 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Susan R Bolton: Jury Trial [Day 10] held on 4/20/2016. IT IS ORDERED taking under advisement Defendant Crane Co.'s Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law #837 as it relates to punitive damages. Evidence entered. Trial continued to 4/21/2016 [see attached minute entry for details]. (Court Reporter Linda Schroeder [a.m.]; Liz Lemke [p.m.]) Hearing held 9:02 AM to 5:26 PM.(MAW)
April 20, 2016 Filing 853 * RESPONSE in Opposition re: #837 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law and Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan) * Document not in compliance with LRCv 7.1(c); attorney noticed on 4/21/2016 (LAD).
April 20, 2016 Filing 852 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by William Powell Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Boblick, Jason)
April 20, 2016 Filing 851 Second Proposed Verdict Form by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
April 20, 2016 Filing 850 Proposed Verdict Form by Crane Company. (Hendricks, John)
April 20, 2016 Filing 849 Proposed Jury Instructions by Crane Company. (Hendricks, John)
April 19, 2016 Filing 888 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of JURY TRIAL - Day #9 - A.M. SESSION (Pages 1802 through 1901, Inclusive.) proceedings held on 04/19/2016, before Judge Susan R. Bolton. (Court Reporter: Elizabeth A. Lemke). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/10/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/20/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/18/2016. (RAP)
April 19, 2016 Filing 854 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Susan R Bolton: Jury Trial [Day 9] held on 4/19/2016. Evidence entered. Trial continued to 4/20/2016 [see attached minute entry for details]. (Court Reporter Liz Lemke [a.m.]; Linda Schroeder [p.m.]) Hearing held 8:51 AM to 5:45 PM.(MAW)
April 18, 2016 Filing 842 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #837 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law and Memorandum of Law in Support - [Proposed] Order on Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law by Defendant Crane Company. (Hendricks, John)
April 16, 2016 Filing 885 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of JURY TRIAL - DAY 8 - P.M. SESSION (Pages 1665 through 1801, inclusive.) proceedings held on 04/15/2016, before Judge Susan R. Bolton. (Court Reporter: Linda Schroeder). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/9/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/17/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/15/2016. (RAP)
April 15, 2016 Filing 884 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of JURY TRIAL - DAY 8 - A.M. SESSION (Pages 1532 through 1664, Inclusive.) proceedings held on 04/15/2016, before Judge Susan R. Bolton. (Court Reporter: Elizabeth A. Lemke). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/6/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/16/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/14/2016. (RAP)
April 15, 2016 Filing 883 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of JURY TRIAL - DAY 7 - P.M. SESSION (Pages 1410 through 1531, Inclusive.) proceedings held on 04/14/2016, before Judge Susan R. Bolton. (Court Reporter: Elizabeth A. Lemke). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/6/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/16/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/14/2016. (RAP)
April 15, 2016 Filing 882 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of JURY TRIAL - DAY 7 - A.M. SESSION (Pages 1286 through 1409, inclusive.) proceedings held on 04/14/2016, before Judge Susan R. Bolton. (Court Reporter: Linda Schroeder). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/6/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/16/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/14/2016. (RAP)
April 15, 2016 Filing 841 Proposed Verdict Form by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
April 15, 2016 Filing 840 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Susan R Bolton: Jury Trial [Day 8] held on 4/15/2016. Evidence entered. Trial continued to 4/19/2016 [see attached minute entry for details]. (Court Reporter Liz Lemke [a.m.]; Linda Schroeder [p.m.]) Hearing held 9:01 AM to 4:37 PM.(MAW)
April 15, 2016 Filing 837 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law and Memorandum of Law in Support by Crane Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A and B, #2 Exhibit Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Hendricks, John)
April 14, 2016 Filing 862 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of JURY TRIAL - DAY 6 - P.M. SESSION (Pages 1145 through 1285, inclusive.) proceedings held on 04/13/2016, before Judge Susan R. Bolton. (Court Reporter: Linda Schroeder). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/5/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/16/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/13/2016. (RAP)
April 14, 2016 Filing 860 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of JURY TRIAL - DAY #6 - A.M. SESSION (Pages 1026 through 1144, Inclusive.) proceedings held on 04/13/2016, before Judge Susan R. Bolton. (Court Reporter: Elizabeth A. Lemke). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/5/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/16/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/13/2016. (RAP)
April 14, 2016 Filing 839 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Susan R Bolton: Jury Trial [Day 7] held on 4/14/2016. Evidence entered. Trial continued to 4/15/2016 [see attached minute entry for details]. (Court Reporter Linda Schroeder [a.m.]; Liz Lemke [p.m.]) Hearing held 9:01 AM to 4:30 PM.(MAW)
April 13, 2016 Filing 858 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of JURY TRIAL - DAY 5 - P.M. SESSION (Pages 883 through 1025, Inclusive.) proceedings held on 04/12/2016, before Judge Susan R. Bolton. (Court Reporter: Elizabeth A. Lemke). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/4/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/16/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/12/2016. (RAP)
April 13, 2016 Filing 857 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of JURY TRIAL - DAY 5 - A.M. SESSION (Pages 777 through 882, inclusive.) proceedings held on 04/12/2016, before Judge Susan R. Bolton. (Court Reporter: Linda Schroeder). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/4/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/16/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/12/2016. (RAP)
April 13, 2016 Filing 838 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Susan R Bolton: Jury Trial [Day 6] held on 4/13/2016. Evidence entered. Trial continued to 4/14/2016 [see attached minute entry for details]. (Court Reporter Liz Lemke[a.m.]; Linda Schroeder [p.m.]) Hearing held 9:01 AM to 4:40 PM.(MAW)
April 13, 2016 Filing 836 Proposed Verdict Form by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
April 12, 2016 Filing 834 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Susan R Bolton: Jury Trial [Day 5] held on 4/12/2016. Evidence entered. Trial continued to 4/13/2016 [see attached minute entry for details]. (Court Reporter Linda Schroeder [a.m.]; Liz Lemke [p.m.]) Hearing held 9:13 AM to 4:42 PM.(MAW)
April 11, 2016 Filing 833 STIPULATION OF ECONOMIC DAMAGES by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
April 9, 2016 Filing 848 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of JURY TRIAL - Day 4 - P.M. SESSION (Pages 651 through 776, inclusive.) proceedings held on 04/08/2016, before Judge Susan R. Bolton. (Court Reporter: Linda Schroeder). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/2/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/10/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/8/2016. (RAP)
April 8, 2016 Filing 847 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of JURY TRIAL - DAY #4 - A.M. SESSION (Pages 527 through 650, Inclusive.) proceedings held on 04/08/2016, before Judge Susan R. Bolton. (Court Reporter: Elizabeth A. Lemke). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/29/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/9/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2016. (RAP)
April 8, 2016 Filing 846 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of JURY TRIAL - DAY 3 - P.M. SESSION (Pages 396 through 526, inclusive.) proceedings held on 04/07/2016, before Judge Susan R. Bolton. (Court Reporter: Linda Schroeder). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/29/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/9/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2016. (RAP)
April 8, 2016 Filing 832 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Susan R Bolton: Jury Trial [Day 4] held on 4/8/2016. Evidence entered. Trial continued to 4/12/2016 [see attached minute entry for details]. (Court Reporter Liz Lemke [a.m.]; Linda Schroeder [p.m.]) Hearing held 9:02 AM to 4:18 PM.(MAW)
April 7, 2016 Filing 845 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of JURY TRIAL - DAY #3 - A.M. SESSION (Pages 276 through 395, Inclusive.) proceedings held on 04/07/2016, before Judge Susan R. Bolton. (Court Reporter: Elizabeth A. Lemke). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/9/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/6/2016. (RAP)
April 7, 2016 Filing 844 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of JURY TRIAL - DAY 2 - P.M. SESSION (Pages 153 through 275, inclusive.) proceedings held on 04/06/2016, before Judge Susan R. Bolton. (Court Reporter: Linda Schroeder). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/28/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/9/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/6/2016. (RAP)
April 7, 2016 Filing 831 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Susan R Bolton: Jury Trial [Day 3] held on 4/7/2016. Evidence entered. Trial continued to 4/8/2016 [see attached minute entry for details]. (Court Reporter Liz Lemke [a.m.]; Linda Schroeder [p.m.]) Hearing held 9:02 AM to 4:32 PM.(MAW)
April 6, 2016 Filing 843 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of JURY TRIAL - DAY #2 - A.M. SESSION (pages 50 through 152, Inclusive.) proceedings held on 04/06/2016, before Judge Susan R. Bolton. (Court Reporter: Elizabeth A. Lemke). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/27/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/9/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/5/2016. (RAP)
April 6, 2016 Filing 830 NOTICE re: Defendants' Amended Page and Line Designations from the Deposition of George Coulbourn, Volume VII by Crane Company, William Powell Company . (Hendricks, John)
April 6, 2016 Filing 829 NOTICE re: Defendants' Amended Page and Line Designations from the Deposition of George Coulbourn, Volume VI by Crane Company, William Powell Company . (Hendricks, John)
April 6, 2016 Filing 828 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Susan R Bolton: Jury Trial [Day 2] held on 4/6/2016. Evidence entered. Trial continued to 4/7/2016 [see attached minute entry for details]. (Court Reporter Liz Lemke [a.m.]; Linda Schroeder [p.m.]) Hearing held 9:02 AM to 4:23 PM.(MAW)
April 6, 2016 Filing 826 NOTICE re: Plaintiffs' amended objections to defendants' page and line designations from the deposition of George Coulbourn, Volume 7 by Sandra Brown Coulbourn . (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
April 6, 2016 Filing 825 NOTICE re: Plaintiffs' amended objections to defendants' page and line designations from the deposition of George Coulbourn, Volume 6 by Sandra Brown Coulbourn . (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
April 6, 2016 Filing 824 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST Daily by William Powell Company for proceedings held on 4/5/16 opening Arguments through closing arguments 4/22/16, Judge Susan R Bolton hearing judge(s). (Boblick, Jason)
April 6, 2016 Filing 823 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Sandra Brown Coulbourn for proceedings held on 4/5/16 (opening Arguments through closing arguments) 4/22/16, Judge Susan R Bolton hearing judge(s). (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
April 5, 2016 Filing 835 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL *EXCERPT TRANSCRIPT of JURY TRIAL - DAY #1 - OPENING STATEMENT: PLAINTIFF (Pages 1 through 49, Inclusive.) proceedings held on 04/05/2016, before Judge Susan R. Bolton. (Court Reporter: Elizabeth A. Lemke). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/26/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/6/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/5/2016. (RAP) *Modified on 4/13/2016 (RAP).
April 5, 2016 Filing 827 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Susan R Bolton: Jury Trial Begun [Day 1] on 4/5/2016. Trial continued to 4/6/2016 [see attached minute entry for details]. (Court Reporter Liz Lemke) Hearing held 8:49 AM to 4:24 PM.(MAW)
April 5, 2016 Filing 822 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Crane Company for proceedings held on 4/5/16 (opening statements through closing arguments) 4/22/16, Judge Susan R Bolton hearing judge(s). (Hendricks, John)
April 5, 2016 Filing 821 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by William Powell Company for proceedings held on 4/5/16 (opening Arguments through closing arguments) 4/22/16, Judge Susan R Bolton hearing judge(s). (Boblick, Jason)
April 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 820 ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 terminating #816 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #819 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
April 1, 2016 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX170303 as to Rebecca Carrie Kibbe. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
April 1, 2016 Filing 819 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Rebecca Carrie Kibbe on behalf of Crane Company. (BAS)
March 31, 2016 Filing 818 Proposed Voir Dire by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
March 30, 2016 Filing 817 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #816 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Rebecca C. Kibbe filed by Crane Company. Pro Hac Vice motion electronically filed by in-state counsel for ineligible out of state counsel. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please resubmit motion in paper form with original certificates of good standing. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile original documents in paper.. Deficiency must be corrected within seven business days of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
March 30, 2016 Filing 816 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Rebecca C. Kibbe by Crane Company. (Hendricks, John)
March 28, 2016 Filing 815 NOTICE re: Plaintiffs' page and line designations from the deposition of William J. McClure taken on September 4, 2012 by Sandra Brown Coulbourn . (Attachments: #1 Supplement Defendant's Objections to page and line designations from the deposition of William J. McClure, #2 Supplement Defendant The WM. Powell Company's page and line counter designations from the despoition of William J. McClure taken on September 4, 2012, #3 Supplement Plaintiffs' objections and counter designations to the counter designations from the deposition of William J. McClure taken on September 4, 2012, #4 Supplement Highlighted deposition transcript, part 1, #5 Supplement Highlighted deposition transcript, part 2, #6 Supplement Exhibits from the deposition of William McClure Part 1, #7 Supplement Exhibits from the deposition of William McClure Part 2, #8 Supplement Exhibits from the deposition of William McClure Part 3, #9 Supplement Exhibits from the deposition of William McClure Part 4, #10 Supplement Exhibits from the deposition of William McClure Part 5, #11 Supplement Exhibits from the deposition of William McClure Part 6)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
March 28, 2016 Filing 814 NOTICE re: Defendants' page and line designations from the deposition of George Coulbourn, Volume 8 by Sandra Brown Coulbourn . (Attachments: #1 Supplement Plaintiffs' objections to defendants' page and line designations from the deposition of George Coulbourn, Volume 8, #2 Supplement Defendants' objections to plaintiff's counter designations of the deposition of George Coulbourn, Volume 8, and defendants' counter designation, #3 Supplement Highlighted deposition transcript, part 1, #4 Supplement Highlighted deposition transcript, part 2)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
March 28, 2016 Filing 813 NOTICE re: Defendants' page and line designations from the deposition of George Coulbourn, Volume 7 by Sandra Brown Coulbourn . (Attachments: #1 Supplement Plaintiffs' objections to Defendants' page and line designations from the deposition of George Coulbourn, Volume 7, #2 Supplement Defendants' objections to plaintiff's counter designations of the deposition of George Coulbourn, Volume 7, #3 Supplement Highlighted deposition transcript, part 1, #4 Supplement Highlighted deposition transcript, part 2)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
March 28, 2016 Filing 812 NOTICE re: Defendants' page and line designations from the deposition of George Coulbourn, Volume 6 by Sandra Brown Coulbourn . (Attachments: #1 Supplement Plaintiffs' objections to defendants' page and line designations from the deposition of George Coulbourn, Volume 6, #2 Supplement Highlighted deposition transcript, part 1, #3 Supplement Highlighted deposition transcript, part 2)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
March 28, 2016 Filing 811 NOTICE re: Defendants' page and line designations from the deposition of George Coulbourn, Volume 5 by Sandra Brown Coulbourn . (Attachments: #1 Supplement Plaintiffs' objections to defendants' page and line designations from the deposition of George Coulbourn, Volume 5, #2 Supplement Highlighted deposition transcript, part 1, #3 Supplement Highlighted deposition transcript, part 2)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
March 28, 2016 Filing 810 NOTICE re: Defendants' page and line designations from the deposition of George Coulbourn, Volume 4 by Sandra Brown Coulbourn . (Attachments: #1 Supplement Plaintiffs' objections to defendants' page and line designations from the deposition of George Coulbourn, Volume 4, #2 Supplement Highlighted deposition transcript, part 1, #3 Supplement Highlighted deposition transcript, part 2)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
March 28, 2016 Filing 809 NOTICE re: Defendants' page and line designations from the deposition of George Coulbourn, Volume 3 by Sandra Brown Coulbourn . (Attachments: #1 Supplement Plaintiffs' objections and counter designations to defendants' page and line designations from the deposition of George Coulbourn, Volume 3, #2 Supplement Defendants' objections to plaintiff's counter designations of the deposition of George Coulbourn, Volume 3, #3 Supplement Highlighted deposition transcript, part 1, #4 Supplement Highlighted deposition transcript, part 2)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
March 28, 2016 Filing 808 NOTICE re: Plaintiffs' amended page and line designations from the deposition of George C. Coulbourn, taken on July 12, 2013 by Sandra Brown Coulbourn . (Attachments: #1 Supplement Defendants' objections to Plaintiffs' page and line designations from the deposition of George Coulbourn, Volume 2, #2 Supplement Highlighted deposition transcript, part 1, #3 Supplement Highlighted deposition transcript, part 2)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
March 28, 2016 Filing 807 NOTICE re: Plaintiffs' amended page and line designations from the deposition of George C. Coulbourn, taken on July 11, 2013 by Sandra Brown Coulbourn . (Attachments: #1 Supplement Defendants' objections to plaintiffs' page and liune designations from the deposition of George Coulbourn, Volume 1, #2 Supplement Highlighted deposition transcript, part 1, #3 Supplement Highlighted deposition transcript, part 2, #4 Supplement Highlighted deposition transcript, part 3)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
March 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 806 ORDER: Plaintiffs and Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation having filed Notices of Settlement (Docs. #804 & #805 ); IT IS ORDERED that this matter will be dismissed as to Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation with prejudice within 30 days of the date of this order unless a stipulation to dismiss is filed prior to the dismissal date. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 3/24/16. (MAW)
March 23, 2016 Filing 805 NOTICE of Settlement by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Sparks, J)
March 23, 2016 Filing 804 NOTICE of Settlement as to Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corp. (successor-by-merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc.) by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
January 27, 2016 Filing 803 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Susan R Bolton: Telephonic Conference held on 1/27/2016 on the Court's own Motion regarding resetting this matter for Jury Trial. The Court advises counsel this matter can be scheduled for Trial on April 5, 2016, to conclude on April 22, 2016. Discussion held. IT IS ORDERED setting Jury Trial on April 5, 2016, at 9:00 a.m. As previously stipulated by counsel, the jury will be a Phoenix panel and the jury panel will be prescreened for length of trial. (Court Reporter Liz Lemke) Hearing held 2:34 PM to 2:39 PM.(MAW)
January 27, 2016 Filing 802 MINUTE ORDER: Telephonic Conference set for 1/27/2016 at 02:30 PM before Judge Susan R Bolton. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW)
January 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 801 ORDER: pursuant to the Parties' #800 Stipulation of Dismissal, all claims filed in this action are dismissed with prejudice as to CBS Corporation F/K/A Viacom Inc. (sued as Successor-by-Merger to CBS Corporation, F/K/A Westinghouse Electric Corporation and also as Successor-in Interest to BF Sturtevant) only; each party to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 1/25/16. (REW)
January 22, 2016 Filing 800 STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice as to CBS Corporation by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
January 12, 2016 Filing 799 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS/FIRM NAME by Kathleen Kelly Kahn. (Kahn, Kathleen)
January 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 798 ORDER pursuant to #796 Stipulation Requesting a Trial Continuance: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the trial date of January 13, 2016 is vacated. A new trial date will be set after consulting with the attorneys. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 1/6/16. (MAW)
January 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 797 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED denying #657 Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 3. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED granting in part and denying in part #690 Defendants' Amended Motion in Limine No. 13. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED granting in part and denying in part #691 Defendants' Amended Motion in Limine No. 15. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED granting in part and denying in part #695 Defendants' Amended Motion in Limine No. 22. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED granting in part and denying in part #701 Defendants' Amended Motion in Limine No. 29 [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 1/6/16.(MAW)
January 6, 2016 Filing 796 STIPULATION requesting a trial continuance by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
January 5, 2016 Filing 795 Exhibit List Plaintiffs' amended exhibit list by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
December 29, 2015 Filing 794 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Final Pretrial Conference Proceedings held on 12/22/2015, before Judge Susan R. Bolton. Court Reporter Linda Schroeder. The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/19/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/29/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/28/2016. (RCO)
December 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 793 FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER entered. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 12/28/2015. (ATD)
December 24, 2015 Filing 792 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by William Powell Company for proceedings held on 12/22/2015, Judge Susan R Bolton hearing judge(s). (Boblick, Jason)
December 23, 2015 Filing 790 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation for proceedings held on 12-22-2015, Judge Susan R Bolton hearing judge(s). (Sparks, J)
December 23, 2015 Filing 789 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Sandra Brown Coulbourn for proceedings held on December 22, 2015, Judge Susan R Bolton hearing judge(s). (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
December 23, 2015 Filing 788 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Crane Company for proceedings held on December 22, 2015, Judge Susan R Bolton hearing judge(s). (Hendricks, John)
December 22, 2015 Filing 791 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Susan R Bolton: Continued Final Pretrial Conference held on 12/22/2015. At the request of counsel, IT IS ORDERED resetting Jury Trial from January 12, 2016, to January 13, 2016, at 9:00 a.m. Pending motions are argued to the Court and rulings issued [see attached minute entry for details]. (Court Reporter Linda Schroeder) Hearing held 10:01 AM to 2:28 PM.(MAW)
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 787 ORDER, dismissing this case with prejudice as to Copes Vulcan Incorporated only. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 12/21/15. (REW)
December 7, 2015 Filing 786 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST Amended by William Powell Company for proceedings held on 10/5/15, Judge Susan R Bolton hearing judge(s). (Boblick, Jason)
December 7, 2015 Filing 785 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re: #784 Transcript Request filed by William Powell Company. The following deficiency has been identified with the electronically filed document: 1) AO435 Transcript Order form, (CATEGORY) no selection made from the "First Copy" column for transcript delivery. ACTION REQUIRED BY THE REQUESTER: The deficiency must be corrected within one (1) business day of this notice. The requester must re-file the AO435 Transcript Order form as a Transcript Request AMENDED. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (RAP)
December 7, 2015 Filing 784 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by William Powell Company for proceedings held on 10/5/2015, Judge Susan R Bolton hearing judge(s). (Boblick, Jason)
December 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 783 ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting #782 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
December 2, 2015 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX165759 as to Robert V Betette. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
December 2, 2015 Filing 782 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Robert V Betette on behalf of William Powell Company. (BAS)
December 1, 2015 Filing 781 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST (Amended) by Crane Company for proceedings held on 10/05/2015, Judge Susan R Bolton hearing judge(s). (Hendricks, John)
November 30, 2015 Filing 780 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re: #779 Transcript Request filed by Crane Company. Description of deficiency: AO435 Transcript Order form: Box 13 is missing the case name; Box 17 is missing the date of proceeding; Box 18 (CATEGORY) is missing requested deadline from the First Copy column; and Box 18 (DELIVERY INSTRUCTIONS) is missing a delivery email address. ACTION REQUIRED BY THE REQUESTER: The deficiencies must be corrected within one (1) business day of this notice. The requester must re-file the entire document, AO435 Transcript Order form, as a Transcript Request AMENDED. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (RAP)
November 30, 2015 Filing 779 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Crane Company for proceedings held on 10/05/2015, Judge Susan R Bolton hearing judge(s). (Hendricks, John)
November 25, 2015 Filing 778 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation for proceedings held on 10/05/2015, Judge Susan R Bolton hearing judge(s). (Sparks, J)
November 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 777 ORDER dismissing this case with prejudice as to Defendant WarrenPumps, LLC only. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 11/23/2015. (ATD)
November 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 776 ORDER dismissing this case with prejudice as to Defendant Flowserve US, Inc. only. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 11/13/15. (SJF)
November 13, 2015 Filing 775 STIPULATION REGARDING JURY PANEL by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
November 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 774 ORDER: Plaintiffs having filed a Notice of Settlement as to Defendant Copes Vulcan, Inc. #770 ; IT IS ORDERED that this matter will be dismissed as to Defendant Copes Vulcan, Inc. with prejudice within 30 days of the date of this Order unless a stipulation to dismiss is filed prior to the dismissal date. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 11/10/15. (MAW)
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 773 ORDER pursuant to #772 Stipulation: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant CBS CORPORATION (a Delaware Corporation) f/k/a VIACOM, INC. (sued as successor-by-merger to CBS CORPORATION (a Pennsylvania Corporation) f/k/a WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION and also as successor-in-interest to BF STURTEVANT) should not be dismissed until January 31, 2016, so that the Court maintains jurisdiction until payment is tendered. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 11/9/15. (MAW)
November 5, 2015 Filing 772 STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE BY WHICH DEFENDANT CBS CORPORATION IS DISMISSED FROM THE CASE by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
November 5, 2015 Filing 771 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Final Pretrial Conference proceedings held on 10/05/2015, before Judge Susan R. Bolton. (Court Reporter: Elizabeth A. Lemke). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/27/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/7/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/3/2016. (RAP)
November 3, 2015 Filing 770 NOTICE of Settlement as to Copes Vulcan, Inc. by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
November 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 769 ORDER - Dismissing Defendant The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company with prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 11/03/15. (ATD)
October 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 768 ORDER: Plaintiffs having filed a Notice of Settlement as to Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC only #767 ; IT IS ORDERED that this matter will be dismissed as to Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC with prejudice within 30 days of the date of this order unless a stipulation to dismiss is filed prior to the dismissal date. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 10/16/15. (MAW)
October 15, 2015 Filing 767 NOTICE of Settlement as to defendant Warren Pumps, LLC. by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
October 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 766 ORDER: Plaintiffs having filed Notices of Settlement as to Defendants Flowserve US, Inc. and CBS Corporation #764 and #765 ; IT IS ORDERED that this matter will be dismissed as to Defendants Flowserve US, Inc. and CBS Corporation with prejudice within 30 days of the date of this order unless a stipulation to dismiss is filed prior to the dismissal date. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 10/13/15. (MAW)
October 9, 2015 Filing 765 NOTICE of Settlement as to defendant FLOWSERVE US, INC., solely as successor to Edward Valves, Inc. (incorrectly sued as FLOWSERVE US, INC. and also as successor-in-interest to BYRON JACKSON PUMP COMPANY) by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
October 9, 2015 Filing 764 NOTICE of Settlement as to defendant CBS CORPORATION (a Delaware Corporation) f/k/a VIACOM, INC. (sued as successor-by-merger to CBS CORPORATION (a Pennsylvania Corporation) f/k/a WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION and also as successor-in-interest to BF by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
October 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 763 ORDER pursuant to #761 Stipulation of Dismissal : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED dismissing Defendant Velan Valve Corp. with prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 10/8/15. (KGM)
October 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 762 ORDER pursuant to #760 Stipulation of Dismissal : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED dismissing Defendant Imo Industries Inc. with prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 10/8/15. (KGM)
October 8, 2015 Filing 761 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Velan Valve Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Beiermeister, Kathleen) Modified on 10/9/2015 (REW).
