St. Paul Guardian Insurance Company et al v. Colorado City, Town of et al

Plaintiff: St. Paul Guardian Insurance Company and Travelers Indemnity Company
Defendant: Colorado City, Town of, United States of America, Hildale, City of, Twin City Power and Twin City Water Authority Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2013cv08297
Filed: December 10, 2013
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 8, 2016 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 82 Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees. FURTHER ORDERED that Colorado City is hereby awarded $97,695.25 in attorney's fees. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 8/8/16. (EJA)
October 5, 2015 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: the parties shall file supplemental briefs with the Court, by 10/13/15, at 9:00 a.m., addressing proceeding to trial on the issue of coverage; the parties shall also address the appropriateness of an Order staying further proceedings in the ma tter, addressing both the issue of Plaintiffs' duty to defend the Town in the underlying litigation and Plaintiffs' duty to indemnify the Town; Plaintiffs' motion to enter final judgment 62 pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b) is denied, without prejudice; the Town's request for attorneys' fees ( 63 at 7) is denied, without prejudice. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 10/5/15. (REW)
July 13, 2015 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 44 Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, for Partial Summary Judgment. FURTHER ORDERED denying 57 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Supplement the Record with Court Order and for the Court to Take Judicial Notice of the Order. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 7/13/2015.(TLB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: St. Paul Guardian Insurance Company et al v. Colorado City, Town of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Paul Guardian Insurance Company
Represented By: Ian Matthew Fischer
Represented By: Amy Michelle Samberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Indemnity Company
Represented By: Ian Matthew Fischer
Represented By: Amy Michelle Samberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado City, Town of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hildale, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twin City Power
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twin City Water Authority Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?