Gustafson v. Goodman Manufacturing Company LP et al

Plaintiff: James Gustafson
Defendant: Goodman Manufacturing Company LP and Goodman Global Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2013cv08274
Filed: November 20, 2013
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: Mohave
Presiding Judge: H Russel Holland
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 14, 2016 123 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Certify Class (Docs. 54 , 78 ) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Goodman's Motion to Exclude Certain Opinions of Paul J. Sikorsky and Memorandum in Support (Docs. 84 , 115 ) is DENIED as moot. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that Goodman's Motion to Strike Supplemental Declaration of Paul J. Sikorsky in further Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification (Doc. 96 ) is DENIED as moot. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 3/14/2016. (KAL) Modified on 3/15/2016 to change to WO. (KAL)
February 2, 2016 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: the Joint Motion to Seal Portions of Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification and Supporting Evidence 77 is granted in part and denied in part as set forth in this order; Goodman's Motion to File under Seal 86 is granted in par t and denied in part as set forth in this order; the Joint Motion to Seal Portions of the Supplemental Declaration of Paul J Sikorsky 93 is granted in part and denied in part as set forth in this order; the Joint Motion to Seal 106 is granted in part and denied in part as set forth in this order; the Clerk shall file under seal the documents lodged at 94 , 100 , 101 , 109 , and 110 ; by no later than 10 days from the date of this Order, the parties shall file a Notice of Compliance appended with versions of the documents at 78 , 80 , 81 , 82 , 84 , 85 , 92 , 107 , and 108 that are redacted in accordance with this Order. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 2/1/16. (REW)
October 30, 2015 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Plaintiff shall file a redacted, unsealed motion for classcertification, and all related documents, by 11/9/2015. Plaintiff shallcontemporaneously file a sealed motion to seal as detailed in the attached Order. FURTHER ORDERED setting Oral Argument on 54 Motion to Certify Class for 3/2/2016 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 503, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Senior Judge James A Teilborg. To assist the Court Reporter, each party shall prepare and bring a table of author ities to oral argument. FINALLY ORDERED setting Jury Trial for 1/9/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 503, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Senior Judge James A Teilborg. If the Court denies all dispositive motions, Plaintiff shall file a Notice of Readiness for a Final Pretrial Conference within 5 days of the Order denying the motions. See attached Order. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 10/30/2015. (TLB)
April 28, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 10 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's claims are dismissed. Plaintiff is given leave to amend as to his breach of express warranty claim only. Plaintiff's amended complaint, should he choose to file one, shall be filed on or before May 19, 2014. Signed by Judge H Russel Holland on 4/28/2014.(ALS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gustafson v. Goodman Manufacturing Company LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodman Manufacturing Company LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodman Global Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Gustafson
Represented By: Jon A Tostrud
Represented By: Amy Marie Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?