Flowers #125290 v. Lawrence et al

Plaintiff: Eulandas J Flowers
Defendant: Sandra Lawrence, Unknown Young, Unknown Batchlot, Unknown Spears, Unknown Reeves, Unknown Johnson, Unknown Hayden, L Marshall, Unknown Contreas, Unknown Shane, W Marshall, Unknown Coleman and Unknown Dean
Case Number: 3:2014cv08184
Filed: September 24, 2014
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: Pinal
Referring Judge: Eileen S Willett (PS)
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 29, 2016 184 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 183 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend/Correct the Clerk's Judgment. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 9/28/16. (EJA)
August 18, 2016 175 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED by (Doc. 177 ) ORDER that on the issue of Plaintiff's exhaustion of available administrative remedies, the Court finds in favor of Defendants and against Plaintiff. The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment in favor of Defendants and terminate this case. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 8/17/16. (LSP) Modified on 8/18/2016 (LSP).
June 30, 2016 155 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff Eulandas J. Flowers ("Plaintiff") will be given the opportunity to, once again, view the video records on which he purports to have orally filed emergency grievances in early April of 2014. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff will file notice with the Court by Monday, July 25, 2016 in which Plaintiff will clearly identify the specific periods of time in which he believes he grieved on the video records. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED setting a hearing for Tuesday, August 2, 2016 at 1:30 p.m. to watch only those specific portions of the video records in which Plaintiff purports to have orally filed an emergency grievance. [See attached Order for deadlines and complete details.] Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 6/30/2016. (KAL)
May 18, 2016 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion For Guidance, (Doc. 120 ), is hereby DENIED. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 5/18/2016. (KAL)
May 12, 2016 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 112 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 5/12/16.(KGM)
April 25, 2016 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Based on Plaintiff's Failure to Administratively Exhaust his Claims and Alternative Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings on Count II (Doc. 58 ). The Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation (Doc. 87 ) is ACCEPTED AS MODIFIED above. Plaintiff's "Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint" (Doc. 79 ) is denied. Defendant Batchlor is dismissed without prejudice. Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Based on Plaintiff's Failure to Administratively Exhaust his Claims and Alternative Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings on Count II (Doc. 58 ) is granted in part and denied in part as follows: (a) Plaintiff's claim for a violation of Article II of the Arizona Constitution in Count Two is dismissed. (b) Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Based on Plaintiff's Failure to Administratively Exhaust his Claims is deni ed. Within 20 days of the date of this Order, Defendants shall file a motion requesting that the Court set an evidentiary hearing as to exhaustion or a motion to withdraw their request to dismiss this case on exhaustion grounds. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 4/25/2016. (REK)
November 25, 2015 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Denying Defendants' 60 Motion to Stay Discovery regarding the issue of exhaustion of administrative remedies. As to all other issues, IT IS ORDERED granting Defendants' 60 Motion to Stay Discovery and to Continue Deadlines: Las t day to complete discovery and supplement discovery - 90 days after resolution of Defendants' 58 Motion for Summary Judgment. Dispositive motion deadline - 120 days after resolution of Defendants' 58 Motion for Summary Judgment. Pl aintiff's Rule 56(F) 66 Motion for Continuance is granted. Plaintiff shall file his Response no later than December 30, 2015. Plaintiff's 70 Motion for Enlargement of Time for Extension of Time to Answer Summary Judgement/Judgement on the Pleadings (First Request)," is denied as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 11/24/2015. (ATD)
February 3, 2015 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's 15 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 2/3/2015.(LFIG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flowers #125290 v. Lawrence et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eulandas J Flowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Batchlot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Spears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Hayden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Contreas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Shane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?