Barr #180015 v. Ryan et al
Plaintiff: Joel K Barr
Defendant: Charles Ryan and Attorney General of the State of Arizona
Case Number: 3:2014cv08060
Filed: April 7, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: Pinal
Presiding Judge: Michelle H Burns (PS)
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER granting 169 Motion to Dismiss Habeas Petition as Moot. The R&R and the Motions to Supplement (Docs. 123 , 162 , 166 , 167 ) are moot and the Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate this action. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 6/28/18. (EJA)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER: denying Petitioner's Motion to Expand the Record (Eighth request) 112 ; denying Petitioner's Motion to Expand the Record (Ninth request) 114 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 12/22/16.(REW) NEF regenerated to inmate only upon request of the librarian. Modified on 12/22/2016 (CAD).
January 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER denying 84 Motion for Reconsideration. The Court's December 22, 2015 Order (Doc. 83 ) is affirmed. (See document for further details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 1/13/16. (LAD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barr #180015 v. Ryan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel K Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General of the State of Arizona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?