October 8, 2015 Filing 760 STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice by IMO Industries Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Beiermeister, Kathleen) Modified on 10/9/2015 (REW).
October 6, 2015 Filing 759 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Sandra Brown Coulbourn for proceedings held on 10/05/2015, Judge Susan R Bolton hearing judge(s). (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
October 5, 2015 Filing 758 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Susan R Bolton: Final Pretrial Conference held on 10/5/2015. ORDERED withdrawing #642 Motion in Limine; granting #643 Motion in Limine; denying #646 Motion in Limine; deferring ruling on #654 Motion in Limine; deferring ruling on #656 Motion in Limine; denying #658 Motion in Limine; denied as to other person and deferring ruling on #659 Motion in Limine; granting #660 Motion in Limine; denying #661 Motion in Limine; denying #662 Motion in Limine; withdrawing #675 Motion in Limine; Jury Trial reset for 1/12/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 502, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Susan R Bolton. Final Pretrial Conference continued to 12/22/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 502, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Susan R Bolton. (Court Reporter Liz Lemke.) Hearing held 10:37 AM to 12:20 PM.(TCA)
October 5, 2015 Filing 757 *(CANCELLED BY REQUESTER ON 9OCT2015) TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by CBS Corporation for proceedings held on 10/05/2015, Judge Susan R Bolton hearing judge(s). (Bressler, Stephen) *Modified on 10/9/2015 (RAP).
October 2, 2015 Filing 756 *JOINDER re: #754 Proposed Jury Instructions by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bhatheja, Anoop) *Modified from Proposed Jury Instructions, document number/link added on 10/5/2015* (REW).
October 2, 2015 Filing 755 Proposed Jury Instructions by William Powell Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A & B)(Boblick, Jason)
October 2, 2015 Filing 754 Proposed Jury Instructions by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, CBS Corporation, Copes Vulcan Incorporated, Crane Company, Warren Pumps LLC, William Powell Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index and Exhibits A B & C)(Hendricks, John)
October 2, 2015 Filing 753 Proposed Jury Instructions by Copes Vulcan Incorporated. (Crown, Larry)
October 2, 2015 Filing 752 Proposed Jury Instructions by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
October 2, 2015 Filing 751 MOTION in Limine to Limit the Scope of Testimony of Plaintiff's Experts Dr. Millette and Dr. Mark by William Powell Company. (Boblick, Jason)
October 2, 2015 Filing 750 Proposed Jury Instructions by George Coulbourn, Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
October 2, 2015 Filing 749 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #703 Statement Notice of Filing Joint Proposed Final Pretrial Order by Plaintiffs George Coulbourn, Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Attachments: #1 Supplement to Exhibit B(1))(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
October 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 748 ORDER striking #650 Defendant Wm. Powell Company filed a Motion in Limine No. 30 to Limit the Scope of Testimony of Plaintiff's Experts Dr. James Millette and Dr. Eugene Mark. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant re-file the Motion in Limine in compliance with LRCiv. 7.1(b)(1) no later than 12:00 p.m. on October 2, 2015 and provide a courtesy copy no later than 1:00 p.m. on October 2, 2015 [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 10/2/15.(MAW)
October 1, 2015 Filing 747 *NOTICE re: Proof of Service Re: Plaintiff's Oppositions to Defendant's Motions in Limine re: #742 , #744 , #709 , #710 , #711 , #712 , #713 , #714 , #715 , #739 , #719 , #720 , #740 , #721 , #722 , #723 , #724 , #725 , #726 , #727 , #745 , #728 , #741 , #730 , #731 , #732 , #733 , #734 , #736 , #737 PROOF OF SERVICE RE: PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITIONS TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS IN LIMINE 1 THROUGH 30 filed by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan) *Modified to correct event* (ATD). *Modified to correct document numbers/links on 10/2/2015* (REW).
October 1, 2015 Filing 746 *ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS re: #745 RESPONSE in Opposition re: MOTION in Limine #694 re: To Exclude Specific-Causation Testimony of Plaintiff's Medical Experts AMENDED MIL NO. 21 Exhibits to Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James in support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' MIL 21 filed by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #2 Exhibit 3 to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #3 Exhibit 4 to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #4 Exhibit 5 to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #5 Exhibit 6 to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #6 Exhibit 7 to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #7 Exhibit 8 to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #8 Exhibit 9 to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #9 Exhibit 10 to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #10 Exhibit 11 to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #11 Exhibit 12 to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #12 Exhibit 13 to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #13 Exhibit 14 to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #14 Exhibit 15 to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #15 Exhibit 16 to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #16 Exhibit 17 to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #17 Exhibit 18 to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #18 Exhibit 19 to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #19 Exhibit 20 to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #20 Exhibit 21 Part 1 to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #21 Exhibit 21 Part 2 to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #22 Exhibit 22 to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #23 Exhibit 23 to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #24 Exhibit 24 to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #25 Exhibit 25 to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #26 Exhibit 26 to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #27 Exhibit 27 to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #28 Exhibit 28 to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #29 Exhibit 29 to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #30 Exhibit 30 to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #31 Exhibit 31 to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #32 Exhibit 32 to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #33 Exhibit 33 to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #34 Exhibit 34 to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #35 Exhibit 35 to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #36 Exhibit 36 to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #37 Exhibit 37 to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #38 Exhibit 38 to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #39 Exhibit 39 to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #40 Exhibit 40 to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #41 Exhibit 41 to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan) *Modified from Response, link corrected on 10/2/2015* (REW).
October 1, 2015 Filing 745 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #694 MOTION in Limine re: To Exclude Specific-Causation Testimony of Plaintiff's Medical Experts AMENDED MIL NO. 21 filed by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James in support of)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
October 1, 2015 Filing 744 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #656 MOTION in Limine re: Exclude Plaintiffs' Experts' "Every Exposure," "Special Exposure," and "No Safe Level" Causation Opinions (Motion in Limine #2) filed by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James in support of, #2 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #3 Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #4 Exhibit 3 to the Declaration of Jordan Blmenfeld-James, #5 Exhibit 4 to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #6 Exhibit 5 to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #7 Exhibit 6 to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #8 Exhibit 7 to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #9 Exhibit 8 to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #10 Exhibit 9 to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #11 Exhibit 10 to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #12 Exhibit 11 to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #13 Exhibit 12 to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #14 Exhibit 13 to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #15 Exhibit 14 to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #16 Exhibit 15 to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #17 Exhibit 16 to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #18 Exhibit 17 to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #19 Exhibit 18 to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #20 Exhibit 19 to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #21 Exhibit 20 to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #22 Exhibit 21 Part 1 to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #23 Exhibit 21 Part 2 to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #24 Exhibit 22 to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #25 Exhibit 23 to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #26 Exhibit 24 to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #27 Exhibit 25 to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #28 Exhibit 26 to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #29 Exhibit 27 to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #30 Exhibit 28 to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #31 Exhibit 29 to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #32 Exhibit 30 to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #33 Exhibit 31 to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #34 Exhibit 32 to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #35 Exhibit 33 to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #36 Exhibit 34 to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #37 Exhibit 35 to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #38 Exhibit 36 to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #39 Exhibit 37 to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #40 Exhibit 38 to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #41 Exhibit 39 to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #42 Exhibit 40 to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #43 Exhibit 41 to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
October 1, 2015 Filing 743 RESPONSE to Motion re: #687 MOTION in Limine re: to Exclude Evidence of Learned Intermediary and/or Sophisticated User filed by CBS Corporation. (Kahn, Kathleen)
October 1, 2015 Filing 742 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #654 MOTION in Limine re: Concerning the Jeffrey J. Bair "Draft Memo" (Motion in Limine #1) filed by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James in support of, #2 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #3 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #4 Exhibit C to the Declaration of Jordan Blmenfeld-James, #5 Exhibit D to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #6 Exhibit E to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
October 1, 2015 Filing 741 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #678 MOTION in Limine re: No. 23 to Preclude Misleading References to Superseded Pleading in Unrelated Lawsuit filed by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James in support of, #2 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #3 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #4 Exhibit C to the Declaration of Jordan Blmenfeld-James)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
October 1, 2015 Filing 740 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #690 MOTION in Limine re: To Preclude Evidence of George Coulbourn's Medical Expenses, Medical Records, Pain and Suffering and Pre-Death Loss of Companionship AMENDED MIL NO. 13 filed by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James in support of, #2 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #3 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #4 Exhibit C to the Declaration of Jordan Blmenfeld-James, #5 Exhibit D to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
October 1, 2015 Filing 739 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #689 MOTION in Limine re: To Preclude Reference to Gasket and Packing Removal Studies and Videos Created by Material Analytic Services ("MAS") AMENDED MIL NO. 10 filed by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James in support of, #2 Exhibit A-J to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #3 Exhibit K-U to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
October 1, 2015 Filing 738 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #644 MOTION in Limine re: to Exclude Evidence of, Or Reference to Defendants Sued But Not Present at Trial filed by CBS Corporation. (Kahn, Kathleen) Modified on 10/2/2015 (REW).
October 1, 2015 Filing 737 *RESPONSE in Opposition re: #751 MOTION in Limine No. 30 to Limit the Scope of Testimony of Plaintiff's Expert Dr. Millette and Dr. Mark filed by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James in support of, #2 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #3 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan) *Modified to correct document number/link on 10/2/2015* (REW).
October 1, 2015 Filing 736 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #701 Joint MOTION in Limine re: Amended - Limit Testimony Or Evidence from Plaintiffs to The Time Periods of Alleged Exposure Between 1959 and 1966 filed by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James in support of, #2 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
October 1, 2015 Filing 735 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #643 MOTION in Limine re: to Exclude Evidened of, Or, Reference to Settlements Obtained In This Matter filed by CBS Corporation. (Kahn, Kathleen)
October 1, 2015 Filing 734 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #700 Joint MOTION in Limine re: Amended - Exclude Evidence of Alleged Exposure to Unspecified Pumps and Other Equipment filed by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
October 1, 2015 Filing 733 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #647 MOTION in Limine re: Preclude Testimony by Arnold Moore Regarding Warnings, joined by Goodyear, Copes Vulcan, Warren Pumps, CBS, William Powell filed by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James in support of, #2 A to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #3 B to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #4 C to the Declaration of Jordan Blmenfeld-James)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
October 1, 2015 Filing 732 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #699 Joint MOTION in Limine re: Amended - Preclude Testimony by George Coulbourn About the Source of Replacement Parts filed by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James in support of, #2 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #3 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
October 1, 2015 Filing 731 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #680 MOTION in Limine re: No. 25 to Preclude any Reference to Absence of Corporate Representative filed by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
October 1, 2015 Filing 730 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #679 MOTION in Limine re: No. 24 to Exclude Information regarding the alleged Health Hazards of Asbestos which comes from any Documents or Information of any Organization to which Moving Defendants did not belong or did not have Access to filed by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
October 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 729 ORDER: Defendant The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company (Goodyear) having filed a Notice of Settlement #708 ; IT IS ORDERED that this matter will be dismissed as to Defendant The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company only with prejudice within 30 days of the date of this order unless a stipulation to dismiss is filed prior to the dismissal date. IT IS FUTHER ORDERED denying as moot Defendant Goodyear's Motion in Limine Number 31 to Preclude Evidence of Post-Sale Conduct #653 and Motion in Limine Number 32 to Exclude References to or Discussion of Irrelevant Asbestos-Containing Products Manufactured by Goodyear #655 . Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 10/1/15. (MAW)
October 1, 2015 Filing 728 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #695 MOTION in Limine re: To Preclude Argument or Evidence Regarding Products Not at Issue AMENDED MIL NO. 22 filed by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
October 1, 2015 Filing 727 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #674 MOTION in Limine re: No. 20 To Preclude Comments Regarding Expert Witnesses Retained if Not Called to Testify filed by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
October 1, 2015 Filing 726 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #693 MOTION in Limine re: To Preclude Speculative, No-Probative, Prejudicial Evidence, Argument and Testimony Regarding Asbestos Exposure from Insulation Associated with Pumps AMENDED MIL NO. 19 filed by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
October 1, 2015 Filing 725 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #672 MOTION in Limine re: No. 18 To Exclude Evidence of Proposed EPA Ban on Asbestos Products Which Never Went Into Effect filed by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
October 1, 2015 Filing 724 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #692 MOTION in Limine re: To Preclude Reference to Decedent's Earning's History or Net Worth at Time of Death AMENDED MIL NO. 17 filed by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James in support of, #2 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #3 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
October 1, 2015 Filing 723 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #670 MOTION in Limine re: No. 16 to Preclude Voir Dire Questions Regarding Verdict Amounts or Ranges filed by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
October 1, 2015 Filing 722 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #691 MOTION in Limine re: To Preclude Evidence of Defendants' Post-Sale Conduct AMENDED MIL NO. 15 filed by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
October 1, 2015 Filing 721 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #668 MOTION in Limine re: No. 14 to Preclude "Golden Rule" Argument filed by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
October 1, 2015 Filing 720 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #666 MOTION in Limine re: No. 12 to Preclude Introduction of or Reference to Governmental or Regulatory Statements and Enactments to Prove Causation filed by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
October 1, 2015 Filing 719 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #665 MOTION in Limine re: No. 11 to Preclude Plaintiff from Using Corporate Representative Deposition Testimony in Lieu of Live Testimony filed by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James in support of, #2 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #3 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
October 1, 2015 Filing 718 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #675 MOTION in Limine re: to Preclude Any Defendant from Auguing That it is not held to the Knowledge of an Expert filed by Crane Company, Warren Pumps LLC. (Hendricks, John)
October 1, 2015 Filing 717 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #646 MOTION in Limine re: to Preclude Any Defendant from Arguing That a Defendant's Compliance with any Government Safety Standards Absolves that Defendant from Liabilty as a Matter of Law filed by Crane Company, Warren Pumps LLC. (Hendricks, John)
October 1, 2015 Filing 716 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #642 MOTION in Limine re: to exclude evidence or reference to other alleged exposures to asbestos for which there is no admissible evidence filed by Crane Company, Warren Pumps LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Hendricks, John)
October 1, 2015 Filing 715 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #688 MOTION in Limine re: To Preclude Evidence or Argument Regarding Defendants' Alleged Liability for Affixed and Replacement Parts AMENDED MIL NO. 9 filed by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
October 1, 2015 Filing 714 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #662 MOTION in Limine re: Exclude Evidence of Trade Associations in Which Defendants Were Not Members and Did Not Participate (Motion in Limine #8) filed by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
October 1, 2015 Filing 713 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #661 MOTION in Limine re: Trade Associations (Motion in Limine #7) filed by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
October 1, 2015 Filing 712 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #660 MOTION in Limine re: Preclude Evidence of Medical Illness of Any Person Other Than Decedent (Motion in Limine #6) filed by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
October 1, 2015 Filing 711 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #659 MOTION in Limine re: Exclude All Pictures, Photographs, or Videotapes Showing the Decedent or Other Person in a Condition of Ill Health or Weakness (Motion in Limine #5) filed by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
October 1, 2015 Filing 710 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #658 MOTION in Limine re: Prohibit Use of the Terms "Asbestos Industry," "Members of the Asbestos Industry," "Asbestos Cancer," or "Asbestos Victim" In the Presence of the Jury (Motion in Limine #4) filed by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
October 1, 2015 Filing 709 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #657 MOTION in Limine re: Exclude Evidence of Out-of-State Conduct or Conduct to Non-Parties to Support Punitive Damages (Motion in Limine #3) filed by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
October 1, 2015 Filing 708 NOTICE of Settlement by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Hoffman, Stephen)
September 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 707 ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting #706 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
September 30, 2015 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX163423 as to Geoffrey Davis. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 30, 2015 Filing 706 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Geoffrey Davis on behalf of Crane Company, and Crane Environmental Incorporated. (BAS)
September 29, 2015 Filing 705 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #703 Statement Notice of Filing Joint Proposed Final Pretrial Order by Defendants Crane Company, Warren Pumps LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement to Exhibit C, #2 Exhibit S1, #3 Exhibit V1A, #4 Exhibit V1B, #5 Supplement to Exhibit EE)(Hendricks, John)
September 29, 2015 Filing 704 *NOTICE of Filing Proposed Joint Final Pretrial Order filed by Crane Company, Warren Pumps LLC. (Hendricks, John) *Modified from Lodged Document on 9/30/2015; document may be duplicate of main document in entry #703 * (REW).
September 28, 2015 Filing 703 *NOTICE of Filing Proposed Joint Pretrial Order by Defendants Crane Company, Warren Pumps LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B(1), #4 Exhibit B(2), #5 Exhibit B(3), #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I, #13 Exhibit J, #14 Exhibit K, #15 Exhibit L, #16 Exhibit M, #17 Exhibit N, #18 Exhibit O, #19 Exhibit P, #20 Exhibit Q, #21 Exhibit R, #22 Exhibit S, #23 Exhibit T, #24 Exhibit U, #25 Exhibit V 1 - V28, #26 Exhibit W, #27 Exhibit X, #28 Exhibit Y, #29 Exhibit Z, #30 Exhibit AA, #31 Exhibit BB, #32 Exhibit CC, #33 Exhibit DD, #34 Exhibit EE Pt 1, #35 Exhibit EE Pt2)(Hendricks, John) *Modified from Statement on 9/29/2015* (REW).
