Katt et al v. Riepe et al

Plaintiff: Brian M Katt, Rachel C Katt and U.S. Metro Towing and Recovery LLC
Defendant: Jordan J Riepe, Janette S Riepe, J.A.R.R. Towing & Recovery LLC, E Duane Weston, McCarthy Weston PLLC, Dominic Femia, Comprehensive Business Services LLC, Michael Schumacher and BIZDOC Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2014cv08042
Filed: March 14, 2014
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 31, 2015 145 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 140 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying 141 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/31/2015.(DGC, nvo)
June 26, 2015 138 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 96 Motion for Default Judgment; denying 102 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 113 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 131 Motion to Strike; denying 134 Motion to Strike. The Court will set a final pretrial conference by separate order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/26/2015.(DGC, nvo)
July 25, 2014 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding as moot 48 Motion to Strike; denying 27 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/25/2014.(DGC, nvo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Katt et al v. Riepe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian M Katt
Represented By: Michael R Adele(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel C Katt
Represented By: Michael R Adele(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Metro Towing and Recovery LLC
Represented By: Michael R Adele(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jordan J Riepe
Represented By: Hyung Sik Choi(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Veronika Fabian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janette S Riepe
Represented By: Robert C Brown
Represented By: Victoria Lea Orze(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.A.R.R. Towing & Recovery LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E Duane Weston
Represented By: Robert C Brown
Represented By: Victoria Lea Orze(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCarthy Weston PLLC
Represented By: Robert C Brown
Represented By: Victoria Lea Orze(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominic Femia
Represented By: Tevis Steven Reich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comprehensive Business Services LLC
Represented By: Tevis Steven Reich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Schumacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BIZDOC Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?