Hamilton v. Yavapai Community College District, et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Hamilton
Defendant: Angela Scott, Justin Scott, John Morgan, Yavapai Community College District, NorthAire Aviation LLC and April Morgan
Petitioner: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2015cv08095
Filed: June 1, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: Yavapai
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 248 MOTION for Ruling re: #151 Statement re: Request for the Court for Ruling on Joint Statement Doc 151 by NorthAire Aviation LLC, Angela Scott, Justin Scott. (Hendricks, Edwin)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 247 In light of the Court's ruling consolidating the cases for trial, IT IS ORDERED finding #244 the Motion to Consolidate Only the FCA Claims for Trial moot. Ordered by Chief Judge G. Murray Snow. (GMS, ag) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED consolidating the matters, Hamilton v. Yavapai Community College District, et al., No. CV-12-8193-PHX-GMS as the Lead Case and Hamilton v. Yavapai Community College District, et al., No. CV-15-8095-PHX-GMS. All future pleadings shall be filed in the Lead Case Only and captioned as referenced above. FURTHER ORDERED granting the #235 Motions to Clarify the Order Setting Final Pretrial Conference (Docs. 641, #224 ), filed in both cases, and is amended to allow ten (10) motions in limine per side, to be filed in the Lead Case only. FURTHER ORDERED vacating the Final Pretrial Conference currently set for September 20, 2019, in light of a conflict with the Court's calendar, and resetting same for October 2, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 602, Sandra Day OConnor U.S. Federal Courthouse, 401 W. Washington St., Phoenix, Arizona 85003-2151. See document for complete details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 8/5/2019. Associated Cases: 3:12-cv-08193-GMS, 3:15-cv-08095-GMS.(RMV)
August 2, 2019 Filing 245 Joinder re: #242 Notice (Other) To Yavapai College's Statement re Consolidation by Defendants April Morgan, John Morgan. (Bohr, Jodi)
August 2, 2019 Filing 244 * OBJECTION re: #238 Order to Consolidate Case and MOTION to Consolidate Only the FCA Claims for Trial by Defendants NorthAire Aviation LLC, Angela Scott, Justin Scott. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Hendricks, Edwin) * Modified to correct event; attorney noticed on 8/5/2019 (LAD).
August 2, 2019 Filing 243 NOTICE re: Objection to Consolidation for Trial by Jury by Daniel Hamilton re: #238 Order . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Harris, Richard)
August 1, 2019 Filing 242 NOTICE re: Consolidation by Yavapai Community College District . (Gilbert, Elizabeth)
July 31, 2019 Filing 241 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #235 MOTION to Clarify Number of Motions In Limine Allowed re: #224 Scheduling Order filed by Daniel Hamilton. (Harris, Richard)
July 31, 2019 Filing 240 Joinder re: #236 Response to Motion, #237 Response in Opposition to Motion to Clarify Orders by Defendants NorthAire Aviation LLC, Angela Scott, Justin Scott. (Hendricks, Edwin)
July 31, 2019 Filing 239 NOTICE of Attorney Substitution by Edwin F Hendricks, Jr. (Hendricks, Edwin)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER - Should any party have an objection to consolidating the cases (CV-12-08193-PCT-GMS and CV-15-08095-PCT-GMS) for trial may have until noon on August 2, 2019 to do so. See document for complete details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 7/25/2019. (RMV)
July 24, 2019 Filing 237 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #235 MOTION to Clarify Number of Motions In Limine Allowed re: #224 Scheduling Order filed by April Morgan, John Morgan. (Johnsen, Donald)
July 24, 2019 Filing 236 RESPONSE to Motion re: #235 MOTION to Clarify Number of Motions In Limine Allowed re: #224 Scheduling Order filed by Yavapai Community College District. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Gilbert, Elizabeth)
July 19, 2019 Filing 235 MOTION to Clarify Number of Motions In Limine Allowed re: #224 Scheduling Order by Daniel Hamilton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Harris, Richard)
July 16, 2019 Filing 234 NOTICE re: Joint Settlement Status Report by Daniel Hamilton re: #220 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief . (Harris, Richard)
July 11, 2019 Filing 233 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Camille D Bibles: Settlement Conference held on 7/11/2019. No settlement was reached. Parties may wish to continue with settlement negotiations and will advise Judge Bibles chambers. APPEARANCES: Richard Harris for Plaintiff Daniel Hamilton. Daniel Hamilton is present. Adam Smart for United States f America, Movant. Georgia Staton and Elizabeth for Defendant Yavapai Community College District. Ed Kotalik, Chris Welker and Norman Hall for Insurance Coverage for Yavapai Community College District. Donald Johnson for Defendants John Morgan et al. E. Jeffrey Walsh and John Stonecipher, representatives for Guidance Academy LLC Counter Claimant.Ed Hendricks and Greg Fairbourn for North Aire Aviation. Justin Scott representative for North Aire Aviation. Hearing held 8:30 am to 3:30 pm. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (CSH)