September 28, 2015 Filing 702 TRIAL BRIEF Regarding The Government Contractor Defense by Crane Company. (Hendricks, John)
September 28, 2015 Filing 701 Joint MOTION in Limine re: Amended - Limit Testimony Or Evidence from Plaintiffs to The Time Periods of Alleged Exposure Between 1959 and 1966 by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Bhatheja, Anoop)
September 28, 2015 Filing 700 Joint MOTION in Limine re: Amended - Exclude Evidence of Alleged Exposure to Unspecified Pumps and Other Equipment by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Bhatheja, Anoop)
September 28, 2015 Filing 699 Joint MOTION in Limine re: Amended - Preclude Testimony by George Coulbourn About the Source of Replacement Parts by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Bhatheja, Anoop)
September 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 698 ORDER: On September 22, 2015, Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation filed three Motions in Limine. They do not comply with LRCiv 7.1(b)(1). IT IS ORDERED striking Defendant's Motions in Limine docket numbers #645 , #648 and #651 for failure to comply with LRCiv. 7.1(b)(1). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant re-file the Motions in Limine in compliance with LRCiv. 7.1(b)(1) within 2 days of the date of this order. All footnotes shall be in the same font size as the font in the body of the documents. Counsel do not need to re-file the attachments to the Motions in Limine [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 9/28/15.(MAW)
September 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 697 ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting #696 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
September 25, 2015 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX163228 as to David Greenstone. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 25, 2015 Filing 696 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney David Greenstone on behalf of Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (BAS)
September 24, 2015 Filing 695 MOTION in Limine re: To Preclude Argument or Evidence Regarding Products Not at Issue AMENDED MIL NO. 22 by Warren Pumps LLC. (Hendricks, John)
September 24, 2015 Filing 694 MOTION in Limine re: To Exclude Specific-Causation Testimony of Plaintiff's Medical Experts AMENDED MIL NO. 21 by Crane Company, Warren Pumps LLC. (Hendricks, John)
September 24, 2015 Filing 693 MOTION in Limine re: To Preclude Speculative, No-Probative, Prejudicial Evidence, Argument and Testimony Regarding Asbestos Exposure from Insulation Associated with Pumps AMENDED MIL NO. 19 by Warren Pumps LLC. (Hendricks, John)
September 24, 2015 Filing 692 MOTION in Limine re: To Preclude Reference to Decedent's Earning's History or Net Worth at Time of Death AMENDED MIL NO. 17 by Crane Company, Warren Pumps LLC. (Hendricks, John)
September 24, 2015 Filing 691 MOTION in Limine re: To Preclude Evidence of Defendants' Post-Sale Conduct AMENDED MIL NO. 15 by Warren Pumps LLC. (Hendricks, John)
September 24, 2015 Filing 690 MOTION in Limine re: To Preclude Evidence of George Coulbourn's Medical Expenses, Medical Records, Pain and Suffering and Pre-Death Loss of Companionship AMENDED MIL NO. 13 by Crane Company, Warren Pumps LLC. (Hendricks, John)
September 24, 2015 Filing 689 MOTION in Limine re: To Preclude Reference to Gasket and Packing Removal Studies and Videos Created by Material Analytic Services ("MAS") AMENDED MIL NO. 10 by Crane Company, Warren Pumps LLC. (Hendricks, John)
September 24, 2015 Filing 688 MOTION in Limine re: To Preclude Evidence or Argument Regarding Defendants' Alleged Liability for Affixed and Replacement Parts AMENDED MIL NO. 9 by Warren Pumps LLC. (Hendricks, John)
September 24, 2015 Filing 687 MOTION in Limine re: TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF LEARNED INTERMEDIARY AND/OR SOPHISTICATED USER by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
September 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 686 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED striking Defendants' Motions in Limine docket numbers: #663 , #664 , #667 , #669 , #671 , #673 , #676 , #677 and #683 and Plaintiff's Motion in Limine No. 8 #649 for failure to comply with LRCiv. 7.1 (b)(1). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff and Defendants re-file the Motions in Limine in compliance with LRCiv. 7.1(b)(1) within 2 days of the date of this Order. All footnotes shall be in the same font size as the font in the body of the documents. Counsel do not need to refile the attachments to the Motions in Limine [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 9/24/15.(MAW)
September 24, 2015 Filing 685 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsey M Gomez-Gray on behalf of Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Gomez-Gray, Lindsey)
September 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 684 ORDER: After review of the docket the Court notes that 39 Motions in Limine were filed on September 22, 2015. To ensure that the Court has all the Motions in Limine and Responses, counsel are directed to submit courtesy copies (hard copies) to the Court even if the filing is less than 10 pages. Pursuant to Stipulation to Extend Time to file Motions in Limine and the Responses, the responses are due no later than October 1, 2015. To ensure that the Court is fully prepared for the Pretrial Conference on October 5, 2015, counsel are directed to send the courtesy copies of the responses to the Motions in Limine in a manner that guarantees delivery no later than 10:30 a.m. on October 2, 2015. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 9/23/15. (MAW)
September 22, 2015 Filing 683 *STRICKEN on 9/24/2015 per #686 Order* Joinder re: #648 Joint MOTION in Limine re: Exclude Evidence of Alleged Exposures To Unspecified Pumps and Other Equipment, joined by Copes Vulcan joined by Defendant Warren Pumps LLC. (Hendricks, John) Modified on 9/24/2015 (MAW).
September 22, 2015 Filing 682 Joinder re: #645 MOTION in Limine re: Preclude Testimony by George Coulbourn About The Source of Replacement Parts, joined by Goodyear, Copes Vulcan, CBS, William Powell and Crane Co. by Defendant Warren Pumps LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Hendricks, John)
September 22, 2015 Filing 681 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #674 MOTION in Limine re: No. 20 To Preclude Comments Regarding Expert Witnesses Retained if Not Called to Testify , #669 MOTION in Limine re: No. 15 to Preclude Evidence of Defendants' Post-Sale Conduct , #665 MOTION in Limine re: No. 11 to Preclude Plaintiff from Using Corporate Representative Deposition Testimony in Lieu of Live Testimony , #664 MOTION in Limine re: No. 10 to Preclude Reference to Gasket and Packing Removal Studies and Videos Created by Material Analytic Services ("MAS") , #678 MOTION in Limine re: No. 23 to Preclude Misleading References to Superseded Pleading in Unrelated Lawsuit , #666 MOTION in Limine re: No. 12 to Preclude Introduction of or Reference to Governmental or Regulatory Statements and Enactments to Prove Causation , #676 MOTION in Limine re: No. 21 to Exclude Specific Causation Testimony of Plaintiff's Medical Experts , #668 MOTION in Limine re: No. 14 to Preclude "Golden Rule" Argument , #670 MOTION in Limine re: No. 16 to Preclude Voir Dire Questions Regarding Verdict Amounts or Ranges , #679 MOTION in Limine re: No. 24 to Exclude Information regarding the alleged Health Hazards of Asbestos which comes from any Documents or Information of any Organization to which Moving Defendants did not belong or did not have Access to , #672 MOTION in Limine re: No. 18 To Exclude Evidence of Proposed EPA Ban on Asbestos Products Which Never Went Into Effect , #680 MOTION in Limine re: No. 25 to Preclude any Reference to Absence of Corporate Representative , #667 MOTION in Limine re: No. 13 to Preclude Evidence of George Coulbourn's Medical Expenses, Medical Records, Pain and Suffering and Pre-death Loss of Companionship , #671 MOTION in Limine re: No. 17 To Preclude Reference to Decedent's Earning's History or Net Worth at Time of Death , #677 MOTION in Limine re: No. 22 To Preclude Argument or Evidence Regarding Products not at Issue , #663 MOTION in Limine re: No. 9 to Preclude Evidence or Argument Regarding Defendants' Alleged Liability for Affixed and Replacement Parts , #673 MOTION in Limine re: No. 19 to Preclude Speculative, Non-Probative, Prejudicial Evidence, Argument and Testimony Regarding Asbestos Exposure from Insulation Associated with Pumps by Defendants Crane Company, Warren Pumps LLC. (Hendricks, John)
September 22, 2015 Filing 680 MOTION in Limine re: No. 25 to Preclude any Reference to Absence of Corporate Representative by Warren Pumps LLC. (Hendricks, John)
September 22, 2015 Filing 679 MOTION in Limine re: No. 24 to Exclude Information regarding the alleged Health Hazards of Asbestos which comes from any Documents or Information of any Organization to which Moving Defendants did not belong or did not have Access to by Warren Pumps LLC. (Hendricks, John)
September 22, 2015 Filing 678 MOTION in Limine re: No. 23 to Preclude Misleading References to Superseded Pleading in Unrelated Lawsuit by Crane Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Hendricks, John)
September 22, 2015 Filing 677 *STRICKEN on 9/24/2015 per #686 Order* MOTION in Limine re: No. 22 To Preclude Argument or Evidence Regarding Products not at Issue by Warren Pumps LLC. (Hendricks, John) Modified on 9/24/2015 (MAW).
September 22, 2015 Filing 676 *STRICKEN on 9/24/2015 per #686 Order* MOTION in Limine re: No. 21 to Exclude Specific Causation Testimony of Plaintiff's Medical Experts by Crane Company, Warren Pumps LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-3, #2 Exhibit 4 - Pt 1, #3 Exhibit 4 - Pt 2, #4 Exhibit 5-6, #5 Exhibit 7, #6 Exhibit 8-10, #7 Exhibit 11-14)(Hendricks, John) Modified on 9/24/2015 (MAW).
September 22, 2015 Filing 675 MOTION in Limine re: TO PRECLUDE ANY DEFENDANT FROM ARGUING THAT IT IS NOT HELD TO THE KNOWLEDGE OF AN EXPERT by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
September 22, 2015 Filing 674 MOTION in Limine re: No. 20 To Preclude Comments Regarding Expert Witnesses Retained if Not Called to Testify by Warren Pumps LLC. (Hendricks, John)
September 22, 2015 Filing 673 *STRICKEN on 9/24/2015 per #686 Order* MOTION in Limine re: No. 19 to Preclude Speculative, Non-Probative, Prejudicial Evidence, Argument and Testimony Regarding Asbestos Exposure from Insulation Associated with Pumps by Warren Pumps LLC. (Hendricks, John) Modified on 9/24/2015 (MAW).
September 22, 2015 Filing 672 MOTION in Limine re: No. 18 To Exclude Evidence of Proposed EPA Ban on Asbestos Products Which Never Went Into Effect by Warren Pumps LLC. (Hendricks, John)
September 22, 2015 Filing 671 *STRICKEN on 9/24/2015 per #686 Order* MOTION in Limine re: No. 17 To Preclude Reference to Decedent's Earning's History or Net Worth at Time of Death by Crane Company, Warren Pumps LLC. (Hendricks, John) Modified on 9/24/2015 (MAW).
September 22, 2015 Filing 670 MOTION in Limine re: No. 16 to Preclude Voir Dire Questions Regarding Verdict Amounts or Ranges by Warren Pumps LLC. (Hendricks, John)
September 22, 2015 Filing 669 *STRICKEN on 9/24/2015 per #686 Order* MOTION in Limine re: No. 15 to Preclude Evidence of Defendants' Post-Sale Conduct by Warren Pumps LLC. (Hendricks, John) Modified on 9/24/2015 (MAW).
September 22, 2015 Filing 668 MOTION in Limine re: No. 14 to Preclude "Golden Rule" Argument by Crane Company, Warren Pumps LLC. (Hendricks, John)
September 22, 2015 Filing 667 *STRICKEN on 9/24/2015 per #686 Order* MOTION in Limine re: No. 13 to Preclude Evidence of George Coulbourn's Medical Expenses, Medical Records, Pain and Suffering and Pre-death Loss of Companionship by Crane Company, Warren Pumps LLC. (Hendricks, John) Modified on 9/24/2015 (MAW).
September 22, 2015 Filing 666 MOTION in Limine re: No. 12 to Preclude Introduction of or Reference to Governmental or Regulatory Statements and Enactments to Prove Causation by Warren Pumps LLC. (Hendricks, John)
September 22, 2015 Filing 665 MOTION in Limine re: No. 11 to Preclude Plaintiff from Using Corporate Representative Deposition Testimony in Lieu of Live Testimony by Crane Company. (Hendricks, John)
September 22, 2015 Filing 664 *STRICKEN on 9/24/2015 per #686 Order* MOTION in Limine re: No. 10 to Preclude Reference to Gasket and Packing Removal Studies and Videos Created by Material Analytic Services ("MAS") by Crane Company, Warren Pumps LLC. (Hendricks, John) Modified on 9/24/2015 (MAW).
September 22, 2015 Filing 663 *STRICKEN on 9/24/2015 per #686 Order* MOTION in Limine re: No. 9 to Preclude Evidence or Argument Regarding Defendants' Alleged Liability for Affixed and Replacement Parts by Warren Pumps LLC. (Hendricks, John) Modified on 9/24/2015 (MAW).
September 22, 2015 Filing 662 MOTION in Limine re: Exclude Evidence of Trade Associations in Which Defendants Were Not Members and Did Not Participate (Motion in Limine #8) by CBS Corporation. (Kahn, Kathleen)
September 22, 2015 Filing 661 MOTION in Limine re: Trade Associations (Motion in Limine #7) by CBS Corporation. (Kahn, Kathleen)
September 22, 2015 Filing 660 MOTION in Limine re: Preclude Evidence of Medical Illness of Any Person Other Than Decedent (Motion in Limine #6) by CBS Corporation. (Kahn, Kathleen)
September 22, 2015 Filing 659 MOTION in Limine re: Exclude All Pictures, Photographs, or Videotapes Showing the Decedent or Other Person in a Condition of Ill Health or Weakness (Motion in Limine #5) by CBS Corporation. (Kahn, Kathleen)
September 22, 2015 Filing 658 MOTION in Limine re: Prohibit Use of the Terms "Asbestos Industry," "Members of the Asbestos Industry," "Asbestos Cancer," or "Asbestos Victim" In the Presence of the Jury (Motion in Limine #4) by CBS Corporation. (Kahn, Kathleen)
September 22, 2015 Filing 657 MOTION in Limine re: Exclude Evidence of Out-of-State Conduct or Conduct to Non-Parties to Support Punitive Damages (Motion in Limine #3) by CBS Corporation. (Kahn, Kathleen)
September 22, 2015 Filing 656 MOTION in Limine re: Exclude Plaintiffs' Experts' "Every Exposure," "Special Exposure," and "No Safe Level" Causation Opinions (Motion in Limine #2) by CBS Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E, #2 Exhibit F-H)(Kahn, Kathleen)
September 22, 2015 Filing 655 MOTION in Limine re: NO. 32 TO EXCLUDE REFERENCES TO OR DISCUSSION OF IRRELEVANT ASBESTOS-CONTAINING PRODUCTS MANUFACTURED BY GOODYEAR by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hoffman, Stephen)
September 22, 2015 Filing 654 MOTION in Limine re: Concerning the Jeffrey J. Bair "Draft Memo" (Motion in Limine #1) by CBS Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit)(Kahn, Kathleen)
September 22, 2015 Filing 653 MOTION in Limine re: TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE OF POST-SALE CONDUCT by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hoffman, Stephen)
September 22, 2015 Filing 652 *Declaration of James Scadden in Support of Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation Motions In Lime (1) to Preclude Testimony By Coulbourn About the Source of Replacement Parts; (2) To Limit The Testimony of Expert Arnold Moore; (3) To Limit the Testimony to the Period of Alleged Exposure; and (4) to Exclude Evidence of Alleged Exposures to Unspecified Pumps and Other Equipment by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Sparks, J) *Modified on 9/30/2015 - motion termed and document to reflect a declaration (MAW).
September 22, 2015 Filing 651 *STRICKEN on 9/28/2015* Joint MOTION in Limine re: Limit Testimony or Evidence from Plaintiffs to the Time Periods of Alleged Exposure Between 1959 and 1966, joined by Goodyear, Crane Co. and Warren Pumps, Copes Vulcan, CBS, William Powell by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Sparks, J) Modified on 9/28/2015 per #698 Order (MAW).
September 22, 2015 Filing 650 *STRICKEN on 10/2/15* MOTION in Limine No. 30 to Limit the Scope of Testimony of Plaintiff's Expert Dr. Millette and Dr. Mark by William Powell Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-B)(Boblick, Jason) Modified on 9/25/2015 (REW). Modified on 10/2/2015 per #748 Order (MAW).
September 22, 2015 Filing 649 *STRICKEN on 9/24/2015 per #686 Order* MOTION in Limine re: TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF LEARNED INTERMEDIARY AND/OR SOPHISTICATED USER by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan) Modified on 9/24/2015 (MAW).
September 22, 2015 Filing 648 *STRICKEN on 9/28/2015* Joint MOTION in Limine re: Exclude Evidence of Alleged Exposures To Unspecified Pumps and Other Equipment, joined by Copes Vulcan by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Sparks, J) Modified on 9/28/2015 per #698 Order (MAW).
September 22, 2015 Filing 647 MOTION in Limine re: Preclude Testimony by Arnold Moore Regarding Warnings, joined by Goodyear, Copes Vulcan, Warren Pumps, CBS, William Powell by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Sparks, J)
September 22, 2015 Filing 646 MOTION in Limine re: TO PRECLUDE ANY DEFENDANT FROM ARGUING THAT A DEFENDANT'S COMPLIANCE WITH ANY GOVERNMENT SAFETY STANDARDS ABSOLVES THAT DEFENDANT FROM LIABILITY AS A MATTER OF LAW by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
September 22, 2015 Filing 645 *STRICKEN on 9/28/2015* MOTION in Limine re: Preclude Testimony by George Coulbourn About The Source of Replacement Parts, joined by Goodyear, Copes Vulcan, CBS, William Powell and Crane Co. by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Sparks, J) Modified on 9/28/2015 per #698 Order (MAW).
September 22, 2015 Filing 644 MOTION in Limine re: TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF, OR REFERENCE TO DEFENDANTS SUED BUT NOT PRESENT AT TRIAL by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
September 22, 2015 Filing 643 MOTION in Limine re: TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OF, OR REFERENCE TO SETTLEMENTS OBTAINED IN THIS MATTER by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
September 22, 2015 Filing 642 MOTION in Limine re: to exclude evidence or reference to other alleged exposures to asbestos for which there is no admissible evidence by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
September 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 641 ORDER pursuant to #640 Stipulation: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED extending the time for all parties to file their Motions in Limine from Monday, September 21, 2015, to Tuesday, September 22, 2015, and extending the time for all parties to file responses to Motions In Limine from Wednesday, September 30, 2015, to Thursday, October 1, 2015. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 9/22/15. (MAW)
September 21, 2015 Filing 640 STIPULATION to Extend the Time to File Motions in Limine by Crane Company, Warren Pumps LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Beiermeister, Kathleen) Modified on 9/22/2015 (REW).
August 7, 2015 Filing 639 *REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan) Modified on 8/7/2015 (REK). *Document filed in wrong case. Attorney refiled document in correct case on 8/7/2015 (KGM).
August 6, 2015 Filing 638 NOTICE OF WAIVER OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE by Joseph Shayne Kiefer, counsel for Defendant Parker-Hannifin Corporation. (Kiefer, Joseph)
August 6, 2015 Filing 637 NOTICE OF WAIVER OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE by Edward G Hochuli and David Lee Stout, counsel for Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Stout, David)
August 6, 2015 Filing 636 NOTICE OF WAIVER OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE by Troy Daniel Roberts, counsel for Defendant Parker-Hannifin Corporation. (Roberts, Troy)
August 5, 2015 Filing 635 NOTICE OF WAIVER OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE by Tophas Anderson, IV, counsel for Defendant Ingersoll-Rand Company. (Anderson, Tophas)
August 4, 2015 Filing 634 *NOTICE of Waiver of Electronic Service by Ingersoll-Rand Company, Trane US Incorporated . (Romano, Carol) *Modified to correct event - attorney noticed on 8/5/2015 (REK).
July 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 633 ORDER, granting #631 the Application and for Substitution of counsel for Defendant Flowserve US Incorporated; permitting the substitution of Larry J Crown and the law firm of Titus Brueckner & Levine, PLC as attorneys of record for Defendant Flowserve US Incorporated; permitting Joseph Brophy and the law firm of Jennings, Haug & Cunningham, LLP to withdraw as Flowserve US Incorporated's attorneys of record. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 7/29/15. (REW)
July 28, 2015 Filing 632 NOTICE of Errata re: #629 Application to Withdraw and for Substitution of Counsel for Defendant Flowserve Corporation by Defendant Flowserve US Incorporated.. (Brophy, Joseph)
July 28, 2015 Filing 631 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney, MOTION to Substitute Attorney Application to Withdraw and for Substitution of Counsel for Defendant Flowserve US Incorporated by Flowserve US Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Approving Substitution of Counsel for Defendant Flowserve US Incorporated)(Brophy, Joseph)
July 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 630 ORDER: On July 27, 2015, Defendant Flowserve Corporation filed an Application to Withdraw and for Substitution of Counsel #629 . IT IS ORDERED that the Application to Withdraw and for Substitution of Counsel will be denied within 3 days of the date of this order if counsel does not comply with the ECF Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, Section II(G), specifically, subparagraph 1b. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 7/28/15. (MAW)
July 27, 2015 Filing 629 APPLICATION re: Application to Withdraw and for Substitution of Counsel for Defendant Flowserve Corporation by Defendant Flowserve Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Approving Substitution of Counsel for Defendant Flowserve Corporation)(Brophy, Joseph) Modified on 7/28/2015 (REW).
May 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 628 ORDER, granting the #627 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney and permitting the substitution of Larry J Crown and the law firm of Titus Brueckner & Levine, PLC as attorneys of records for Defendant Copes Vulcan, Inc; permitting the law firm of Jennings, Haug & Cunningham, LLP to withdraw as counsel for Defendant Copes Vulcan, Inc. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 5/20/15.(REW)
May 19, 2015 Filing 627 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Application to Withdraw and for Substitution of Counsel for Defendant Copes Vulcan, Inc. by Copes Vulcan Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Permitting Withdraw and Substitution of Counsel for Defendant Copes Vulcan, Inc.)(Brophy, Joseph) Modified on 5/20/2015 (REW).
April 28, 2015 Filing 626 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS/FIRM NAME by Jordan Blumenfeld-James. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
March 11, 2015 Filing 625 *AMENDED 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company &. (Hoffman, Stephen) *Modified to correct event on 3/12/2015* (REW).
