Greene v. United States of America

Plaintiff: Michael Don Greene
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2014cv08021
Filed: February 10, 2014
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: Coconino
Presiding Judge: Steven P Logan
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7422
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 26, 2016 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Mr. Greene's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 41 ) is DENIED. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 4/26/2016. (KAL)
March 31, 2015 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, the United States' Motion for Reconsideration 22 is denied; the United States' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint 30 is granted in part and denied in part; the Court grants the motion with respect to Mr Greene&# 039;s claim for redetermination of his 1990 tax liability; the Court denies the remainder of the motion; therefore, Mr Greene's claim for a refund survives; Plaintiff's claim for a redetermination of his 1990 tax liability is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 3/31/15. (REW)
November 24, 2014 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 13 United States' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 11/24/14.(LSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greene v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Don Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?