July 2, 2019 Filing 232 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION: Adam R. Smart appearing for United States of America. Attorney Lon R Leavitt terminated. . (Smart, Adam)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 231 Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar, IT IS ORDERED the Final Pretrial Conference, presently set for 9/20/19 at 10:00 a.m. is VACATED and RESET. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/20/19 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 602, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. Ordered by Chief Judge G Murray Snow. (GMS, ag) ( This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER denying #227 Motion for Reconsideration. See document for complete details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Camille D Bibles on 5/3/2019. (RMV)
April 24, 2019 Filing 229 NOTICE of Appearance by William G Fairbourn on behalf of NorthAire Aviation LLC, Angela Scott, Justin Scott. (Fairbourn, William)
April 24, 2019 Filing 228 NOTICE by United States of America re: #227 MOTION for Reconsideration re: #226 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief . (Leavitt, Lon)
April 10, 2019 Filing 227 MOTION for Reconsideration re: #226 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by Yavapai Community College District. (Gilbert, Elizabeth)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER granting #225 Motion for Leave to Be Excused from Any Requirement that a Representative with Settlement Authority Attend the Settlement Conference. The United States is not required to have a representative with settlement authority attend the settlement conference on July 11, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Camille D Bibles on 4/5/2019. (RMV)
April 4, 2019 Filing 225 MOTION for Leave to Be Excused from Any Requirement that a Representative with Settlement Authority Attend the Settlement Conference by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Leavitt, Lon)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER SETTING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - A Final Pretrial Conference shall be held on September 20, 2019 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 602, Sandra Day O'Connor U.S. Federal Courthouse, 401 W. Washington St., Phoenix, Arizona 85003-2151. The parties jointly shall prepare a Proposed Final Pretrial Order and shall lodge it with the Court no later than 4:00 p.m. on September 6, 2019. (See document for further details). Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 4/2/19. (LAD)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER - Settlement Conference set for 7/11/2019 at 08:30 AM in U.S. District Court of Arizona, 123 N. San Francisco Street, Suite 200, Flagstaff, AZ 86001 before Magistrate Judge Camille D Bibles. See document for complete deadlines and details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Camille D Bibles on 3/28/2019. (RMV)
March 26, 2019 Filing 222 SEALED Exhibits 12, 15, 20, 21, 27, 32 re: #191 Statement of Facts by Daniel Hamilton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 12 pt 2, #2 Exhibit 12 pt 3, #3 Exhibit 15, #4 Exhibit 15 pt 2, #5 Exhibit 15 pt 3, #6 Exhibit 20, #7 Exhibit 21, #8 Exhibit 27, #9 Exhibit 32, #10 Exhibit 32 pt 2, #11 Exhibit 32 pt 3)(SLQ)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Yavapai Community College and John Morgan's Joint Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. #169 ) is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART as follows: Any claims that Defendants violated the False Claims Act by counting all the students enrolled in the combined AVT program are dismissed. Summary Judgment is denied as to all other claims. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that North-Aire's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. #173 ) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff Hamilton's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Doc. #175 ) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Yavapai Community College's Cross Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Doc. #183 ) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff Hamilton's Motion to Seal (Doc. #198 ) is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to file under seal Exhibits 12, 15, 20, 21, 27, and 32 (Doc. #197 ). (See document for complete details). Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 3/26/19. (SLQ)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER granting #219 Unopposed Motion to Refer the Case To Motion Magistrate Judge for Settlement Conference. FURTHER ORDERED that this matter is referred to United States Magistrate Judge Camille D. Bibles for a settlement conference. Counsel are directed to jointly contact Judge Bibles Chambers no later than March 27, 2019 to schedule a date and time for the settlement conference and for instructions regarding preparation for such conference. FURTHER ORDERED that the Magistrate Judge shall coordinate and conduct this settlement conference along with the related case United States ex rel. Daniel Hamilton v. Yavapai Community College District et. al., Case No. CV-12-8193-PCT-GMS. FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall provide the Court with a Joint Settlement Status Report within 5 days of the settlement conference. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 3/21/19. (MAP)
March 12, 2019 Filing 219 Consent MOTION Refer Case to Magistrate Judge for Settlement Conference/Mediation by Daniel Hamilton. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Harris, Richard)