March 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 624 ORDER: The Court has reviewed the Proposed Jury Trial Dates filed on March 2, 2015 #623 . IT IS ORDERED setting a Jury Trial on November 10, 2015, at 9:00 a.m. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED setting a Final Pretrial Conference on October 5, 2015, at 10:30 a.m. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Joint Proposed Pretrial Order shall be lodged no later than September 28, 2015. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Motions in Limine shall be filed no later than September 21, 2015. Responses shall be filed no later than September 30, 2015. No replies. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 3/4/15. (MAW)
March 2, 2015 Filing 623 STATUS REPORT by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
February 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 622 ORDER: On February 11, 2015, the Court issued an Order denying Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment and Ordered that the parties "confer and prepare a joint status report to propose a jury trial date." On February 25, 2015, the parties filed a Joint Status Report to Propose a Jury Trial Date yet proposed no trial dates as Ordered. Instead, the Status Report advised the Court of dates they are not available for trial. IT IS ORDERED that counsel submit a Proposed Jury Trial Date as Ordered in this Court's February 11, 2015, Order within 3 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 2/26/15. (MAW)
February 25, 2015 Filing 621 STATUS REPORT by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 620 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED denying #527 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying #529 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying #531 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying #533 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying #536 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying #541 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying #543 Motion for Summary Judgment or, Alternatively, Partial Summary Judgment; denying #548 Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment ; and denying #551 Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED instructing the parties to confer and prepare a joint status report to propose a jury trial date. This joint status report should be filed no later than fourteen days (14) from the date of this Order [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 2/11/15.(MAW)
January 30, 2015 Filing 619 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Susan R Bolton: Motion Hearing held on 1/30/2015. Argument held. IT IS ORDERED taking under advisement #527 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #529 Motion for Summary Judgment, #531 Motion for Summary Judgment, #533 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #536 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #541 Motion for Summary Judgment, #543 Motion for Summary Judgment, #548 Motion for Summary Judgment and #551 Motion for Summary Judgment. APPEARANCES: Lisa Barley, Jennifer Barlett, Jordan Blumenfeld-James and James Campbell appearing on behalf of Dev Sethi for Plaintiffs. John Hendricks, Jason Boblick, Stephen Bressler, Christopher Conley, John Sticht, James Scadden, Mandi Karvis appearing on behalf of J. Steven Sparks, Joseph Brophy and Scott McClure appearing on behalf of Stephen Hoffman for Defendants. (Court Reporter Liz Lemke) Hearing held 9:36 AM to 11:00 AM and 11:11 AM to 11:42 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW)
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 618 ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting #617 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
January 16, 2015 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX154330 as to Christopher George Conley. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
January 16, 2015 Filing 617 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Christopher George Conley on behalf of CBS Corporation. (BAS)
January 16, 2015 Filing 616 NOTICE of Errata re: #602 Reply to Response to Motion by Defendant CBS Corporation.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Kahn, Kathleen)
January 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 615 ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting #614 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
January 9, 2015 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX154105 as to Lisa Barley. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
January 9, 2015 Filing 614 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Lisa Barley on behalf of Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (BAS)
January 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 613 ORDER, pursuant to Parties' #611 Stipulation of Dismissal, all claims filed in this action are dismissed with prejudice as to METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE only, with each party to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 1/7/15. (REW)
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 612 ORDER, dismissing this case with prejudice as to Defendant FMC Corporation on behalf of its former Peerless Pump Business only. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 1/6/15. (REW)
January 6, 2015 Filing 611 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Metropolitan Life Insurance Company by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
December 15, 2014 Filing 610 *DECLARATION of Christopher R. Stovall Supplemental in Support of Defendant Flowserve US INC., Solely as Successor to Edward Valve, Inc.'s Reply #608 and Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment by Defendant Flowserve US Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit S)(Stovall, Christopher) *Modified to add document number/link on 12/16/2014* (REW).
December 15, 2014 Filing 609 STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS re: #608 Reply to Response to Motion by Flowserve US Incorporated. (Stovall, Christopher)
December 15, 2014 Filing 608 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #551 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Flowserve US Incorporated. (Stovall, Christopher)
December 15, 2014 Filing 607 DECLARATION of John Sticht in support of Copes Vulcan's Reply and Motion for Summary Judgment re: #605 Reply to Response to Motion, #606 Statement by Defendant Copes Vulcan Incorporated. (Sticht, John)
December 15, 2014 Filing 606 STATEMENT of Facts in Support of Copes Vulcan's Reply and Motion for Summary Judgment re: #605 Reply to Response to Motion by Defendant Copes Vulcan Incorporated. (Sticht, John)
December 15, 2014 Filing 605 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #548 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment filed by Copes Vulcan Incorporated. (Sticht, John)
December 10, 2014 Filing 604 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #527 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment re: Punitive Damages filed by William Powell Company. (Boblick, Jason)
December 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 603 ORDER granting #593 Stipulation : Replies due 12/15/2014 re: #548 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment filed by Copes Vulcan Incorporated, #551 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Flowserve US Incorporated. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 12/10/2014. (TCA)
December 10, 2014 Filing 602 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #529 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CBS Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Kahn, Kathleen)
December 10, 2014 Filing 601 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #536 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by IMO Industries Incorporated. (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
December 10, 2014 Filing 600 SUPPLEMENT Declaration of Kathleen L. Beiermeister re: #599 Reply to Response to Motion by Defendant Crane Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B)(Beiermeister, Kathleen)
December 10, 2014 Filing 599 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #533 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Crane Company. (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
December 10, 2014 Filing 598 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #531 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Warren Pumps LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-2)(Beiermeister, Kathleen)
December 10, 2014 Filing 597 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #543 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Counterstatement of Facts in Reply to Plaintiffs' Additional Statement of Facts)(Scadden, James)
December 10, 2014 Filing 596 STATEMENT of Facts In Opposition To Plaintiffs' Additional Statement Of Facts In Response To Goodyear's Motion For Summary Judgment re: #595 Reply to Response to Motion Controverting Statement Of Facts by Defendant Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Hoffman, Stephen)
December 10, 2014 Filing 595 *REPLY to Response to Motion re: #541 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Hoffman, Stephen) *Document not in compliance with L.R.Civ 7.1(c); attorney notified on 12/11/2014 (LFIG).
December 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 594 ORDER: On December 9, 2014, Defendant Copes Vulcan, Inc. and Flowserve US, Inc. filed a Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Defendants Edwards Valve and Copes Vulcan's Replies in Support of Their Motions for Summary Judgment. IT IS ORDERED that the Stipulation to Extend Deadline #593 will be denied within 3 days of the date of this order if counsel does not comply with the ECF Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, Section II(G), specifically, subparagraph 1b. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 12/10/14. (MAW)
December 9, 2014 Filing 593 STIPULATION to Extend Deadlines for Defendants Copes Vulcan & Flowserve US Replies in Support of Their Motions for Summary Judgment by Copes Vulcan Incorporated, Flowserve US Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sticht, John)
November 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 592 ORDER: Defendant FMC Corporation having filed a Notice of Settlement #588 ; IT IS ORDERED that this matter will be dismissed as to Defendant FMC Corporation on behalf of its former Peerless Pump Business with prejudice within 30 days of the date of this order unless a stipulation to dismiss is filed prior to the dismissal date. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant FMC Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment is withdrawn #545 . Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 11/24/14. (MAW)
November 21, 2014 Filing 591 DECLARATION of Jennifer L. Bartlett in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Copes Vulcan, Inc.'s re: #548 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Bartlett Declaration, #2 Exhibit B to Bartlett Declaration, #3 Exhibit C to Bartlett Declaration, #4 Exhibit D to Further Expert Briefing, #5 Exhibit E to Bartlett Declaration, #6 Exhibit F to Bartlett Declaration, #7 Exhibit G to Bartlett Declaration, #8 Exhibit H to Bartlett Declaration, #9 Exhibit I to Bartlett Declaration, #10 Exhibit J to Bartlett Declaration, #11 Exhibit K to Bartlett Declaration, #12 Exhibit L to Bartlett Declaration, #13 Exhibit M to Bartlett Declaration, #14 Exhibit N to Bartlett Declaration)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
November 21, 2014 Filing 590 STATEMENT of Controverting Facts in Opposition to Copes Vulcan, Inc.'s re: #549 Statement of Uncontroverted Material Facts filed by Plaintiff Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
November 21, 2014 Filing 589 RESPONSE to Motion re: #548 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment of Copes Vulcan, Inc. filed by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
November 21, 2014 Filing 588 NOTICE of Settlement and Withdrawal of Motion for Summary Judgment or for Partial Summary Judgment by FMC Corporation. (Stovall, Christopher)
November 21, 2014 Filing 587 DECLARATION of Brian P. Barrow in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Flowserve US, Inc.'s re: #551 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Brian P. Barrow, #2 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Brian P. Barrow, #3 Exhibit C to the Declaration of Brian P. Barrow, #4 Exhibit D to the Declaration of Brian P. Barrow, #5 Exhibit E to the Declaration of Brian P. Barrow, #6 Exhibit F to the Declaration of Brian P. Barrow, #7 Exhibit G to the Declaration of Brian P. Barrow, #8 Exhibit H to the Declaration of Brian P. Barrow, #9 Exhibit I to the Declaration of Brian P. Barrow, #10 Exhibit J to the Declaration of Brian P. Barrow, #11 Exhibit K to the Declaration of Brian P. Barrow)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
November 21, 2014 Filing 586 STATEMENT of Controverting Facts in Opposition to Flowserve US, Inc.'s re: #552 Statement of Uncontroverted Material Facts filed by Plaintiff Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
November 21, 2014 Filing 585 RESPONSE to Motion re: #551 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative for Partial Summary Judgment of Flowserve US, Inc. filed by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
November 14, 2014 Filing 584 DECLARATION of Brian P. Barrow in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to CBS Corporation's re: #529 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Brian P. Barrow, #2 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Brian P. Barrow, #3 Exhibit C to the Declaration of Brian P. Barrow, #4 Exhibit D to the Declaration of Brian P. Barrow, #5 Exhibit E to the Declaration of Brian P. Barrow, #6 Exhibit F to the Declaration of Brian P. Barrow, #7 Exhibit G to the Declaration of Brian P. Barrow, #8 Exhibit H to the Declaration of Brian P. Barrow, #9 Exhibit I to the Declaration of Brian P. Barrow, #10 Exhibit J to the Declaration of Brian P. Barrow, #11 Exhibit K to the Declaration of Brian P. Barrow)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
November 14, 2014 Filing 583 STATEMENT of Controverting Facts in Opposition to CBS Corporation's re: #530 Statement of Uncontroverted Material Facts filed by Plaintiff Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
November 14, 2014 Filing 582 RESPONSE to Motion re: #529 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Defendant CBS Corporation filed by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
November 14, 2014 Filing 581 DECLARATION of Jennifer L. Bartlett in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Warren Pumps, LCC's re: #531 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Bartlett Declaration, #2 Exhibit B to Bartlett Declaration, #3 Exhibit C to Bartlett Declaration, #4 Exhibit D to Bartlett Declaration, #5 Exhibit E to Bartlett Declaration, #6 Exhibit F to Bartlett Declaration, #7 Exhibit G to Bartlett Declaration, #8 Exhibit H to Bartlett Declaration, #9 Exhibit I to Bartlett Declaration, #10 Exhibit J to Bartlett Declaration, #11 Exhibit K to Bartlett Declaration, #12 Exhibit L to Bartlett Declaration, #13 Exhibit M to Bartlett Declaration, #14 Exhibit N to Bartlett Declaration, #15 Exhibit O to Bartlett Declaration, #16 Exhibit P to Bartlett Declaration, #17 Exhibit Q to Bartlett Declaration, #18 Exhibit R1 to Bartlett Declaration, #19 Exhibit R2 to Bartlett Declaration, #20 Exhibit S to Bartlett Declaration, #21 Exhibit T to Bartlett Declaration, #22 Exhibit U to Bartlett Declaration)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
November 14, 2014 Filing 580 STATEMENT of Controverting Facts in Opposition to Warren Pumps, LCC's re: #532 Statement of Uncontroverted Material Facts filed by Plaintiff Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
November 14, 2014 Filing 579 RESPONSE to Motion re: #531 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC filed by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
November 14, 2014 Filing 578 DECLARATION of Brian P. Barrow in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Air & Liquid Systems Corporation's re: #543 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Brian P. Barrow, #2 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Brian P. Barrow, #3 Exhibit C to the Declaration of Brian P. Barrow, #4 Exhibit D to the Declaration of Brian P. Barrow, #5 Exhibit E to the Declaration of Brian P. Barrow, #6 Exhibit F to the Declaration of Brian P. Barrow, #7 Exhibit G to the Declaration of Brian P. Barrow, #8 Exhibit H to the Declaration of Brian P. Barrow, #9 Exhibit I to the Declaration of Brian P. Barrow, #10 Exhibit J to the Declaration of Brian P. Barrow, #11 Exhibit K to the Declaration of Brian P. Barrow, #12 Exhibit L to the Declaration of Brian P. Barrow, #13 Exhibit M to the Declaration of Brian P. Barrow, #14 Exhibit N to the Declaration of Brian P. Barrow)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
November 14, 2014 Filing 577 STATEMENT of Controverting Facts in Opposition to Air & Liquid Systems Corporation's re: #544 Statement of Uncontroverted Material Facts in Support of MSJ filed by Plaintiff Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
November 14, 2014 Filing 576 RESPONSE to Motion re: #543 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation filed by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
November 7, 2014 Filing 575 *DECLARATION of Jennifer L. Bartlett in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to WM. Powell Company's re: #573 RESPONSE to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re: Punitive Damages by Plaintiff Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Bartlett Declaration, #2 Exhibit B to Bartlett Declaration, #3 Exhibit C to Bartlett Declaration, #4 Exhibit D to Bartlett Declaration, #5 Exhibit E to Bartlett Declaration, #6 Exhibit F to Bartlett Declaration, #7 Exhibit G to Bartlett Declaration)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan) *Modified to correct document number/link on 11/10/2014* (REW).
November 7, 2014 Filing 574 STATEMENT of Controverting Facts in Opposition to WM. Powell Company's re: #528 Statement by Plaintiff Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
November 7, 2014 Filing 573 RESPONSE to Motion re: #527 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment re: Punitive Damages Filed by WM. Powell Company filed by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
November 7, 2014 Filing 572 STATEMENT of Controverting Facts in Opposition to IMO Industries, Inc.'s re: #537 Statement by Plaintiff Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
November 7, 2014 Filing 571 DECLARATION of Jennifer L. Bartlett re: Response to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by IMO Industries, Inc. by Plaintiff Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Bartlett Declaration, #2 Exhibit B to Bartlett Declaration, #3 Exhibit C to Bartlett Declaration, #4 Exhibit D to Bartlett Declaration, #5 Exhibit E to Bartlett Declaration, #6 Exhibit F to Bartlett Declaration, #7 Exhibit G to Bartlett Declaration, #8 Exhibit H to Bartlett Declaration, #9 Exhibit I to Bartlett Declaration, #10 Exhibit J to Bartlett Declaration, #11 Exhibit K to Bartlett Declaration, #12 Exhibit L to Bartlett Declaration)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan) Modified on 11/10/2014 (REW).
November 7, 2014 Filing 570 *RESPONSE to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re: #536 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan) *Modified one Response event removed on 11/10/2014* (REW).
November 7, 2014 Filing 569 STATEMENT of Controverting Facts in Opposition to re: #542 Statement by Plaintiff Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
November 7, 2014 Filing 568 RESPONSE to Motion re: #541 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brian Barrow, #2 Exhibit A to Barrow Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Barrow Declaratio, #4 Exhibit C to Barrow Declaratio, #5 Exhibit D to Barrow Declaratio, #6 Exhibit E to Barrow Declaratio, #7 Exhibit F to Barrow Declaratio, #8 Exhibit G to Barrow Declaratio, #9 Exhibit H to Barrow Declaratio, #10 Exhibit I to Barrow Declaratio, #11 Exhibit J to Barrow Declaratio, #12 Exhibit K to Barrow Declaratio, #13 Exhibit L to Barrow Declaratio, #14 Exhibit M to Barrow Declaratio, #15 Exhibit N to Barrow Declaratio, #16 Exhibit O to Barrow Declaratio, #17 Exhibit P to Barrow Declaratio, #18 Exhibit Q to Barrow Declaratio, #19 Exhibit R to Barrow Declaratio, #20 Exhibit S to Barrow Declaratio, #21 Exhibit T to Barrow Declaratio, #22 Exhibit U to Barrow Declaratio, #23 Exhibit V to Barrow Declaratio, #24 Exhibit W to Barrow Declaratio)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
November 7, 2014 Filing 567 *RESPONSE to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re: #533 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Statement of Controverting Facts, #2 Declaration of Brian P. Barrow, #3 Exhibit A to Barrow Decl, #4 Exhibit B to Barrow Decl, #5 Exhibit C to Barrow Decl, #6 Exhibit D to Barrow Decl, #7 Exhibit E to Barrow Decl, #8 Exhibit F to Barrow Decl, #9 Exhibit G to Barrow Decl, #10 Exhibit H to Barrow Decl, #11 Exhibit I to Barrow Decl, #12 Exhibit J to Barrow Decl, #13 Exhibit K to Barrow Decl, #14 Exhibit L to Barrow Decl, #15 Exhibit M to Barrow Decl, #16 Exhibit N to Barrow Decl, #17 Exhibit O to Barrow Decl, #18 Exhibit P to Barrow Decl, #19 Exhibit Q to Barrow Decl, #20 Exhibit R to Barrow Decl, #21 Exhibit S to Barrow Decl, #22 Exhibit T to Barrow Decl, #23 Exhibit U to Barrow Decl)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan) *Modified to correct Response event on 11/10/2014* (REW).
October 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 566 ORDER, dismissing this case as to Defendants Ingersoll Rand Company and Trane U.S., Inc. with prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 10/31/14. (REW)
October 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 565 ORDER, dismissing this case with prejudice as to Defendant Alfa Laval,Inc. only. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 10/27/14. (REW)
October 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 564 ORDER: Motion Hearing set for 1/30/2015 at 09:30AM before Judge Susan R Bolton as to #527 , #529 , #531 , #533 , #536 , #541 , #543 , #545 , #548 and #551 [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 10/17/14. (MAW)
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 563 ORDER: Defendants Ingersoll Rand Company and Trane U.S., Inc. having filed a Notice of Settlement #559 ; IT IS ORDERED that this matter will be dismissed as to Ingersoll Rand Company and Trane U.S., Inc., only with prejudice within 30 days of the date of this order unless a stipulation to dismiss is filed prior to the dismissal date. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 9/30/14. (MAW)
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 562 ORDER granting #561 Stipulated Proposed Briefing Schedule for Motions for Summary Judgment [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 9/30/14. (MAW)
September 29, 2014 Filing 561 STIPULATION Proposed Briefing Schedule for Motions for Summary Judgment by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
September 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 560 ORDER: Defendant Alfa Laval, Inc. having filed a Notice of Settlement #558 ; IT IS ORDERED that this matter will be dismissed as to Defendant Alfa Laval, Inc. only with prejudice within 30 days of the date of this Order unless a stipulation to dismiss is filed prior to the dismissal date. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying as moot Defendant Alfa Laval, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment #539 . Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 9/24/14. (MAW)
September 24, 2014 Filing 559 NOTICE re: Resolution as to Ingersoll Rand Company and Trane U.S., Inc. by Ingersoll-Rand Company, Trane US Incorporated . (Anderson, Tophas)
September 23, 2014 Filing 558 NOTICE of Settlement as to Defendant Alfa Laval and Notice of Withdrawal of Defendant Alfa Laval's Motion for Summary Judgment Motion by Alfa Laval Incorporated. (Crown, Larry)
September 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 557 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED denying Plaintiffs' Request for Telephone Status Conference #554 . IT IS ORDERED directing counsel for Plaintiffs to confer with counsel for Defendants and propose a briefing schedule to the Court. Oral argument will be set after the briefing schedule is established. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 9/18/14. (MAW)
September 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 556 ORDER pursuant to #555 Stipulation: IT IS ORDERED that the summary judgment deadline for Defendants Flowserve US, Inc., solely as successor to Edward Valve, Inc., and Defendant Copes Vulcan, Inc., is hereby extended, and these Defendants' motions for summary judgment filed September 16, 2014, are hereby deemed timely filed. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 9/18/14. (MAW)
September 17, 2014 Filing 555 STIPULATION to Extend Deadline for Filing Motion for Summary Judgment by Copes Vulcan Incorporated, Flowserve US Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Extending Deadline for Filing Summary Judgment Motions of Defendants Flowserve US, Inc., Solely as Successor to Edward Valve, Inc., and Defendant Copes Vulcan, Inc.)(Stovall, Christopher) Modified on 9/19/2014 (REW).
September 17, 2014 Filing 554 REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE by Plaintiff Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
September 16, 2014 Filing 553 DECLARATION of Christopher R. Stovall re: #551 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative for Partial Summary Judgment, #552 Statement by Defendant Flowserve US Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit D-2, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S)(Stovall, Christopher)
September 16, 2014 Filing 552 STATEMENT of Undisputed Material Facts re: #551 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative for Partial Summary Judgment by Defendant Flowserve US Incorporated. (Stovall, Christopher)
September 16, 2014 Filing 551 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative for Partial Summary Judgment by Flowserve US Incorporated. (Stovall, Christopher)
September 16, 2014 Filing 550 *DECLARATION of John M. Sticht in Support of Copes Vulcan's Motion for Summary Judgment #548 by Defendant Copes Vulcan Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C, #2 Exhibit D-L, #3 Exhibit M-R)(Sticht, John) *Modified to add document number/link on 9/19/2014* (REW).
September 16, 2014 Filing 549 *STATEMENT of Facts re: #548 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment by Defendant Copes Vulcan Incorporated. (Sticht, John) *Modified on 9/19/2014; document is not text searchable* (REW).
September 16, 2014 Filing 548 *MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment, and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support by Copes Vulcan Incorporated. (Sticht, John) *Modified on 9/19/2014; document is not text searchable* (REW).
September 15, 2014 Filing 547 DECLARATION of Christopher R. Stovall Supporting FMC Corporation Motion for Summary Judgment re: #546 Statement, #545 MOTION for Summary Judgment or In the Alternative for Partial Summary Judgment by Defendant FMC Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R)(Stovall, Christopher)
September 15, 2014 Filing 546 STATEMENT of Undisputed Material Facts In Support re: #545 MOTION for Summary Judgment or In the Alternative for Partial Summary Judgment by Defendant FMC Corporation. (Stovall, Christopher)
September 15, 2014 Filing 545 WITHDRAWN on 11/24/2014 by #592 MOTION for Summary Judgment or In the Alternative for Partial Summary Judgment by FMC Corporation. (Stovall, Christopher) Modified on 11/24/2014 (LSP). Modified on 11/25/2014 (MAW).
September 15, 2014 Filing 544 STATEMENT of Facts re: #543 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8)(Sparks, J)
September 15, 2014 Filing 543 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Sparks, J)
September 15, 2014 Filing 542 STATEMENT of Facts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment re: #541 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Hoffman, Stephen) Modified on 9/18/2014 (REW).
September 15, 2014 Filing 541 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Hoffman, Stephen)
September 15, 2014 Filing 540 STATEMENT of Facts re: #539 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Alfa Laval Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1, #2 Ex. 2, #3 Ex. 2A, #4 Ex. 2B, #5 Ex. 2C, #6 Ex. 3)(Mizrahi, Elan)
September 15, 2014 Filing 539 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Alfa Laval Incorporated. (Mizrahi, Elan)
September 15, 2014 Filing 538 DECLARATION of Kathleen L. Beiermeister re: #536 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, #537 Statement by Defendant IMO Industries Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Beiermeister, Kathleen) Modified on 9/18/2014 (REW).
