Arizona School Risk Retention Trust Incorporated v. NMTC Incorporated et al

Plaintiff: Arizona School Risk Retention Trust Incorporated
Defendant: NMTC Incorporated and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 3:2014cv08009
Filed: January 16, 2014
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: Apache
Presiding Judge: Paul G Rosenblatt
Nature of Suit: Property Damage Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 15, 2016 140 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Techway Industrial Company Limited's 123 Motion to Dismiss the Plaintiff's Complaint Under Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(5) is granted to the extent that defendant Techway Industrial Company Limited is dismissed from this a ction pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(2) for lack of personal jurisdiction. Plaintiff's 136 Motion for Leave for Alternative Service and the plaintiff's 137 Motion to Serve Foreign Corporation by Mail, both of which are directed at Tech way Industrial Company Limited, are denied as moot. Plaintiff's 138 Stipulated Motion to Amend Complaint is granted to the extent that the plaintiff may file a second amended complaint naming Samsung SDI Co. Ltd. as an additional defendant, bu t which removes Techway Industrial Company Limited as a named defendant. The amended complaint shall be filed no later than March 25, 2016. The parties shall file another joint report concerning their mediation efforts no later than May 6, 2016. Signed by Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 03/14/2016. (ATD)
August 21, 2015 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: defendant NMTC, Inc.'s d/b/a Matco Tools' [sic] Motion to Strike Notice of Plaintiff's Rule 30(b)(6) Notice of Deposition of Professional Tool Products, LLC 113 is denied without prejudice. Signed by Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 8/21/2015. (LMR)
July 1, 2015 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 103 Motion for Clarification of the Court's April 1, 2015 Order. See order for details. Signed by Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 7/1/2015.(LMR)
April 1, 2015 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 90 Motion to Extend Deadline for Plaintiff's Rebuttal Expert Report. The plaintiff shall serve its expert's rebuttal report no later than 5/13/2015. Requests to amend pleadings or to joinadditio nal parties shall be filed no later than 5/12/2015. The defendants shall serve their expert's rebuttal report no later than 6/5/2015. No future discovery-related motion shall be filed unless it fully complies with the certification requirement of moving counsel. The deposition of defendants' Fed.R.Civ.P. 30(b)(6) deponent shall take place at the defendants' principal place of business in Ohio unless the parties formally stipulate otherwise. Defendants' counsel Roger Strassburg shall file a certification regarding his office's compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) and (b)(3) no later than 4/13/2015. See order for additional details. Signed by Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 4/1/2015.(LMR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arizona School Risk Retention Trust Incorporated v. NMTC Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arizona School Risk Retention Trust Incorporated
Represented By: Kirk H Hays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NMTC Incorporated
Represented By: Gail Barsky
Represented By: Mitchell J Resnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?