White Mountain Communities Hospital Incorporated v. Hartford Casualty Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: White Mountain Communities Hospital Incorporated
Defendant: Hartford Casualty Insurance Company and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 3:2013cv08194
Filed: July 25, 2013
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: Apache
Presiding Judge: John W Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 9, 2015 183 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 166 Motion to Compel and 167 Motion to Compel. Hartford's motion to compel at docket 167 is GRANTED. White Mountain's additional response to Hartford's second set of interrogatories shall be provided within 28 days fro m the date this order is filed. No attorney's fees are warranted given that White Mountais opposition to the deposition of Greg Was was substantially justified. White Mountain's motion to compel at docket 166 is GRANTED as to Steve Palazzolo but otherwise DENIED. No attorney's fees are warranted. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 12/9/15.(JWS)
April 17, 2015 148 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Hartford's 78 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED and White Mountain's 96 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 4/17/2015.(LFIG)
March 23, 2015 138 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Hartford's 117 Motion to Amend Answer is GRANTED. Hartford is directed to file its amended answer within seven days of this Order. White Mountain shall respond to the counterclaim within seven days from the date it is filed and served. The parties are hereby directed to confer and file a joint notice within fourteen days of this Order setting forth the parties' proposed deadlines for conducting any necessary discovery and filing any motions related to the newly added defense and counterclaim. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 3/23/2015. (See Order for details.)(LFIG)
December 8, 2014 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 58 Motion to Compel. The motion at docket 58 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as set forth in the order. The additional responses required from Hartford shall be provided to White Mountain within 21 days from the date of this order. Because the motion has been granted in part and denied in part, the court declines to apportion expenses relating to the motion between the parties. See the PDF. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 12/8/14.(JWS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White Mountain Communities Hospital Incorporated v. Hartford Casualty Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: White Mountain Communities Hospital Incorporated
Represented By: Kimberly Ann Kent(Designation Retained)
Represented By: David John Klink(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Kristina Novotny Holmstrom(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Kathleen Kelly Kahn(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?