September 15, 2014 Filing 537 STATEMENT of facts re: #536 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Defendant IMO Industries Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C)(Beiermeister, Kathleen) Modified on 9/18/2014 (REW).
September 15, 2014 Filing 536 *MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by IMO Industries Incorporated. (Beiermeister, Kathleen) *Modified to correct Motion event on 9/18/2014* (REW).
September 15, 2014 Filing 535 DECLARATION of Kathleen L. Beiermeister re: #534 Statement, #533 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Defendant Crane Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Beiermeister, Kathleen) Modified on 9/18/2014 (REW).
September 15, 2014 Filing 534 STATEMENT of of facts re: #533 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Defendant Crane Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Beiermeister, Kathleen) Modified on 9/19/2014 (REW).
September 15, 2014 Filing 533 *MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Crane Company. (Beiermeister, Kathleen) *Modified to correct Motion event on 9/18/2014* (REW).
September 15, 2014 Filing 532 STATEMENT of facts re: #531 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Warren Pumps LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R)(Beiermeister, Kathleen)
September 15, 2014 Filing 531 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Warren Pumps LLC. (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
September 15, 2014 Filing 530 STATEMENT of Facts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment re: #529 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant CBS Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E, #2 Exhibit F-K)(Kahn, Kathleen)
September 15, 2014 Filing 529 MOTION for Summary Judgment by CBS Corporation. (Kahn, Kathleen)
September 15, 2014 Filing 528 STATEMENT of Facts in Support of its MPSJ for Punitive Damages re: #527 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment re: Punitive Damages by Defendant William Powell Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Shorall, Thomas) Modified on 9/18/2014 (REW).
September 15, 2014 Filing 527 *MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment RE Punitive Damages by William Powell Company. (Shorall, Thomas) *Modified to correct Motion event on 9/18/2014* (REW).
September 15, 2014 Filing 526 *STIPULATION for Dismissal to Dismiss Certain Claims Without Prejudice by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Sparks, J) *Modified to correct Stipulation event on 9/18/2014* (REW).
September 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 525 ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting #524 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
September 9, 2014 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX150119 as to Samuel D Jubelirer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 8, 2014 Filing 524 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Samuel D Jubelirer on behalf of Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (BAS)
August 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 523 ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting #522 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
August 28, 2014 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX149795 as to Glen R Powell. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 28, 2014 Filing 522 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Glen R Powell on behalf of Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (BAS)
August 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 521 ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting #520 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
August 26, 2014 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX149749 as to James G Scadden. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 26, 2014 Filing 520 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney James G Scadden on behalf of Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (BAS)
August 22, 2014 Filing 519 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Hoffman, Stephen)
August 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 518 ORDER pursuant to #516 Stipulation to permit Plaintiffs to depose David Weill, M.C. after the August 15, 2014 deadline, IT IS ORDERED that the parties shall have until August 28, 2014, to conduct this deposition. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 8/15/14. (MAW)
August 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 517 ORDER pursuant to #514 Stipulation to permit Defendants Crane and Warren to depose Dr. David Fractor after the August 15, 2014 deadline, IT IS ORDERED that the parties shall have until August 19, 2014, to conduct this deposition. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 8/15/14. (MAW) Modified on 8/15/2014 (MAW).
August 15, 2014 Filing 516 STIPULATION to Conduct Deposition After Discovery Cut-Off by FMC Corporation, Flowserve US Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Permitting Specified Deposition)(Stovall, Christopher) Modified on 8/18/2014 (REW).
August 14, 2014 Filing 515 NOTICE of Deposition of Dr. David Fractor (Second Amended), filed by Crane Company, Warren Pumps LLC. (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
August 14, 2014 Filing 514 STIPULATION to Conduct Expert Deposition After Discovery Cut-Off by Crane Company, Warren Pumps LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Beiermeister, Kathleen)
August 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 513 ORDER pursuant to #512 Stipulation to permit Plaintiff's to depose John Spencer, CIH after the August 15, 2014 deadline, IT IS ORDERED that the parties shall have until August 25, 2014, to conduct this deposition. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 8/13/14. (MAW)
August 13, 2014 Filing 512 STIPULATION To Conduct Expert Deposition After Discovery Cut-Off by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hoffman, Stephen)
August 12, 2014 Filing 511 NOTICE of Deposition of Dr. Carl Brodkin, filed by Crane Company, Warren Pumps LLC. (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
August 11, 2014 Filing 510 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by CBS Corporation. (Kahn, Kathleen)
August 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 509 ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 terminating #506 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #508 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
August 11, 2014 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX149159 as to David C Hunter, III. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 11, 2014 Filing 508 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney David C Hunter III on behalf of IMO Industries Incorporated, and Warren Pumps LLC. (BAS)
August 7, 2014 Filing 507 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #506 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney David C. Hunter filed by IMO Industries Incorporated, Warren Pumps LLC. Pro Hac Vice motion electronically filed by in-state counsel for ineligible out of state counsel. Please resubmit motion in paper form with original certificates of good standing. Deficiency must be corrected within seven business days of this notice This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 7, 2014 Filing 506 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney David C. Hunter by IMO Industries Incorporated, Warren Pumps LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Beiermeister, Kathleen)
August 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 505 ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting #504 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
August 4, 2014 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX148923 as to Edward Joseph White. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 4, 2014 Filing 504 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Edward Joseph White on behalf of Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (BAS)
August 4, 2014 Filing 503 NOTICE of Deposition of Dr. Eugene Mark, filed by Crane Company, Warren Pumps LLC. (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
August 1, 2014 Filing 502 NOTICE of Deposition of Dr. Arnold Brody, filed by Crane Company. (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
August 1, 2014 Filing 501 NOTICE of Deposition of Dr. David Fractor, filed by Crane Company. (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
July 31, 2014 Filing 500 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Sparks, J)
July 31, 2014 Filing 499 NOTICE of Deposition of Dr. Arnold Brody, filed by Crane Company. (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
July 31, 2014 Filing 498 NOTICE of Deposition of Dr. David Fractor, filed by Crane Company. (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
July 31, 2014 Filing 497 NOTICE of Deposition of Dr. Arnold Brody, filed by Crane Company. (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
July 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 496 ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting #495 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
July 30, 2014 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX148687 as to Michael J Pietrykowski. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
July 30, 2014 Filing 495 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Michael J Pietrykowski on behalf of Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, and Warren Pumps LLC. (BAS)
July 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 494 ORDER granting #493 Stipulation. All claims filed in this action be dismissedwithout prejudice as to FMC CORPORATION on behalf of its former subsidiary Crosby Valve, Inc. only, with each party to bear their own costs and attorneys'fees. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 7/16/14. (MAP)
July 15, 2014 Filing 493 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant FMC Corporation (on behalf of its former subsidiary Crosby Valve, Inc.) by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
July 11, 2014 Filing 492 NOTICE of Appearance by Dev Kumar Sethi on behalf of Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Sethi, Dev)
June 25, 2014 Filing 491 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Alfa Laval Incorporated. (Mizrahi, Elan)
June 23, 2014 Filing 490 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Flowserve US Incorporated. (Stovall, Christopher)
June 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 489 ORDER pursuant to #488 Stipulation: IT IS ORDERED that the deadline for Defendants Alfa Laval Inc., Copes Vulcan, Inc., Flowserve US Inc. solely as successor to Edward Valve Inc., FMC on behalf of its former subsidiary Crosby Valve Inc., and FMC on behalf of its former Peerless Pump to serve any rebuttal expert disclosures, and otherwise to supplement their disclosures (including witness and document/exhibit disclosures and expert witness disclosures) and discovery responses, as set forth in paragraphs E and G of this Court's September 18, 2013 Order #312 is continued to June 25, 2014. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 6/17/14. (MAW)
June 13, 2014 Filing 488 STIPULATION To Extend June 9, 2014 Deadlines for Defendants Alfa Laval Inc., Copes Vulcan, Inc., Flowserve US Inc. Solely as Successor to Edward Valve Inc., FMC on Behalf of its Former Subsidiary Crosby Valve Inc., and FMC on Behalf of its Former Peerless Pump Business by Alfa Laval Incorporated, Copes Vulcan Incorporated, Crosby Valve Incorporated, FMC Corporation, Flowserve US Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Crown, Larry)
June 10, 2014 Filing 487 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by William Powell Company. (Shorall, Thomas)
June 10, 2014 Filing 486 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by William Powell Company. (Shorall, Thomas)
June 10, 2014 Filing 485 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by CBS Corporation. (Kahn, Kathleen)
June 10, 2014 Filing 484 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Trane US Incorporated. (Anderson, Tophas)
June 10, 2014 Filing 483 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Ingersoll-Rand Company. (Anderson, Tophas)
June 10, 2014 Filing 482 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Hoffman, Stephen)
June 10, 2014 Filing 481 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Warren Pumps LLC. (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
June 10, 2014 Filing 480 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Warren Pumps LLC. (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
June 10, 2014 Filing 479 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by IMO Industries Incorporated. (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
June 10, 2014 Filing 478 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Crane Company. (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
June 10, 2014 Filing 477 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Sparks, J)
May 30, 2014 Filing 476 OBJECTION and Responses to Plaintiffs' Notice of Taking the Videotaped Deposition of the "Person Most Knowledgeable" of Defendant by Defendant Crosby Valve Incorporated. (Stovall, Christopher)
May 30, 2014 Filing 475 OBJECTION and Responses of Defendant FMC Corporation on Behalf of its Former Peerless Pump Business to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Notice of Taking the Videotaped Deposition of the "Person Most Knowledgeable" of Defendant by Defendant FMC Corporation. (Stovall, Christopher)
May 16, 2014 Filing 474 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Alfa Laval Incorporated. (Mizrahi, Elan)
May 14, 2014 Filing 473 NOTICE re: of Service of FRCP Rule 26(a)(2) Expert Disclosures by Flowserve US Incorporated . (Stovall, Christopher)
May 14, 2014 Filing 472 NOTICE re: of Service of FRCP Rule 26(a)(2) Expert Disclosures by Crosby Valve Incorporated . (Stovall, Christopher)
May 14, 2014 Filing 471 NOTICE re: of Service of FRCP Rule 26(a)(2) Expert Disclosures by FMC Corporation . (Stovall, Christopher)
May 12, 2014 Filing 470 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Trane US Incorporated. (Anderson, Tophas)
May 12, 2014 Filing 469 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Ingersoll-Rand Company. (Anderson, Tophas)
May 12, 2014 Filing 468 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by IMO Industries Incorporated. (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
May 12, 2014 Filing 467 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Crane Company. (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
May 12, 2014 Filing 466 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Warren Pumps LLC. (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
May 9, 2014 Filing 465 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Alfa Laval Incorporated. (Mizrahi, Elan)
May 9, 2014 Filing 464 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Copes Vulcan Incorporated. (Sticht, John)
May 9, 2014 Filing 463 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by William Powell Company. (Shorall, Thomas)
May 9, 2014 Filing 462 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Sparks, J)
May 9, 2014 Filing 461 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Hoffman, Stephen)
May 9, 2014 Filing 460 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by CBS Corporation. (Kahn, Kathleen)
May 9, 2014 Filing 459 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Stout, David)
April 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 458 ORDER granting #454 Motion to Continue Deposition Due to Unanticipated Trial Conflict. IT IS ORDERED that the parties shall have until June 13, 2014, to conduct the Rule 30(b)(6) deposition of Defendant Crosby Valve. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 4/22/14.(MAW)
April 22, 2014 Filing 457 OBJECTION to Plaintiff's Third Amended Notice of Taking Telephonic Deposition of the "Person Most Knowledgeable" of Defendant Crane Co. by Defendant Crane Company. (Hendricks, John)
April 18, 2014 Filing 456 OBJECTION and Responses to Plaintiffs' Notice of Taking the Videotaped Deposition of the "Person Most Knowledgeable" of Defendant by Defendant Crosby Valve Incorporated. (Stovall, Christopher)
April 18, 2014 Filing 455 OBJECTION and Responses to Defendant FMC Corporation on Behalf of Its Former Peerless Pump Business to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Notice of Taking the Videotaped Deposition of the "Person Most Knowledgeable" of Defendant by Defendant FMC Corporation. (Stovall, Christopher)
April 17, 2014 Filing 454 MOTION to Continue Deposition Due to Unanticipated Trial Conflict by Crosby Valve Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion With Consent to Continue Deposition Due to Unanticipated Trial Conflict)(Stovall, Christopher) Modified on 4/18/2014 (REW).
April 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 453 ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 terminating #443 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; terminating #446 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #452 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
April 4, 2014 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX144742 as to Brady L Green. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
April 4, 2014 Filing 452 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Brady L Green on behalf of Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (BAS)
April 4, 2014 Filing 451 OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFFS FOURTH AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING THE VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION OF THE PERSON MOST KNOWLEDGEABLE OF DEFENDANT AIR & LIQUID by Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Sparks, J)
April 3, 2014 Filing 450 OBJECTION AND RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S THIRD AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING THE VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION OF THE "PERSON MOST KNOWLEDGEABLE" OF DEFENDANT WARREN PUMPS, LLC by Defendant Warren Pumps LLC. (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
April 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 449 ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting #448 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
April 3, 2014 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX144703 as to Judith Perritano. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
April 3, 2014 Filing 448 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Judith Perritano on behalf of Warren Pumps LLC. (BAS)
April 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 447 ORDER pursuant to #445 Stipulation to permit Plaintiffs to depose a representative of Air & Liquid Systems Corp. (successor-by-merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc.) after the February 7, 2014, deadline for completion of fact discovery, IT IS ORDERED that the parties shall have until April 11, 2014, to conduct this deposition. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 4/1/14. (MAW)
April 1, 2014 Filing 446 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Brady L. Green by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pro Hac App & Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sparks, J)
April 1, 2014 Filing 445 STIPULATION to conduct depositions after discovery cut-off by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
March 27, 2014 Filing 444 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #443 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Brady L. Green filed by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. Pro Hac Vice motion electronically filed by in-state counsel for ineligible out of state counsel. Please resubmit motion in paper form with original certificates of good standing dated within 45 days of the date of submission. Deficiency must be corrected within seven business days of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
March 27, 2014 Filing 443 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Brady L. Green by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application & Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Sparks, J)
March 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 442 ORDER, pursuant to the Parties #441 Stipulation of Dismissal, all claims filed in this action be dismissed with prejudice as to WEIR VALVES & CONTROLS USA, INC. f/k/a ATWOOD & MORRILL only, with each party to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 3/21/14. (REW)
March 21, 2014 Filing 441 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
March 18, 2014 Filing 440 *NOTICE of Waiver of Electronic Service re: Removal of Attorneys from ECF System by York International Corporation. (Heitz, Amanda) *Modified to correct Notice event on 3/19/2014* (REW).
March 18, 2014 Filing 439 OBJECTION AND RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING THE VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION OF THE "PERSON MOST KNOWLEDGEABLE" OF DEFENDANT WARREN PUMPS, LLC by Defendant Warren Pumps LLC. (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
March 13, 2014 Filing 438 NOTICE of Deposition of Shannon Coulbourn Moses - Amended Notice, filed by CBS Corporation. (Kahn, Kathleen)
March 13, 2014 Filing 437 NOTICE of Deposition of George Coulbourn, Jr. - Amended Notice, filed by CBS Corporation. (Kahn, Kathleen)
March 12, 2014 Filing 436 NOTICE of Deposition of Sandra Coulbourn - Amended Notice, filed by CBS Corporation. (Kahn, Kathleen)
March 12, 2014 Filing 435 NOTICE of Deposition of Scott Alan Coulbourn - Amended Notice, filed by CBS Corporation. (Kahn, Kathleen)
March 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 434 ORDER pursuant to #431 Stipulation: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Plaintiff and Defendant Crane Co., shall complete the deposition of Crane Co., by April 23, 2014. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 3/12/14. (MAW)
March 11, 2014 Filing 433 *Joinder re: #211 , #415 , #417 , #418 , #419 , #420 In Identification of Non-Parties at Fault by Defendant Trane US Incorporated. (Anderson, Tophas) *Modified to add document numbers/links on 3/12/2014* (REW).
March 11, 2014 Filing 432 *Joinder re: #211 , #415 , #417 , #418 , #419 , #420 In Identification of Non-Parties at Fault by Defendant Ingersoll-Rand Company. (Anderson, Tophas) *Modified to add document number/links on 3/12/2014* (REW).
March 11, 2014 Filing 431 STIPULATION to Conduct Corporate Representative Deposition by Crane Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Beiermeister, Kathleen)
March 10, 2014 Filing 430 *NOTICE of Deposition of Shannon Coulbourn Moses, filed by CBS Corporation. (Kahn, Kathleen) *Modified to add omitted text on 3/11/2014* (REW).
March 10, 2014 Filing 429 *NOTICE of Deposition of Sandra Coulbourn, filed by CBS Corporation. (Kahn, Kathleen) *Modified to add omitted text on 3/11/2014* (REW).
March 10, 2014 Filing 428 *NOTICE of Deposition of Scott Alan Coulbourn, filed by CBS Corporation. (Kahn, Kathleen) *Modified to add omitted text on 3/11/2014* (REW).
March 10, 2014 Filing 427 *NOTICE of Deposition of George Coulbourn Jr, filed by CBS Corporation. (Kahn, Kathleen) *Modified to add omitted text on 3/11/2014* (REW).
March 7, 2014 Filing 426 *Joinder re: #211 , #415 , #417 , #418 , #419 , #420 Alfa Laval Inc.s Joinder in Identification of Non-Parties at Fault by Defendant Alfa Laval Incorporated. (Mizrahi, Elan) *Modified to add document nubmers/links on 3/10/2014* (REW).
March 7, 2014 Filing 425 Joinder re: #419 Notice, #418 Notice, #420 Notice, #415 Notice, #417 Notice Non-Parties at Fault by Defendant CBS Corporation. (Kahn, Kathleen)
March 7, 2014 Filing 424 *Joinder re: #211 , #415 , #417 , #418 , #419 , #420 BY DEFENDANT COPES VULCAN, INC., IN NOTICE BY DEFENDANT UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION OF IDENTIFICATION OF NON-PARTIES AT FAULT. by Defendant Copes Vulcan Incorporated. (Sticht, John) *Modified to add document numbers/links on 3/10/2014* (REW).
March 7, 2014 Filing 423 *JOINDER by Honeywell International Incorporated re: #419 Notice, #418 Notice, #420 Notice, #415 Notice, #417 Notice Non-Parties at Fault. (Sparks, J) *Modified from Notice on 3/10/2014* (REW).
March 7, 2014 Filing 422 *JOINDER by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation re: #419 Notice, #418 Notice, #420 Notice, #415 Notice, #417 Notice Non-Parties at Fault. (Sparks, J) *Modified from Notice on 3/10/2014* (REW).
March 7, 2014 Filing 421 *Joinder re: #211 , #415 , #417 , #418 , #419 , #420 Notices of Non-Parties at Fault by Defendant William Powell Company. (Shorall, Thomas) *Modified to add document numbers/links on 3/10/2014* (REW).
March 7, 2014 Filing 420 NOTICE re: Identification of Non-Parties at Fault by Warren Pumps LLC . (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
March 7, 2014 Filing 419 NOTICE re: Identification of Non-Parties at Fault by IMO Industries Incorporated . (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
March 7, 2014 Filing 418 NOTICE re: Identification of Non-Parties at Fault by Crane Environmental Incorporated . (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
March 7, 2014 Filing 417 NOTICE re: Identification of Non-Parties at Fault by Crane Company . (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
March 7, 2014 Filing 416 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #415 Notice (Other) Service List by Defendant Velan Valve Corporation. (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
March 7, 2014 Filing 415 NOTICE re: Identification of Non-Parties at Fault by Velan Valve Corporation . (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
March 7, 2014 Filing 414 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS/FIRM NAME by Kathleen Kelly Kahn. (Kahn, Kathleen)
February 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 413 ORDER pursuant to the #412 Stipulation of Dismissal, all claims filed in this action be dismissed without prejudice as to YORK INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION only, with each party to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 2/19/14. (REW)
February 18, 2014 Filing 412 STIPULATION of Dismissal without prejudice of Defendant York International Corporation by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
February 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 411 ORDER pursuant to #408 Stipulation to permit Plaintiffs to depose a representative of IMO Industries, Inc. after the February 7, 2014, deadline for completion of fact discovery, IT IS ORDERED that the parties shall have until April 8, 2014, to conduct this deposition. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 2/18/14. (MAW)
February 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 410 ORDER: The Court has received and granted 7 stipulations for depositions to be completed by April 8, 2014, and 2 stipulations for deposition to be completed by April 30, 2014. IT IS ORDERED that the parties must schedule all of the depositions to be completed by April 8, 2014, except the two stipulations already granted until April 30, 2014. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court will not grant any stipulations for depositions or other discovery after April 30, 2014. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 2/18/14. (MAW)
February 14, 2014 Filing 409 *NOTICE of Service of Discovery Responses by Alfa Laval Incorporated. (Mizrahi, Elan) *Modified from Notice on 2/18/2014* (REW).
