Scharf et al v. Trabucco et al

Plaintiff: Helen Scharf, Karen Bright and Randall Scharf
Defendant: Arnaldo Trabucco, Institute of Urology LLC, PHC-Fort Mohave Incorporated and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 3:2014cv08183
Filed: September 23, 2014
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: H Russel Holland
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 11, 2017 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 79 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. The motion is granted as to plaintiffs' claims based on allegations that Dr. Trabucco negligently performed Mr. Scharf's surgery. These claims are dismissed with prejudice. The motion is otherwise denied. Signed by Judge H Russel Holland on 1/11/17.(EJA)
June 3, 2016 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 66 Defendant PHC-Fort Mohave, Inc.'s(VVMC) Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge H Russel Holland on 6/2/16.(LSP)
March 21, 2016 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Defendants' motion to strike 51 is granted in part and denied in part. The motion is granted as to Dr. Mellman's standard of care opinions. The motion is otherwise denied although Dr. Danoff's testimony will be excluded if he fails to produce a case list acceptable to defendants by April 22, 2016. Signed by Judge H Russel Holland on 3/21/2016.(KMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scharf et al v. Trabucco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen Scharf
Represented By: Jeffrey A Cogan(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Roger Raymond Sundling(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Bright
Represented By: Jeffrey A Cogan(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Roger Raymond Sundling(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall Scharf
Represented By: Jeffrey A Cogan(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Roger Raymond Sundling(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arnaldo Trabucco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Institute of Urology LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHC-Fort Mohave Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?