Self v. USA

Petitioner: Richard Larry Self
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 3:2013cv08199
Filed: July 29, 2013
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: Yavapai
Referring Judge: Steven P Logan (PS)
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentence
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 28, 2016 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 42 Defendant's Motion. See PDF for details. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/28/16.(DXD)
November 22, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Movant's 40 Motion as untimely. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/22/2016. (ATD)
April 16, 2015 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 29 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The motion to vacate sentence 1 is denied. The Clerk is directed to terminate this action. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/15/2015. (ACL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Self v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Heather H Belt(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Roger W Dokken(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Richard Larry Self
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?