February 13, 2014 Filing 408 STIPULATION to conduct depositions after discovery cut-off by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
February 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 407 ORDER pursuant to #406 Stipulation to permit Plaintiffs to depose a representative of Copes Vulcan, Inc. after the February 7, 2014, deadline for completion of fact discovery, IT IS ORDERED that the parties shall have until April 8, 2014, to conduct this deposition. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 2/13/14. (MAW)
February 12, 2014 Filing 406 STIPULATION to conduct depositions after discovery cut-off by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
February 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 405 ORDER pursuant to #404 Stipulation to permit Plaintiffs to depose a representative of Warren Pumps, LLC. after the February 7, 2014, deadline for completion of fact discovery, IT IS ORDERED that the parties shall have until April 8, 2014, to conduct this deposition. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 2/12/14. (MAW)
February 11, 2014 Filing 404 STIPULATION to conduct depositions after discovery cutoff for Warren Pumps, LLC. by Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 403 ORDER pursuant to #392 Stipulation to permit Plaintiffs to depose a representative of FMC Corporation on behalf of its former subsidiary Crosby Valve, Inc. (improperly named and sued as Crosby Valve, Inc.) after the February 7, 2014, deadline for completion of fact discovery, IT IS ORDERED that the parties shall have until April 30, 2014, to conduct this deposition. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 2/10/14. (MAW)
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 402 ORDER pursuant to #393 Stipulation to permit Plaintiffs to depose a representative of FMC CORPORATION on behalf of its former Peerless Pump Business, improperly named as and sued as FMC Corporation (sued individually and as successor-in-interest to Peerless Pump Company), after the February 7, 2014, deadline for completion of fact discovery: IT IS ORDERED that the parties shall have until April 30, 2014, to conduct this deposition. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 2/10/14. (MAW)
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 401 ORDER pursuant to #396 Stipulation to permit Plaintiffs to depose a representative of Velan Valve Corp. after the February 7, 2014, deadline for completion of fact discovery, IT IS ORDERED that the parties shall have until April 8, 2014 to conduct this deposition. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 2/10/14. (MAW)
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 400 ORDER pursuant to #395 Stipulation to permit Plaintiffs to depose a representative of Crane Co. after the February 7, 2014, deadline for completion of fact discovery: IT IS ORDERED that the parties shall have until April 8, 2014, to conduct this deposition. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 2/10/14. (MAW)
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 399 ORDER pursuant to #394 Stipulation to permit Plaintiffs to depose a representative of Alfa Laval, Inc. after the February 7, 2014, deadline for completion of fact discovery: IT IS ORDERED that the parties shall have until April 8, 2014, to conduct this deposition. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 2/10/14. (MAW)
February 7, 2014 Filing 398 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Alfa Laval Incorporated. (Mizrahi, Elan)
February 7, 2014 Filing 397 Defendant Alfa Laval, Inc.s Separate Answer to Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint ANSWER to #349 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Alfa Laval Incorporated.(Mizrahi, Elan)
February 7, 2014 Filing 396 STIPULATION TO CONDUCT DEPOSITION AFTER DISCOVERY CUT-OFF for defendant Velan Valve Corp. by Sandra Brown Coulbourn.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
February 7, 2014 Filing 395 STIPULATION TO CONDUCT DEPOSITION AFTER DISCOVERY CUT-OFF for defendant Crane Co. by Sandra Brown Coulbourn.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
February 7, 2014 Filing 394 STIPULATION TO CONDUCT DEPOSITION AFTER DISCOVERY CUT-OFF for defendant Alfa Laval, Inc. by Sandra Brown Coulbourn.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
February 7, 2014 Filing 393 STIPULATION TO CONDUCT DEPOSITION AFTER DISCOVERY CUT-OFF for defendant FMC Corporation on behalf of its former Peerless Pump Business by George Coulbourn, Sandra Brown Coulbourn.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
February 7, 2014 Filing 392 STIPULATION to conduct deposition after discovery cut-off by George Coulbourn, Sandra Brown Coulbourn.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
February 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 391 ORDER pursuant to #390 Stipulation to permit CBS Corporation and other defendants to depose Plaintiffs, and Plaintiffs to depose a representative of CBS Corporation: IT IS ORDERED that the parties shall have until April 8, 2014, to conduct these depositions. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 2/7/14. (MAW)
February 6, 2014 Filing 390 STIPULATION to Conduct Depositions After Discovery Cut-Off by CBS Corporation.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kahn, Kathleen)
January 28, 2014 Filing 389 OBJECTION and Responses to Plaintiff's First Amended Notice of Taking the Videotaped Deposition of the "Person Most Knowledgeable" of Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC by Defendant Warren Pumps LLC. (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
January 24, 2014 Filing 388 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Copes Vulcan Incorporated. (Sticht, John)
January 24, 2014 Filing 387 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by FMC Corporation. (Stovall, Christopher)
January 24, 2014 Filing 386 *NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Crosby Valve Incorporated. (Stovall, Christopher) *Modified to correct filer on 1/24/2014* (REW).
January 24, 2014 Filing 385 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Flowserve US Incorporated. (Stovall, Christopher)
January 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 384 ORDER, pursuant to the #381 Stipulation of Dismissal, all claims filed in this action are dismissed without prejudice as to FLOWSERVE CORPORATION f/k/a THE DURIRON COMPANY only, with each party to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 1/22/14. (REW)
January 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 383 ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting #382 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
January 21, 2014 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX142123 as to Nina I Webb-Lawton. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
January 21, 2014 Filing 382 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Nina I Webb-Lawton on behalf of Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (BAS)
January 17, 2014 Filing 381 STIPULATION of Dismissal by George Coulbourn, Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order For dismissal without prejudice of Defendant Flowserve Corporation fka The Duriron Company (sued individually and as successor by merger to Durco International))(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
January 9, 2014 Filing 380 NOTICE re of Service of Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' First Amended Notice of Taking the Telephonic Deposition of Roy Belanger by CBS Corporation . (Kahn, Kathleen)
January 8, 2014 Filing 379 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Warren Pumps LLC. (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
January 8, 2014 Filing 378 *Joinder re: #211 Notice in Defendant Union Carbide Corporation's Identification of Non-Parties At Fault by Defendant Trane US Incorporated. (Anderson, Tophas) *Modified to add document number/link on 1/9/2014* (REW).
January 8, 2014 Filing 377 Joinder re #211 Notice of Union Carbide Corporation's Identification of Non-Parties at Fault by Defendant Ingersoll-Rand Company. (Anderson, Tophas)
January 3, 2014 Filing 376 NOTICE by CBS Corporation Service of Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' Third Amended Notice of Taking Videotaped Deposition, Etc.. (Kahn, Kathleen)
January 3, 2014 Filing 375 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by York International Corporation. (Heitz, Amanda)
December 27, 2013 Filing 374 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Sparks, J)
December 26, 2013 Filing 373 ANSWER to #349 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand (Second Amended Complaint) by Honeywell International Incorporated.(Sparks, J)
December 26, 2013 Filing 372 COPES-VULCAN, INC.S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT ANSWER to #349 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand John M. Sticht by Copes Vulcan Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Service Mailing List)(Sticht, John)
December 26, 2013 Filing 371 ANSWER to #349 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand (Second Amended Complaint) by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation.(Sparks, J)
December 26, 2013 Filing 370 DEFENDANT'S DEMAND for Jury Trial by CBS Corporation. (Kahn, Kathleen)
December 24, 2013 Filing 369 ANSWER to #349 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Flowserve US Incorporated.(Stovall, Christopher)
December 24, 2013 Filing 368 ANSWER to #349 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by FMC Corporation.(Stovall, Christopher)
December 24, 2013 Filing 367 ANSWER to #349 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Crosby Valve Incorporated.(Stovall, Christopher)
December 24, 2013 Filing 366 DEFENDANT'S DEMAND for Jury Trial by Ingersoll-Rand Company. (Anderson, Tophas)
December 24, 2013 Filing 365 DEFENDANT'S DEMAND for Jury Trial by Trane US Incorporated. (Anderson, Tophas)
December 24, 2013 Filing 364 *DEFENDANT'S DEMAND for Jury Trial by Ingersoll-Rand Company. (Anderson, Tophas) *No electronic signature on document; corrected at doc.#366 on 12/26/2013 (KMG).
December 23, 2013 Filing 363 ANSWER to #349 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Warren Pumps LLC.(Beiermeister, Kathleen)
December 23, 2013 Filing 362 ANSWER to #349 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Velan Valve Corporation.(Beiermeister, Kathleen)
December 23, 2013 Filing 361 ANSWER to #349 Amended Complaint by Trane US Incorporated.(Anderson, Tophas)
December 23, 2013 Filing 360 ANSWER to #349 Amended Complaint by Ingersoll-Rand Company.(Anderson, Tophas)
December 23, 2013 Filing 359 ANSWER to #349 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Crane Company.(Beiermeister, Kathleen)
December 23, 2013 Filing 358 DEFENDANT'S DEMAND for Jury Trial by IMO Industries Incorporated. (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
December 20, 2013 Filing 357 ANSWER to #349 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company.(Hoffman, Stephen)
December 20, 2013 Filing 356 ANSWER to #349 Amended Complaint by IMO Industries Incorporated.(Beiermeister, Kathleen)
December 20, 2013 Filing 355 Defendant CBS Corporation's ANSWER to #349 Amended Complaint by CBS Corporation.(Kahn, Kathleen)
December 20, 2013 Filing 354 The WM. Powell Company ANSWER to #349 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by William Powell Company.(Boblick, Jason)
December 20, 2013 Filing 353 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Trane US Incorporated. (Anderson, Tophas)
December 19, 2013 Filing 352 ANSWER to #349 Amended Complaint by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.(Stout, David)
December 18, 2013 Filing 351 ANSWER to #349 Amended Complaint by York International Corporation.(Heitz, Amanda)
December 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 350 ORDER granting #348 Joint Motion for Entry of Protective Order [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 12/11/13.(MAW)
December 3, 2013 Filing 349 *AMENDED COMPLAINT Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint against All Defendants filed by Sandra Brown Coulbourn.(Gonzales, Richard) *Modified on 12/4/2013; document is not text searchable* (REW).
November 27, 2013 Filing 348 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by CBS Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Kahn, Kathleen)
November 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 347 ORDER granting #334 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend the Complaint. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 11/21/13.(MAW)
November 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 346 ORDER pursuant to #344 Stipulation of the Parties: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that all claims filed in this action be dismissed without prejudice as to UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION only, with each party to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 11/21/2013. (ALS)
November 21, 2013 Filing 345 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Honeywell International Incorporated. (Sparks, J)
November 19, 2013 Filing 344 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without prejudice of Defendant Union Carbide Corporation by George Coulbourn, Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order for dismissal without prejudice of Defendant Union Carbide Corporation)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
November 14, 2013 Filing 343 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Crosby Valve Incorporated. (Stovall, Christopher)
November 14, 2013 Filing 342 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by FMC Corporation. (Stovall, Christopher)
November 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 341 ORDER pursuant to the #337 Stipulation of Dismissal, all claims filed in this action are dismissed without prejudice as to CSK Auto, Inc. as successor-in-interest to Kragen Auto Supply Co., and also Successor-in-interest to Shuck's Auto Supply only, with each party to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 11/12/13. (REW)
November 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 340 ORDER pursuant to the #336 Stipulation of Dismissal, all claims filed in this action are dismissed without prejudice as to Sterling Fluid Systems (USA), LLC f/k/a Peerless Pump Co. only, with each party to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 11/12/13. (REW)
November 12, 2013 Filing 339 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Sparks, J)
November 7, 2013 Filing 338 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by William Powell Company. (Boblick, Jason)
November 5, 2013 Filing 337 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendant CSK Auto, Inc. by George Coulbourn, Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order For Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendant CSK Auto, Inc.)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
November 4, 2013 Filing 336 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendant Sterling Fluid Systems (USA), LLC. by George Coulbourn, Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT STERLING FLUID SYSTEMS (USA), LLC f/k/a PEERLESS PUMP CO.)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
November 4, 2013 Filing 335 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Warren Pumps LLC. (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
October 28, 2013 Filing 334 *MOTION to Amend/Correct the Complaint to State Claims for Wrongful Death by George Coulbourn, Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order for leave to amend the complaint to state claims for wrongful death)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan) *Document not in compliance with L.R.Civ 7.1(c); attorney notified on 10/29/2013 (ALS).
October 17, 2013 Filing 333 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Weir Valves & Controls USA Incorporated. (Pacheco, Travis)
October 15, 2013 Filing 332 *NOTICE of Service of Discovery by Flowserve Corporation . (Stovall, Christopher) *Modified to correct event on 10/16/2013 (LFIG).
October 15, 2013 Filing 331 *NOTICE of Service of Discovery by Flowserve US Incorporated . (Stovall, Christopher) *Modified to correct event on 10/16/2013 (LFIG).
October 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 330 ORDER dismissing this case as to Defendant General Electric Company only. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 10/15/2013. (LFIG)
October 10, 2013 Filing 329 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosures by Crosby Valve Incorporated . (Stovall, Christopher)
October 8, 2013 Filing 328 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by IMO Industries Incorporated. (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
October 8, 2013 Filing 327 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by CSK Auto Incorporated. (Boblick, Jason)
October 7, 2013 Filing 326 NOTICE re of Service of Initial Disclosures by Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC . (Stovall, Christopher)
October 7, 2013 Filing 325 NOTICE re of Service of Initial Disclosures by FMC Corporation . (Stovall, Christopher)
October 2, 2013 Filing 324 NOTICE re of Service of Initial Disclosures by Flowserve US Incorporated . (Stovall, Christopher)
October 2, 2013 Filing 323 NOTICE re of Initial Disclosures by Flowserve Corporation . (Stovall, Christopher)
September 30, 2013 Filing 322 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Stout, David)
September 30, 2013 Filing 321 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Honeywell International Incorporated. (Sparks, J)
September 30, 2013 Filing 320 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Sparks, J)
September 27, 2013 Filing 319 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Copes Vulcan Incorporated. (Sticht, John)
September 27, 2013 Filing 318 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Sparks, J)
September 26, 2013 Filing 317 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Sparks, J)
September 23, 2013 Filing 316 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Hoffman, Stephen)
September 23, 2013 Filing 315 *NOTICE of Service of Discovery by Copes Vulcan Incorporated. Sticht, John) *Modified from Notice on 9/24/2013* (REW).
September 20, 2013 Filing 314 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Honeywell International Incorporated. (Sparks, J)
September 19, 2013 Filing 313 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Stout, David)
September 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 312 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 2/7/2014. Dispositive motions due by 9/15/2014 [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 9/18/13. (MAW)
September 16, 2013 Filing 311 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by William Powell Company. (Boblick, Jason)
September 16, 2013 Filing 310 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Susan R Bolton: Scheduling Conference held on 9/16/2013. Deadlines discussed and entered. Scheduling Order to follow. A copy of the form of the Joint Proposed Pretrial Order is provided to counsel this date. APPEARANCES: Jordan Blumenfeld-James, Jay Stuemke and Richard Gonzales for Plaintiffs. J. Steven Sparks, Mary Birk, Larry Crown, Tophas Anderson IV, John Hendricks, Jason Boblick, Amanda Heitz, Christopher Stovall, Travis Pacheco, Stephen Bressler, Kathleen Kahn, Stephen Hoffman, Elan Mizrahi and David Stout for Defendants. (Court Reporter Liz Lemke.) Hearing held 9:35 AM to 10:20 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW)
September 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 309 ORDER re #307 Notice of Settlement filed by General Electric Company: IT IS ORDERED that this matter will be dismissed as to Defendant General Electric Company only with prejudice within 30 days of the date of this order unless a stipulation to dismiss is filed prior to the dismissal date. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 9/13/13. (MAW)
September 13, 2013 Filing 308 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Crane Company. (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
September 12, 2013 Filing 307 NOTICE of Settlement Notice of Settlement By Defendant General Electric Company by General Electric Company. (Lite, Jeremy)
September 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 306 ORDER pursuant to the parties' #288 Stipulation. ORDERED that Larry J. Crown, Elan S. Mizrahi and the law firm of Jennings, Haug & Cunningham, LLP is hereby substituted as counsel of record for Defendant Alfa Laval, Inc. in the place of Richard J. Woods and The Cavanagh Law Firm PA for all further proceedings in this matter. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 9/12/2013. (LFIG)
September 11, 2013 Filing 305 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Warren Pumps LLC. (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
September 11, 2013 Filing 304 Additional Attachments to Main Document re #288 Stipulation /Consent to Stipulation For Substitution of Counsel by Defendant Alfa Laval Incorporated. (Crown, Larry)
September 11, 2013 Filing 303 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Sparks, J)
September 10, 2013 Filing 302 NOTICE OF WAIVER OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE by Mary G Isban, counsel for Defendant Crown Cork & Seal Company Incorporated. (Isban, Mary)
September 10, 2013 Filing 301 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Velan Valve Corporation. (Hendricks, John)
September 10, 2013 Filing 300 *Withdrawal of Document re #232 Plaintiffs Ex Parte Application for an Expedited Trial Date by George Coulbourn, Sandra Brown Coulbourn . (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan) *Modified to correct event/add linkage on 9/11/2013 (LFIG).
September 9, 2013 Filing 299 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Copes Vulcan Incorporated. (Sticht, John)
September 9, 2013 Filing 298 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Warren Pumps LLC. (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
September 9, 2013 Filing 297 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Union Carbide Corporation. (Hellbusch, Ronald)
September 9, 2013 Filing 296 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Ingersoll-Rand Company. (Anderson, Tophas)
September 9, 2013 Filing 295 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Trane US Incorporated. (Anderson, Tophas)
September 9, 2013 Filing 294 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by George Coulbourn, Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
September 9, 2013 Filing 293 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by York International Corporation. (Heitz, Amanda)
September 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER that Plaintiffs George Coulbourn and Sandra Brown Coulbourn, hereby dismiss without prejudice all claims filed in this action against Defendant Yarway Corporation. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 9/9/13. (LSP)
September 6, 2013 Filing 291 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by CBS Corporation. (Kahn, Kathleen)
September 6, 2013 Filing 290 NOTICE re Change of Firm Name and Attorney E-Mail Addresses by CBS Corporation . (Kahn, Kathleen)
September 5, 2013 Filing 289 *OBJECTIONS to Dates of Rule 30(b)(6) Depositions by Velan Valve Corporation. (Hendricks, John) *Modified from Notice on 9/6/2013* (REW).
September 5, 2013 Filing 288 STIPULATION for Substitution of Counsel by Alfa Laval Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Crown, Larry)
September 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 287 ORDER pursuant to the #286 Stipulation of Dismissal, all claims filed in this action are dismissed without prejudice as to SB DECKING, INC. only, with each party to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 9/4/13. (REW)
September 3, 2013 Filing 286 STIPULATION of Dismissal by George Coulbourn, Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order for dismissal without prejudice of Defendant SB Decking, Inc.)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
August 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORDER pursuant to the #282 Stipulation of Dismissal, all claims filed in this action are dismissed with prejudice as to PFIZER, INC. only, with each party to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 8/29/13. (REW)
August 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ORDER pursuant to the Parties' #280 Stipulation of Dismissal, all claims filed in this action be dismissed with prejudice as to CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY, INC. only, with each party to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 8/28/13. (REW)
August 29, 2013 Filing 283 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by CSK Auto Incorporated. (Boblick, Jason)
August 29, 2013 Filing 282 STIPULATION of Dismissal by George Coulbourn, Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order for Dismissal with prejudice of Defendant Pfizer, Inc.)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
August 28, 2013 Filing 281 *Joinder re: #257 Defendant Pfizer, Inc.'s Response to Motion by Defendant Trane US Incorporated filed by Trane US Incorporated. (Anderson, Tophas) *Modified to add document number/link on 8/29/2013* (REW).
August 28, 2013 Filing 280 STIPULATION of Dismissal by George Coulbourn, Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order for dismissal with prejudice of defendant Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc.)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
August 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER, pursuant to the #277 Notice of Substitution of Counsel; Carol M Romano and Tophas Anderson, IV is substituting and replacing Ashley E Calhoun as counsel of record for Defendant Trane U. S., Inc. for all further purposes in connection with this case. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 8/28/13. (REW)
August 28, 2013 Filing 278 *SUGGESTION of Death on the Record of Plaintiff George Coulbourn by George Coulbourn, Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan) *Modified from Notice on 8/29/2013* (REW).
August 27, 2013 Filing 277 *NOTICE of Appearance/Substitution of Counsel by Trane US Incorporated< Intersoll Rand Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Anderson, Tophas) *Modified from Notice; filer added on 8/28/2013* (REW).
August 27, 2013 Filing 276 Joinder re #257 Response to Motion, by Defendant CSK Auto Incorporated. (Boblick, Jason)
August 27, 2013 Filing 275 Joinder re #257 Response to Motion, by Defendant William Powell Company. (Boblick, Jason)
August 27, 2013 Filing 274 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by William Powell Company. (Boblick, Jason)
August 27, 2013 Filing 273 *Joinder re: #257 Defendant Pfizer, Inc.'s Response by Defendant Ingersoll-Rand Company. (Anderson, Tophas) *Modified to add document number/link on 8/28/2013* (REW).
August 27, 2013 Filing 272 Joinder re #257 Response to Motion, by Defendant York International Corporation filed by York International Corporation. (Heitz, Amanda)
August 27, 2013 Filing 271 Joinder re #257 Response to Motion, by Defendant Honeywell International Incorporated. (Sparks, J)
August 27, 2013 Filing 270 Joinder re #257 Response to Motion, by Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Sparks, J)
August 27, 2013 Filing 269 Joinder re #257 Response to Motion, for Expedited Trial Date by Defendant Union Carbide Corporation filed by Union Carbide Corporation. (Hellbusch, Ronald)
August 26, 2013 Filing 268 Joinder re #257 Response to Motion, Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Motion for Expedited Trial Date by Defendant SB Decking Incorporated. (Freeman, Eric)
August 26, 2013 Filing 267 Joinder re #257 Response to Motion, Plaintiffs Ex Parte Motion for Expedited Trial Date by Defendant Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company filed by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Hoffman, Stephen)
August 26, 2013 Filing 266 Joinder re #257 Response to Motion, Defendant Copes Vulcan, Inc.'s Notice of Joinder in Defendant Pfizer Inc.'s Response to Plainitff's Exparte Motion for Expedited Trial Date. by Defendant Copes Vulcan Incorporated filed by Copes Vulcan Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sticht, John)
August 26, 2013 Filing 265 Joinder re #257 Response to Motion, by Defendant CBS Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Kahn, Kathleen)
August 26, 2013 Filing 264 Joinder re #257 Response to Motion, by Defendant Alfa Laval Incorporated. (Woods, Richard)
August 26, 2013 Filing 263 Joinder re #257 Response to Motion, by Defendant Warren Pumps LLC. (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
August 26, 2013 Filing 262 Joinder re #257 Response to Motion, by Defendant Velan Valve Corporation. (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
August 26, 2013 Filing 261 Joinder re #257 Response to Motion, by Defendant IMO Industries Incorporated. (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
August 26, 2013 Filing 260 Joinder re #257 Response to Motion, by Defendant Crane Environmental Incorporated. (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
August 26, 2013 Filing 259 Joinder re #257 Response to Motion, by Defendant Crane Company. (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
August 26, 2013 Filing 258 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Copes Vulcan Incorporated. (Sticht, John)
August 23, 2013 Filing 257 *RESPONSE to Motion re #230 , #232 MOTIONS to Modify the Court's Scheduling Order to Allow for an Expedited Pretrial Schedule and Trial Date; filed by Pfizer Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Brophy, Joseph) *Modified on 8/26/2013; to add document number/link, document is not text searchable* (REW).
