Pete v. USA

Petitioner: Branden Pete
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 3:2013cv08149
Filed: June 7, 2013
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: Navajo
Referring Judge: David K Duncan (PS)
Presiding Judge: Robert C Broomfield
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentence
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 9, 2014 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the reference to the Magistrate Judge is WITHDRAWN. Petitioner Branden Pete's 7 Amended Motion to Vacate, Set Aside, or CorrectSentence by a Person in Federal Custody (28 U.S.C. § 2255) is GRANTED; and because the petitioner i s seeking the identical relief in United States v. Pete, (Doc. 337 in CR-03-0355-PCT-RCB), that motion is GRANTED. Petitioner Branden Pete shall be resentenced on Monday, the 3rd day of March, 2014, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 606, Sandra Day O'Connor United States Courthouse, 401 West Washington, Phoenix, Arizona 85003. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 1/6/2014. (LFIG)
August 29, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The Clerk of Court must serve a copy of the Amended § 2255 Motion (Doc. 7 in CV 13-8149-PCT-RCB (DKD)) and this Order on the United States Attorney for the District of Arizona. The parties and the Clerk of Court must file all document s related to the Amended § 2255 Motion in the civil case. The United States Attorney for the District of Arizona has 60 days from the date of service within which to answer the Amended § 2255 Motion. The matter is referred to Magistrate Judge David K. Duncan pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for further proceedings and a report and recommendation. (See document for further details). Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 8/28/13. (LAD)
August 2, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - (1) Movant's pro se motion for appointment of counsel, filed in the civil case, is denied as moot. (Doc. 4 .) (2) Movant's counsel, Daniel R. Drake, must forthwith file a notice of appearance in the civil case, CV13-8149-PCT-RCB ( DKD). (3) Movant, through counsel, is granted leave to file an amended § 2255 motion in the civil case no later than 30 days from the filing date of this Order. (4) The parties and the Clerk of Court must file all documents related to the § 2255 Motion, or any amended § 2255 motion, in the civil case. (5) The Clerk of Court must forward a copy of this Order to Daniel R. Drake, Esq. (See document for full details). Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 8/2/13. (LAD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pete v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Branden Pete
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Vincent Quill Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?