August 23, 2013 Filing 256 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Weir Valves & Controls USA Incorporated. (Pacheco, Travis)
August 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER denying #101 Defendant Ingersoll Rand Company's Notice of Substitution of Counsel for Defendant Trane U.S., Inc. for failure to comply with LRCiv 83.3. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 8/22/13.(MAW)
August 22, 2013 Filing 254 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pfizer Incorporated. (Brophy, Joseph)
August 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER: On June 6, 2013, a deficiency notice was sent to counsel for Defendant Pfizer Incorporated #22 advising that counsel had failed to file the Corporate Disclosure Statement required by F.R.Civ.P.7.1 and LRCiv. 7.1.1. Counsel was given 14 days to file the Corporate Disclosure Statement. Counsel for Defendant has failed to respond to the deficiency notice and file the required Corporate Disclosure Statement. IT IS ORDERED that Defendant Pfizer Incorporated file its Corporate Disclosure Statement not later than 10 business days [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 8/21/13. (MAW)
August 20, 2013 Filing 252 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Union Carbide Corporation. (Hellbusch, Ronald)
August 19, 2013 Filing 251 *Joinder In Notice(s) #211 of Non-Parties At Fault by Defendant CBS Corporation. (Kahn, Kathleen) *Modified to add document number/link on 8/20/2013* (REW).
August 16, 2013 Filing 250 *MOTION to Dismiss Party re: Yarway Corporation by George Coulbourn, Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan) *Modified from Notice on 8/19/2013* (REW).
August 15, 2013 Filing 249 Joinder re #211 Notice Non-Parties at Fault by Defendant Warren Pumps LLC. (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
August 15, 2013 Filing 248 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Crown Cork & Seal Company Incorporated. (Isban, Mary)
August 15, 2013 Filing 247 NOTICE of Appearance by Allison Renee Edwards on behalf of Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Edwards, Allison)
August 15, 2013 Filing 246 *JOINDER re #211 Notice of Non-Parties at Fault by Crown Cork & Seal Company Incorporated. (Isban, Mary) *Modified from Notice on 8/16/2013* (REW).
August 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER: The Court has reviewed Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application for an Expedited Trial Date or, in the Alternative, an Order Shortening the Date of the Hearing of Such Motion; Memorandum of Points and Authorities #232 . The Court will set the trial date at the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set on September 16, 2013 at 9:30 a.m. All parties shall be prepared to address Plaintiffs' Motion for Expedited Trial Date on September 16, 2013. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 8/14/13. (MAW)
August 14, 2013 Filing 244 Joinder re #211 Notice Non-Parties at Fault by Defendant Velan Valve Corporation. (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
August 12, 2013 Filing 243 NOTICE re Service of Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs' Requests for Production of Documents Propounded to Defendant CBS Corporation (First Set) by CBS Corporation . (Kahn, Kathleen)
August 12, 2013 Filing 242 Joinder re #211 Notice (Other) of Non-Parites At Fault by Defendant IMO Industries Incorporated. (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
August 12, 2013 Filing 241 Joinder re #211 Notice (Other) of Non-Parites At Fault by Defendant Crane Environmental Incorporated. (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
August 12, 2013 Filing 240 Joinder re #211 Notice (Other) of Non-Parties At Fault by Defendant Crane Company. (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
August 12, 2013 Filing 239 NOTICE re of Service of Discovery Documents by York International Corporation to Plaintiffs' Request for Production of Documents (Set one). (Heitz, Amanda)
August 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER that the #232 Ex Parte Application for an Expedited Trial Date or, in the Alternative, an Order Shortening the Date of the Hearing of Such Motion will be denied within 3 days of the date of this order if counsel does not comply with the ECF Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, Section II G), specifically, subparagraph 1b. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 8/12/13. (MAP)
August 12, 2013 Filing 237 NOTICE OF WAIVER OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE by David L O'Daniel, counsel for Defendant Goulds Pumps Incorporated. (O'Daniel, David)
August 9, 2013 Filing 236 NOTICE re of Service of Defendant's Responses to Plaintiffs' Request for Production by Alfa Laval Incorporated . (Woods, Richard)
August 9, 2013 Filing 235 NOTICE re of Service of Discovery Documents by Ingersoll-Rand Company . (Anderson, Tophas)
August 9, 2013 Filing 234 NOTICE re of Service of Discovery Documents by Trane US Incorporated . (Anderson, Tophas)
August 9, 2013 Filing 233 *Additional Attachments to Main Document Proposed Order by George Coulbourn, Sandra Brown Coulbourn re #232 MOTION to Expedite . (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan) *Modified to correct event on 8/12/2013 (LFIG).
August 9, 2013 Filing 232 WITHDRAWN by Doc. #300 *Plaintiffs' MOTION to Expedite by George Coulbourn, Sandra Brown Coulbourn . (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jordan Blumenfeld-James, #2 Declaration of Dr. O'Neill, #3 Correspondence)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan) *Modified to correct event on 8/12/2013 (LFIG). Modified on 9/11/2013 (LFIG).
August 9, 2013 Filing 231 DECLARATION of Paul F. O' Neill, M.D. re #230 MOTION to Modify the Court's Scheduling Order to Allow for an Expedited Pretrial Schedule and Trial Date by Plaintiffs George Coulbourn, Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
August 8, 2013 Filing 230 *MOTION to Modify the Court's Scheduling Order to Allow for an Expedited Pretrial Schedule and Trial Date by George Coulbourn, Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan) *Modified to correct event/reflect document is not in compliance with L.R.Civ 7.1(c), on 8/9/2013 (LFIG).
August 8, 2013 Filing 229 Joinder re #211 Notice of Non-Parties At Fault by Defendant SB Decking Incorporated. (Freeman, Eric)
August 7, 2013 Filing 228 Joinder re #211 Notice of Non-Parties At Fault by Defendant William Powell Company. (Boblick, Jason)
August 7, 2013 Filing 227 Joinder re #211 Notice of Non-Parites At Fault by Defendant CSK Auto Incorporated. (Boblick, Jason)
August 6, 2013 Filing 226 *JOINDER re Identification of Non-Parties at Fault by Union Carbide Corporation by York International Corporation re #211 Notice. (Heitz, Amanda) *Modified from Notice on 8/7/2013* (REW).
August 5, 2013 Filing 225 NOTICE re Identification of Non-Parties at Fault by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company . (Hoffman, Stephen)
August 5, 2013 Filing 224 *JOINDER in Defendant Union Carbide Corporation's Identification of Non-Parties at Fault by Alfa Laval Incorporated re #211 Notice. (Woods, Richard) *Modified from Notice on 8/6/2013* (REW).
August 5, 2013 Filing 223 Joinder re #211 Notice of Non-Parties at Fault by Defendant Pfizer Incorporated. (Brophy, Joseph)
August 5, 2013 Filing 222 *JOINDER by Honeywell International Incorporated re #211 Notice In Union Carbide Corporation's Identification of Non-Parties At Fault. (Sparks, J) *Modified from Notice on 8/6/2013* (REW).
August 5, 2013 Filing 221 Joinder re #211 Notice of Non-Parties at Fault by Defendant Flowserve US Inc., Solely as Successor to Edward Valve, Inc. by Defendant Flowserve US Incorporated. (Stovall, Christopher)
August 5, 2013 Filing 220 *JOINDER by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation re #211 Notice In Union Carbide Corporation's Identification of Non-Parties At Fault. (Sparks, J) *Modified from Notice on 8/6/2013* (REW).
August 5, 2013 Filing 219 Joinder re #211 Notice of Non-Parties at Fault by Defendant Flowserve Corporation f/k/a The Duriron Company by Defendant Flowserve Corporation. (Stovall, Christopher)
August 5, 2013 Filing 218 Joinder re #211 Notice of Non-Parties at Fault by Defendant Anchor Darling Valve Company by Defendant Anchor Darling Valve Company. (Stovall, Christopher)
August 5, 2013 Filing 217 Joinder re #211 Notice of Non-Parties at Fault by Defendant FMC Corporation on Behalf of its Former Subsidiary Crosby Valve, Inc. by Defendants Crosby Valve Incorporated, FMC Corporation. (Stovall, Christopher)
August 5, 2013 Filing 216 Joinder re #211 Notice of Non-Parties at Fault by Defendant FMC Corporation on Behalf of its Former Peerless Pump Business by Defendant FMC Corporation. (Stovall, Christopher)
August 5, 2013 Filing 215 Joinder re #211 Notice of Non-Parties at Fault by Defendant Sterling Fluid System (USA), LLC, f/k/a Peerless Pump Company by Defendant Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC. (Stovall, Christopher)
August 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER pursuant to the #209 Stipulation for Dismissal, this action is dismissed without prejudice as to Asten Johnson, Inc. (sued individually and as successorin-interest to The Asten Group), with each party to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 8/5/13. (REW)
August 5, 2013 Filing 213 Joinder re #211 Notice Joinder by Defendant Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. f/k/a Atwood & Morrill in Notice by Defendant Union Carbide Corporation of Identification of Non-Parties at Fault by Defendant Weir Valves & Controls USA Incorporated. (Sticht, John)
August 5, 2013 Filing 212 Joinder re #211 Notice Joinder by Defendant Copes Vulcan, Inc,In Notice by Defendant Union Carbide Corporation of Identification of Non-Parties at Fault by Defendant Copes Vulcan Incorporated. (Sticht, John)
August 5, 2013 Filing 211 NOTICE re Identification of Non-Parties at Fault by Union Carbide Corporation . (Hellbusch, Ronald)
August 5, 2013 Filing 210 *NOTICE of Waiver of jElectronic Service re Removal of Attorneys from ECF System by Armstrong International Incorporated. (Rubin, Brian) *Modified from Notice on 8/6/2013* (REW).
August 2, 2013 Filing 209 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Asten Johnson Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brophy, Joseph)
August 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER pursuant to the #204 Stipulation for Dismissal, all claims filed in this action are dismissed without prejudice as to HIGBEE, INC. only, with each party to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 8/2/13. (REW)
August 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER pursuant to #203 Stipulation for Dismissal, all claims filed in this action are dismissed without prejudice as to HOPEMAN BROTHERS, INC. only, with each party to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 8/2/13. (REW)
August 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Plaintiffs George Coulbourn and Sandra Brown Coulbourn, hereby dismiss without prejudice all claims filed in this action against Defendant UNIROYAL HOLDING, INC. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 8/2/13. (REW)
August 1, 2013 Filing 205 *NOTICE of Lodging Proposed Order of Dismissal without prejudice of Defendant Uniroyal Holding, Inc. by George Coulbourn, Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan) *Modified from Stipulation on 8/2/2013* (REW).
August 1, 2013 Filing 204 STIPULATION of Dismissal without prejudice of Defendant Higbee, Inc. by George Coulbourn, Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order for dismissal without prejudice of Defendant Higbee, Inc.)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
August 1, 2013 Filing 203 STIPULATION of Dismissal without prejudice of Defendant Hopeman Brothers, Inc. by George Coulbourn, Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order for dismissal without prejudice of Defendant Hopeman Brothers, Inc.)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
July 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED resetting the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for Monday, September 16, 2013 at 9:30 a.m., Courtroom 502, 401 W. Washington Street, Fifth Floor, Phoenix, AZ. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 7/30/13. (MAW)
July 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER pursuant to the Parties' #200 Stipulation of Dismissal, all claims filed in this action be dismissed without prejudice as to COEN COMPANY, INC. only, with each party to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 7/29/13. (REW)
July 29, 2013 Filing 200 STIPULATION of Dismissal without prejudice of defendant coen company by George Coulbourn, Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order for dismissal without prejudice of defendant Coen Company)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
July 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER pursuant to the #145 Stipulation for Dismissal, all claims and causes of action contained in Plaintiffs' Complaint and all amendments thereto, shall be dismissed without prejudice as to BNS LLC, fka BNS Co., fka Brown & Sharpe Manufacturing Company, improperly sued as BNS Company fka Brown & Sharpe Manufacturing Company, each party to bear their own attorneys' fees and costs. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 7/25/13. (REW)
July 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER, pursuant to the #144 Stipulation for Dismissal, all claims and causes of action contained in Plaintiffs' Complaint and all amendments thereto, shall be dismissed without prejudice as to Amtrol Inc, individually and as successor-in-interest to Thrush Products Inc. and H.A. Thrush Co., incorrectly captioned as Amtrol, Inc. (Sued individually as successor-in-interest to Thrush Company and as successor-in-interest to H.A. Thrush Co.) and also incorrectly captioned as Thrush Co Inc, each party to bear their own attorneys' fees and costs. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 7/25/13. (REW)
July 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER pursuant to the #143 Stipulation for Dismissal, all claims and causes of action contained in Plaintiffs' Complaint and all amendments thereto, shall be dismissed without prejudice as to Watts Water Technologies Inc, sued as Successor-in-Interest to Mueller Steam Specialty Inc, each party to bear their own attorneys' fees and costs. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 7/25/13. (REW)
July 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER pursuant to the #142 Stipulation for Dismissal, all claims and causes of action contained in Plaintiffs' Complaint and all amendments thereto, shall be dismissed without prejudice as to Carrier Corporation, each party to bear their own attorneys' fees and costs. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 7/25/13. (REW)
July 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER, pursuant to the #139 Stipulation for Dismissal, this cause of action be dismissed with prejudice as to Viad Corp (sued erroneously herein as Viad Corporation f/k/a The Dial Corporation), as successorininterest to GriscomRussell Company, with each party to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 7/25/13. (REW)
July 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER OF DISMISSAL, granting the #137 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss; this action and all claims and causes of action against Goulds Pumps, Inc., including the claims and causes of action contained in Plaintiffs' Complaint and all amendments thereto, are dismissed without prejudice, each party to bear its/his/her own attorneys' fees and costs. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 7/25/13.(REW)
July 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER pursuant to the #134 Stipulated Motion for Dismissal, all claims and causes of action against Cameron International Corporation, including the claims and causes of action contained in Plaintiffs' Complaint and all amendments thereto, are dismissed without prejudice, each party to bear their own attorneys' fees and costs. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 7/24/13. (REW)
July 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER pursuant to the #179 Stipulation for Dismissal, all claims filed in this action are dismissed without prejudice as to O.C. Keckley Company only, with each party to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 7/24/13. (REW)
July 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER pursuant to the #156 Stipulation for Dismissal, all claims filed in this action are dismissed without prejudice as to VIKING PUMP, INC. only, with each party to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 7/24/13. (REW)
July 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER pursuant to the #157 Stipulation for Dismissal, all claims filed in this action are dismissed without prejudice as to Parker-Hannifin Corporation only, with each party to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 7/24/13. (REW)
July 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER pursuant to the #158 Stipulation for Dismissal, this cause of action is dismissed without prejudice as to JOHN CRANE, INC. only, with each party to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 7/24/13. (REW)
July 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER pursuant to the #155 Stipulation for Dismissal, all claims filed in this action are dismissed without prejudice as to FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION only, with each party to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 7/24/13. (REW)
July 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER pursuant to the #160 Stipulation for Dismissal, all claims filed in this action are dismissed without prejudice as to Dover Corporation only, with each party to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 7/24/13. (REW)
July 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER pursuant to the #161 Stipulation for Dismissal, all claims filed in this action are dismissed without prejudice as to COFFIN TURBO PUMP, INC. only, with each party to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 7/24/13. (REW)
July 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER pursuant to the #162 Stipulation for Dismissal, all claims filed in this action are dismissed without prejudice as to CLEAVER-BROOKS, INC., Erroneously sued as Successor-in-Interest to Davis Engineering Company only, with each party to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 7/24/13. (REW)
July 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER pursuant to the #159 Stipulation for Dismissal, all claims filed in this action are dismissed without prejudice as to Clark-Reliance Corporation and its Jerguson Gage & Valve Division, Improperly named as Defendant Jerguson Gage & Valve Company only, with each party to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 7/24/13. (REW)
July 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER pursuant to the #163 Stipulation for Dismissal, all claims filed in this action are dismissed without prejudice as to BW/IP INTERNATIONAL, INC. (sued individually and as successor-in-interest to BYRON JACKSON PUMP COMPANY) only, with each party to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 7/24/13. (REW)
July 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER pursuant to the #164 Stipulation for Dismissal, all claims filed in this action are dismissed without prejudice as to BLACKMER PUMP COMPANY only, with each party to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 7/24/13. (REW)
July 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER pursuant to #173 Stipulation for Dismissal, all claims filed in this action are dismissed without prejudice as to ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC. only, with each party to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 7/24/13. (REW)
July 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER pursuant to the #177 Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel for Anchor Darling Valve Company; Larry J Crown and Christopher R Stovall are hereby substituted for Robert R Berk and Kevin Neal. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 7/23/13. (REW)
July 24, 2013 Filing 179 *AMENDED/CORRECTED STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendant O.C. Keckley Company (corrected) re: #178 Stipulation by George Coulbourn, Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order for Dismissal without Prejudice of Defendant O.C. Keckley Company)(Gamble, Tyson) *Modified to add omitted text on 7/25/2013* (REW).
July 24, 2013 Filing 178 AMENDED by #179 - STIPULATION of Dismissal without Prejudice of Defendant O.C. Keckley Company by George Coulbourn, Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order for Dismissal without Prejudice of Defendant O.C. Keckley Company)(Gamble, Tyson)
July 23, 2013 Filing 177 STIPULATION for Substitution of Counsel for Anchor Darling Valve Company With Consent of Client by Anchor Darling Valve Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stovall, Christopher)
July 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER granting the #152 Stipulated Motion, this action is dismissed without prejudice as against defendant CATERPILLAR INC. pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41; each side to bear its own attorney fees, costs and expenses, if any, relating to the action. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 7/22/13.(REW)
July 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER: After review of the docket the Court notes that numerous Stipulations to Dismiss have been filed. IT IS ORDERED directing the parties to the Policies and Procedure Manual for Electronic Filing located at www.azd.uscourts.gov. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED directing counsel for Plaintiff to e-mail each Stipulation to Dismiss to this Court's Chamber's mailbox: Bolton_chambers@azd.uscourts.gov. The stipulations shall be in.pdf format and the orders in Word format. One stipulation and order per e-mail. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any other motions filed shall also be e-mailed to the address above in the same format, e.g. motion in.pdf format order in Word format.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that after all the Stipulations to Dismiss have been received by this Court, a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference shall be set.. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 7/22/13. (MAW)
July 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 174 NOTICE OF RECUSAL/ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. ORDERED By random draw, this case is reassigned to the Honorable Susan R. Bolton. All further filings in this case should now list the following complete case number: CV-13-8141-PCT-SRB. Signed by Judge H Russel Holland on 7/22/13. (MAP)
July 18, 2013 Filing 173 STIPULATION of Dismissal without prejudice of Defendant Armstrong International, Inc. by George Coulbourn, Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Dismissal without Prejudice of Defendant Armstrong International, Inc.)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
July 18, 2013 Filing 172 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Order #170 , Judge John W. Sedwick recused himself from this matter. The case was assigned in error to Magistrate Judge Mark E Aspey. THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED that this case is assigned by random draw to Judge H Russel Holland. All future pleadings and papers submitted shall contain the following case number: CV 13-8141-PCT-HRH. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
July 18, 2013 Filing 171 Magistrate Election Form Deadline set as to all parties (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(MAP)
July 18, 2013 Filing 170 MINUTE ORDER from the Chambers of Judge John W Sedwick. The assigned judge hereby recuses. The Clerk of Court will please assign this case to another district judge. NOTE: This case has been reassigned, by random lot to Magistrate Judge Mark E. Aspey. All future pleadings and papers submitted shall contain the following case number: CV 13-8141-PCT-MEA. (REW)
July 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting #168 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
July 16, 2013 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX135980 as to Jay E Stuemke. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
July 15, 2013 Filing 168 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Jay E Stuemke on behalf of George Coulbourn, and Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (BAS)
July 15, 2013 Filing 167 NOTICE of Deposition of Social Security Administration, Division of Earnings Records Operations, filed by Ingersoll-Rand Company. (Anderson, Tophas)
July 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER, this matter has been reassigned by random lot to the Honorable John W Sedwick; all future pleadings and papers submitted for filing shall bear the following complete case number: CV-13-08141-PCT-JWS; vacating the Scheduling Conference currently set for 7/19/13, to be reset by Judge Sedwick. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 7/12/13. (REW)
July 11, 2013 Filing 165 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by General Electric Company. (Lite, Jeremy)
July 10, 2013 Filing 164 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendant Blackmer Pump Company by George Coulbourn, Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order for Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendant Blackmer Pump Company)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
July 10, 2013 Filing 163 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendant BW/IP International, Inc. by George Coulbourn, Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order for Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendant BW/IP International, Inc.)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
July 10, 2013 Filing 162 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendant Cleaver-Brooks, Inc. by George Coulbourn, Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order for Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendant Cleaver-Brooks, Inc.)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
July 10, 2013 Filing 161 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendant Coffin Turbo Pump, Inc. by George Coulbourn, Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order for Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendant Coffin Turbo Pump, Inc.)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
July 10, 2013 Filing 160 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendant Dover Corporation by George Coulbourn, Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order for Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendant Dover Corporation)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
July 10, 2013 Filing 159 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendant Clark-Reliance Corporation and Its Jerguson Gage & Valve Division, Improperly Named as Defendant Jerguson Gage & Valve Company by George Coulbourn, Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order for Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendant Clark-Reliance Corporation and Its Jerguson Gage & Valve Division, Improperly Named as Defendant Jerguson Gage & Valve Company)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
July 10, 2013 Filing 158 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendant John Crane, Inc. by George Coulbourn, Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order for Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendant John Crane, Inc.)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
July 10, 2013 Filing 157 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendant Parker-Hannifin Corporation by George Coulbourn, Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order for Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendant Parker-Hannifin Corporation)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
July 10, 2013 Filing 156 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendant Viking Pump, Inc. by George Coulbourn, Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order for Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendant Viking Pump, Inc.)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
July 10, 2013 Filing 155 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendant Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation by George Coulbourn, Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendant Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
July 10, 2013 Filing 154 NOTICE re Service of Initial Disclsoure Statement by William Powell Company . (Boblick, Jason)
July 10, 2013 Filing 153 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crane Environmental Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Crane Co. for Crane Environmental Incorporated.. (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
July 10, 2013 Filing 152 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Caterpillar Inc. Pursuant to FRCP 41 by Caterpillar Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order on Stipulation to Dismiss Defendant Caterpillar, Inc.)(Bleichner, Brad)
July 10, 2013 Filing 151 DEFENDANT'S DEMAND for Jury Trial by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Stout, David)
July 10, 2013 Filing 150 NOTICE of Errata re #148 Demand for Jury Trial by Defendant by Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Stout, David)
July 10, 2013 Filing 149 NOTICE re SERVICE OF ITS FED.R.CIV.P.26(1) DISCLOSURES by Union Carbide Corporation . (Birk, Mary)
July 10, 2013 Filing 148 *DEFENDANT'S DEMAND for Jury Trial by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Stout, David) *Modified on 7/11/2013; document titled incorrectly, corrected document filed as #151* (REW).
July 10, 2013 Filing 147 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Stout, David)
July 10, 2013 Filing 146 Metropolitan Life Insurance Company's ANSWER to Complaint by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.(Stout, David)
July 10, 2013 Filing 145 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by BNS Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order of Dismissal)(Beiermeister, Kathleen)
July 10, 2013 Filing 144 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Amtrol Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order of Dismissal)(Beiermeister, Kathleen)
July 10, 2013 Filing 143 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Watts Water Technologies Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order of Dismissal)(Beiermeister, Kathleen)
July 9, 2013 Filing 142 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Carrier Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Carrier Corporation)(Beiermeister, Kathleen)
July 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting in part and denying in part #140 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
July 9, 2013 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX135744 as to Darryl E Atkinson. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
July 9, 2013 Filing 140 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Darryl E Atkinson on behalf of CBS Corporation, and General Electric Company. (BAS)
July 9, 2013 Filing 139 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendant Viad Corp by Viad Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brophy, Joseph)
July 8, 2013 Filing 138 NOTICE of Deposition of George Coulbourn, filed by Union Carbide Corporation. (Birk, Mary)
July 8, 2013 Filing 137 MOTION to Dismiss Party Goulds Pumps, Inc. Stipulated by Goulds Pumps Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Daniel, David)
July 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting #135 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
July 3, 2013 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX135621 as to Hollingsworth Barret Marshall. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
July 3, 2013 Filing 135 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Hollingsworth Barret Marshall on behalf of Cleaver-Brooks Incorporated. (BAS)
July 3, 2013 Filing 134 *STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF CAMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION by Cameron International Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Birk, Mary) *Modified to correct Stipulation event on 7/5/2013* (REW).
July 3, 2013 Filing 133 *Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Higbee Incorporated. (Abbott, Steven) *Modified from Statement on 7/5/2013* (REW).
July 3, 2013 Filing 132 NOTICE re of Pending Motions by Higbee Incorporated . (Abbott, Steven)
June 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting #130 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
June 28, 2013 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX135465 as to Edward M Slaughter. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 28, 2013 Filing 129 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC identifying Corporate Parent Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) Holding, Inc. for Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC.. (Stovall, Christopher)
June 27, 2013 Filing 130 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Edward M Slaughter on behalf of Cleaver-Brooks Incorporated. (BAS)
June 26, 2013 Filing 128 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
June 26, 2013 Filing 127 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
June 26, 2013 Filing 126 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
June 26, 2013 Filing 125 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
June 26, 2013 Filing 124 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
June 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting #112 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #113 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
June 26, 2013 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX135386 as to Mary Price Birk. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 26, 2013 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX135387 as to Ronald Lyle Hellbusch. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting #121 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
June 25, 2013 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX135339 as to Tyson B Gamble. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 25, 2013 Filing 121 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Tyson B Gamble on behalf of George Coulbourn, and Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (BAS)
June 24, 2013 Filing 120 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
June 24, 2013 Filing 119 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
June 24, 2013 Filing 118 NOTICE of Deposition of George Coulbourn, filed by George Coulbourn. (Gonzales, Richard)
June 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting #116 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
June 21, 2013 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX135284 as to Eric O Freeman. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 21, 2013 Filing 116 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Eric O Freeman on behalf of Caterpillar Incorporated, Cleaver-Brooks Incorporated, John Crane Incorporated, and SB Decking Incorporated. (BAS)
June 21, 2013 Filing 115 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Watts Water Technologies Incorporated. (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
June 21, 2013 Filing 114 NOTICE of Deposition of Higbee, Inc. 30(b)(6), filed by George Coulbourn. (Gonzales, Richard)
June 21, 2013 Filing 113 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Ronald L. Hellbusch by Cameron International Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation. (Birk, Mary)
June 21, 2013 Filing 112 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Mary Price Birk by Cameron International Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation. (Birk, Mary)
June 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting #106 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #107 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #108 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #109 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #110 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
June 21, 2013 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX135252 as to Brian Barrow. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 21, 2013 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX135251 as to Jennifer L Bartlett. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 21, 2013 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX135249 as to Jordan Blumenfeld-James. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 21, 2013 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX135248 as to Nectaria Belantis. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 20, 2013 Filing 110 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Jonah D King on behalf of plaintiffs George Coulbourn and Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (BAS)
June 20, 2013 Filing 109 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Brian Barrow on behalf of George Coulbourn and Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (BAS)
June 20, 2013 Filing 108 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Jennifer L Bartlett on behalf of plaintiffs George Coulbourn and Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (BAS)
June 20, 2013 Filing 107 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Jordan Blumenfeld-James on behalf of plaintiffs George Coulbourn and Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (BAS)
June 20, 2013 Filing 106 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Nectaria Belantis on behalf of plaintiffs George Coulbourn and Sandra Brown Coulbourn. (BAS)
June 20, 2013 Filing 105 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SB Decking Incorporated. (Bleichner, Brad)
June 20, 2013 Filing 104 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Brad D. Bleichner appearing for SB Decking Incorporated. . (Bleichner, Brad)
June 20, 2013 Filing 103 Corporate Disclosure Statement by John Crane Incorporated. (Bleichner, Brad)
June 20, 2013 Filing 102 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Brad D. Bleichner appearing for John Crane Incorporated. . (Bleichner, Brad)
June 20, 2013 Filing 101 *MOTION for Substitution of Counsel by Ingersoll-Rand Company, Trane US Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Order)(Anderson, Tophas) Modified on 6/20/2013 to change to motion type (KFZ). *Modified on 6/21/2013 to reflect correction* (REW).
June 20, 2013 Filing 100 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
June 20, 2013 Filing 99 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
June 20, 2013 Filing 98 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
June 20, 2013 Filing 97 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
June 20, 2013 Filing 96 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
June 20, 2013 Filing 95 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FMC Corporation. (Stovall, Christopher)
June 20, 2013 Filing 94 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BW/IP International Incorporated. (Stovall, Christopher)
June 20, 2013 Filing 93 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Flowserve US Incorporated. (Stovall, Christopher)
June 20, 2013 Filing 92 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Flowserve Corporation. (Stovall, Christopher)
June 20, 2013 Filing 91 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crosby Valve Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent FMC Corporation for Crosby Valve Incorporated.. (Stovall, Christopher)
June 20, 2013 Filing 90 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Amtrol Incorporated. (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
June 20, 2013 Filing 89 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BNS Company identifying Corporate Parent BNS Holding, Inc. Liquidating Trust for BNS Company.. (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
June 20, 2013 Filing 88 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Weir Valves & Controls USA Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent The Weir Group PLC, Other Affiliate Atwood & Morrill for Weir Valves & Controls USA Incorporated.. (Pacheco, Travis)
June 20, 2013 Filing 87 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Warren Pumps LLC identifying Corporate Parent Colfax Corporation for Warren Pumps LLC.. (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
June 20, 2013 Filing 86 *NOTICE of Attorney Substitution re Remove Counsel from CM/ECF Service List by Parker-Hannifin Corporation. (Roberts, Troy) *Modified from Notice on 6/21/2013* (REW).
June 20, 2013 Filing 85 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Caterpillar Incorporated. (Bleichner, Brad)
June 19, 2013 Filing 84 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
June 19, 2013 Filing 83 NOTICE of Appearance by David L O'Daniel on behalf of Goulds Pumps Incorporated. (O'Daniel, David)
June 19, 2013 Filing 82 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Goulds Pumps Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent ITT Corporation, Corporate Parent Goulds Pumps Incorporated for Goulds Pumps Incorporated.. (O'Daniel, David)
June 19, 2013 Filing 81 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Parker-Hannifin Corporation. (Roberts, Troy)
June 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting #78 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #79 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
June 19, 2013 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX135213 as to Heather H Neubauer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 19, 2013 Filing 79 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Heather H Neubauer on behalf of Amtrol Incorporated, BNS Company, Carrier Corporation, Crane Company, Crane Environmental Incorporated, IMO Industries Incorporated, Velan Valve Corporation, Warren Pumps LLC, and Watts Water Technologies Incorporated. (BAS)
June 19, 2013 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX135212 as to John C Hughes. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 19, 2013 Filing 78 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney John C Hughes on behalf of Amtrol Incorporated, BNS Company, Carrier Corporation, Crane Company, Crane Environmental Incorporated, IMO Industries Incorporated, Velan Valve Corporation, Warren Pumps LLC, and Watts Water Technologies Incorporated. (BAS)
June 19, 2013 Filing 77 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Honeywell International Incorporated. (Sparks, J)
June 19, 2013 Filing 76 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
June 19, 2013 Filing 75 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
June 19, 2013 Filing 74 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crown Cork & Seal Company Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Crown Holdings, Inc. for Crown Cork & Seal Company Incorporated.. (Isban, Mary)
June 19, 2013 Filing 73 NOTICE re Service of Discovery Requests by Anchor Darling Valve Company . (Neal, Kevin)
June 18, 2013 Filing 72 NOTICE of Attorney Substitution by Kimberly Gene Allen. (Allen, Kimberly)
June 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting the #51 Motion to Substitute Attorney; Brad D Bleichner of Selman Breitman LLP is substituted as counsel of record for John Crane, Inc. in place of Andrew James Peterson, Marshall Humphrey, III and Ryan Scott Andrus of Humphrey & Petersen PC. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 6/17/13.(REW)
June 18, 2013 Filing 70 Corporate Disclosure Statement by York International Corporation. (Heitz, Amanda)
June 18, 2013 Filing 69 NOTICE re of Service of CBS Corporation's First Set of Interrogatories and First Set of Requests for Production by CBS Corporation . (Kahn, Kathleen)
June 18, 2013 Filing 68 Corporate Disclosure Statement by IMO Industries Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Colfax Corporation, Corporate Parent Colfax Fluid Handling LLC, Corporate Parent IMO Holdings, Inc. for IMO Industries Incorporated.. (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
June 17, 2013 Filing 67 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Armstrong International Incorporated. (Rubin, Brian)
June 17, 2013 Filing 66 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
June 17, 2013 Filing 65 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
June 17, 2013 Filing 64 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Viking Pump Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent IDEX Corporation for Viking Pump Incorporated.. (Pacheco, Travis)
June 17, 2013 Filing 63 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jerguson Gage & Valve Company. (Sticht, John)
June 17, 2013 Filing 62 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Coen Company Incorporated. (Sticht, John)
June 17, 2013 Filing 61 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dover Corporation. (Sticht, John)
June 17, 2013 Filing 60 Corporate Disclosure Statement by William Powell Company. (Boblick, Jason)
June 17, 2013 Filing 59 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CSK Auto Incorporated. (Boblick, Jason)
June 17, 2013 Filing 58 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cameron International Corporation. (Birk, Mary)
June 17, 2013 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen L Beiermeister on behalf of Warren Pumps LLC. (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
June 17, 2013 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen L Beiermeister on behalf of Watts Water Technologies Incorporated. (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
June 17, 2013 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen L Beiermeister on behalf of BNS Company. (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
June 17, 2013 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen L Beiermeister on behalf of Amtrol Incorporated. (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
June 17, 2013 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen L Beiermeister on behalf of IMO Industries Incorporated. (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
June 17, 2013 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen L Beiermeister on behalf of Crane Environmental Incorporated. (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
June 17, 2013 Filing 51 *MOTION to Substitute Counsel Consent Order Granting Substitution of Attorney by John Crane Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Bleichner, Brad) *Modified to correct Motion event on 6/18/2013* (REW).
June 14, 2013 Filing 50 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
June 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting #48 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
June 14, 2013 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX135031 as to Steven Abbott. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER that a motion pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) is discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. Therefore, the parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of a motion to dismiss to determine whether it can be avoided. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 6/14/2013. (KFZ)
June 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER - Scheduling Conference is set for 7/19/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 602, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge G Murray Snow. (See attached order for full details). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 6/14/2013. (KFZ)
June 13, 2013 Filing 48 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Steven Brian Abbott on behalf of Higbee Incorporated. (BAS)
June 13, 2013 Filing 45 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
June 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 RECUSAL ORDER, this action is reassigned by automated random selection to the Honorable G Murray Snow for all further proceedings; all future documents filed and/or served in this action shall be captioned with case number CV 13-8141-PCT-GMS. Signed by Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 6/13/13. (REW)
June 13, 2013 Filing 43 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Union Carbide Corporation. (Birk, Mary)
June 12, 2013 Filing 42 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
June 12, 2013 Filing 41 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
June 12, 2013 Filing 40 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Anchor Darling Valve Company. (Neal, Kevin)
June 12, 2013 Filing 39 Joinder re #19 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Anchor Darling Valve Company. (Neal, Kevin)
June 12, 2013 Filing 38 Minute Order: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-13-8141-PCT-PGR. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
June 11, 2013 Filing 37 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
June 11, 2013 Filing 36 NOTICE of Deposition of George Coulbourn, filed by George Coulbourn. (Gonzales, Richard)
June 11, 2013 Filing 35 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Carrier Corporation identifying Corporate Parent United Technologies Corporation for Carrier Corporation.. (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
June 11, 2013 Filing 34 *NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian David Rubin. (Rubin, Brian) *Modified to correct text on 6/12/2013* (REW).
June 10, 2013 Filing 33 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Velan Valve Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Velan, Inc. for Velan Valve Corporation.. (Hendricks, John)
June 7, 2013 Magistrate Election Form Deadline Set. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
June 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER That this case be reassigned, by lot, to another judge in the District of Arizona. FURTHER ORDERED that this matter has been reassigned by random lot to the Honorable Michelle H. Burns. All future pleadings and papers submitted for filing shall bear the following complete case number: CV-13-08141-PHX-MHB. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 6/7/13. (Attachments: #1 Instructions, #2 Consent Form)(MAP)
June 7, 2013 Filing 31 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Trane US Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Ingersoll Rand, PLC for Trane US Incorporated.. (Roberts, Troy)
June 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER, this matter has been reassigned by random lot to the Honorable Neil V Wake; all future pleadings and papers submitted for filing shall bear the following complete case number: CV 13-8141-PCT-NVW. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/7/13. (REW)
June 7, 2013 Filing 29 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ingersoll-Rand Company identifying Corporate Parent Ingersoll Rand, PLC for Ingersoll-Rand Company.. (Anderson, Tophas)
June 7, 2013 Filing 28 Joinder in Defendant Crane Co.'s Notice of Removal by Defendant Ingersoll-Rand Company. (Anderson, Tophas)
June 6, 2013 Filing 27 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Hoffman, Stephen)
June 6, 2013 Filing 26 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alfa Laval Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Alfa Laval Incorporated for Alfa Laval Incorporated.. (Woods, Richard)
June 6, 2013 Filing 25 *NOTICE TO REMOVE COUNSEL FROM CM/ECR SERVICE LIST by Trane US Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sheridan, Amanda) *Modified from Motion on 6/7/2013* (REW).
June 6, 2013 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CBS Corporation. (Kahn, Kathleen)
June 6, 2013 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Electric Company. (Lite, Jeremy)
June 6, 2013 Filing 22 NOTICE TO PARTY RE CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Alfa Laval Incorporated, Amtrol Incorporated, Anchor Darling Valve Company, Armstrong International Incorporated, Asten Johnson Incorporated, Blackmer Pump Company, BNS Company, BW/IP International Incorporated, Cameron International Corporation, Carrier Corporation, Caterpillar Incorporated, CBS Corporation, Cleaver-Brooks Incorporated, Coen Company Incorporated, Coffin Turbo Pump Incorporated, Copes Vulcan Incorporated, Crane Company, Crane Environmental Incorporated, Crosby Valve Incorporated, Crown Cork & Seal Company Incorporated, CSK Auto Incorporated, Elliott Turbo Machinery Company, Flowserve Corporation, Flowserve US Incorporated, FMC Corporation, Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, General Electric Company, Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Goulds Pumps Incorporated, Higbee Incorporated, Honeywell International Incorporated, Hopeman Brothers Incorporated, IMO Industries Incorporated, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Jerguson Gage & Valve Company, John Crane Incorporated, O.C. Keckley Company, Parker-Hannifin Corporation, Pfizer Incorporated, SB Decking Incorporated, Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC, Thrush Company Incorporated, Union Carbide Corporation, Velan Valve Corporation, Viad Corporation, Viking Pump Incorporated, Warren Pumps LLC, Watts Water Technologies Incorporated, William Powell Company, Yarway Corporation, York International Corporation, and Weir Valves & Controls USA Incorporated. (REK)
June 5, 2013 Filing 18 Joinder in Defendant Crane Co.'s Notice of Removal of Action Under 28 U.S.C. 1442 and 1446 by Defendant Trane US Incorporated. (Roberts, Troy)
June 5, 2013 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Sparks, J)
June 5, 2013 Filing 16 Additional Attachments to Main Document re #15 JOINDER in Crane Co.'s Notice of Removal by Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits H - I of Horne Affidavit, #2 Exhibit 5 - Part 1 of Mohave File, #3 Exhibit 5 - Part 2 of Mohave File, #4 Exhibit 5 - Part 3 of Mohave File, #5 Exhibit 6 - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Sparks, J) Modified to correct text on 6/6/2013 (REW).
June 5, 2013 Filing 15 *JOINDER in Crane Co.'s Notice of Removal by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Plaintiff's Initial Disclosure Statement, #3 Exhibit 3 - Affidavit of Kraft, #4 Exhibit 3 - Exhibit A to Kraft Affidavit, #5 Exhibit B to Kraft Affidavit, #6 Exhibit C to Kraft Affidavit, #7 Exhibit 4 - Affidavit of Horne, #8 Exhibits A - C of Horne Affidavit, #9 Exhibits D - F of Horne Affidavit, #10 Exhibit G of Horne Affidavit)(Sparks, J) *Modified from Motion on 6/6/2013* (REW).
June 5, 2013 Filing 14 Joinder re #11 Joinder, #13 Joinder, #1 Joinder, #10 Joinder, #4 Joinder, #3 Joinder,, #6 Joinder, #7 Joinder in Defendant Crane Co.'s Notice of Removal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1442 and 1446 by Defendant Alfa Laval Incorporated. (Woods, Richard)
June 5, 2013 Filing 13 Joinder in Defendant Crane Co.'s Notice of Removal of Action Under 28 U.S.C. 1442 and 1446 by Defendant Velan Valve Corporation filed by Velan Valve Corporation. (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
June 5, 2013 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hopeman Brothers Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent AWG Corporation for Hopeman Brothers Incorporated.. (Crown, Larry)
June 5, 2013 Filing 11 Joinder in Defendant Crane Co.'s Notice of Removal of Action Under 28 U.S.C. 1442 and 1446 by Defendant Carrier Corporation filed by Carrier Corporation. (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
June 5, 2013 Filing 10 Joinder in Defendant Crane Co.'s Notice of Removal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1442 & 1446 by Defendant Hopeman Brothers Incorporated. (Crown, Larry)
June 5, 2013 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Foster Wheeler LLC, Corporate Parent Foster Wheeler AG (Switzerland), Corporate Parent Foster Wheeler Ltd., Corporate Parent Foster Wheeler Holdings Ltd., Other Affiliate Fidelity Management and Research Company for Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation.. (Pacheco, Travis)
June 5, 2013 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Copes Vulcan Incorporated. (Sticht, John)
June 5, 2013 Filing 7 Joinder in Notice of Removal by Defendant Copes Vulcan Incorporated. (Sticht, John)
June 5, 2013 Filing 6 Joinder to Defendant Crane Co's Notice of Removal by Defendant CBS Corporation. (Kahn, Kathleen)
June 5, 2013 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Blackmer Pump Company. (Sticht, John)
June 5, 2013 Filing 4 Joinder in Notice of Removal by Defendant Blackmer Pump Company. (Sticht, John)
June 5, 2013 Filing 3 Joinder in Defendant Crane Co.'s Notice of Removal of Action Under 28 U.S.C. 1442 and 1446 by Defendant Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Plaintiffs' Original Complaint, #2 Exhibit B: Plaintiffs Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement, #3 Exhibit C: Hagen, #4 Exhibit D: Ruppel, #5 Exhibit E: Willis, #6 Exhibit F: Bouchard, #7 Exhibit G: Lewis, #8 Exhibit H: Curry, #9 Exhibit I: Salamante, #10 Exhibit J: Wright, #11 Exhibit K: Schroppe, #12 Exhibit L: Lehman)(Pacheco, Travis)
June 5, 2013 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Viad Corporation. (Brophy, Joseph)
June 5, 2013 Filing 1 Joinder in Removal Notice of Defendant Crane Co. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1442 by Defendant Viad Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Brophy, Joseph)
June 4, 2013 *****State Court record received on 6/04/2013*****ANSWER to First Amended Complaint by Cleaver-Brooks Incorporated.*****filed in State Court on 5/09/2013, docketed in U.S. District Court on 6/04/2013 for case management purposes.*****(REK)
June 4, 2013 *****State Court record received on 6/04/2013*****ANSWER to First Amended Complaint by Coffin Turbo Pump Incorporated, Crosby Valve Incorporated, FMC Corporation, Sterling Fluid Systems (USA) LLC.*****filed in State Court on 5/07/2013, docketed in U.S. District Court on 6/04/2013 for case management purposes.*****(REK)
June 4, 2013 *****State Court record received on 6/04/2013*****ANSWER to First Amended Complaint by Trane US Incorporated.*****filed in State Court on 5/03/2013, docketed in U.S. District Court on 6/04/2013 for case management purposes.*****(REK)
June 4, 2013 *****State Court record received on 6/04/2013*****ANSWER to First Amended Complaint by Flowserve US Incorporated.*****filed in State Court on 5/02/2013, docketed in U.S. District Court on 6/04/2013 for case management purposes.*****(REK)
June 4, 2013 *****State Court record received on 6/04/2013*****ANSWER to First Amended Complaint by O.C. Keckley Company.*****filed in State Court on 4/24/2013, docketed in U.S. District Court on 6/04/2013 for case management purposes.*****(REK)
June 4, 2013 *****State Court record received on 6/04/2013*****ANSWER to First Amended Complaint by Caterpillar Incorporated.*****filed in State Court on 4/19/2013, docketed in U.S. District Court on 6/04/2013 for case management purposes.*****(REK)
June 4, 2013 *****State Court record received on 6/04/2013