January 22, 2019 Filing 217 NOTICE re: Subsequent History in Ninth Circuit Precedent, US ex rel Campie v Gilead Sciences by Daniel Hamilton re: #205 Response to Motion for Summary Judgment . (Harris, Richard)
November 28, 2018 Filing 216 NOTICE re: Subsequent History in Supplemental Authority by Daniel Hamilton re: #213 Notice (Other), #214 Notice (Other) . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Harris, Richard)
October 19, 2018 Filing 215 NOTICE re: Recent Ninth Circuit Case by Daniel Hamilton re: #191 Statement of Facts, #211 Reply to Response to Motion . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Harris, Richard)
September 5, 2018 Filing 214 NOTICE re: Recent Ninth Circuit Cases by Daniel Hamilton . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Harris, Richard)
August 31, 2018 Filing 213 NOTICE re: Supplemental Authority by United States of America . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Leavitt, Lon)
July 25, 2018 Filing 212 NOTICE re: Supplemental Ninth Circuit Authority by Daniel Hamilton re: #169 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment , #173 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Harris, Richard)
July 17, 2018 Filing 211 REPLY to Response to #169 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment, with Appendix to Objections, filed by April Morgan, John Morgan, Yavapai Community College District. (LAD)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER granting #207 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. The Clerk of Court is directed to file the lodged Reply (Doc. #208 ) in support of the Joint Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. #169 ). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 7/17/18. (LAD)
July 13, 2018 Filing 209 * REPLY to Response to Motion re: #173 MOTION for Summary Judgment and JOINDER in #208 Lodged Reply filed by NorthAire Aviation LLC, Angela Scott, Justin Scott. (Hendricks, Edwin) * Modified to add document linkage; attorney noticed regarding lodged document on 7/16/2018 (LAD).
July 12, 2018 Filing 208 * (Filed at #211 ) LODGED Proposed Reply by Defendants Yavapai and Morgan to their Joint Motion for Summary Judgment re: #207 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Reply by Defendants Yavapai and Morgan to their Joint Motion for Summary Judgment . Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation for Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Yavapai Community College District. (GilBride, Eileen) Modified on 7/17/2018 (LAD).
July 12, 2018 Filing 207 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Reply by Defendants Yavapai and Morgan to their Joint Motion for Summary Judgment by Yavapai Community College District. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(GilBride, Eileen)
June 28, 2018 Filing 206 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #191 Statement of Facts EX 29 by Plaintiff Daniel Hamilton. (Harris, Richard)
June 28, 2018 Filing 205 RESPONSE to Motion re: #169 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment , #173 MOTION for Summary Judgment Consolidated Response to Motions for Summary Judgment filed by Daniel Hamilton. (Harris, Richard)
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #189 Motion to File Excess Pages. Plaintiff may have up to 34 pages to file a consolidated response to Motions for Summary Judgment (Docs. #169 , #173 ). FURTHER ORDERED directing Plaintiff file his consolidated response on or before 6/29/2018. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 6/15/2018. (KFZ)
June 13, 2018 Filing 203 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #175 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Daniel Hamilton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Harris, Richard) *Modified linkage on 6/14/2018 (DXD).
June 11, 2018 Filing 202 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #189 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Consolidated Response to Motions for Summary Judgment filed by Daniel Hamilton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Harris, Richard)
June 8, 2018 Filing 201 Joinder re: #199 Response in Opposition to Motion to File 53-Page Summary Judgment Response by Defendants April Morgan, John Morgan. filed by April Morgan, John Morgan. (Bohr, Jodi)
June 7, 2018 Filing 200 Joinder re: #199 Response in Opposition to Motion to Exceed Page Limitation by Defendants NorthAire Aviation LLC, Angela Scott, Justin Scott. (Hendricks, Edwin)
June 7, 2018 Filing 199 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #189 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Consolidated Response to Motions for Summary Judgment filed by Yavapai Community College District. (GilBride, Eileen)
May 30, 2018 Filing 198 MOTION to Seal Document #197 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document Exhibits 12 15 20 21 27 and 32 (Exhibits to Doc 191 Controverting Statement of Facts On Summary Judgment) by Daniel Hamilton. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Harris, Richard)
May 30, 2018 Filing 197 *FILED at #222 * SEALED LODGED Proposed Confidential marked Exhibits 12 15 20 21 27 32 to Controverting Statement of Fact on Summary Judgment. Document to be filed by Clerk if #198 Motion or Stipulation to Seal is granted. Filed by Daniel Hamilton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit)(Harris, Richard) *Modified to link to Motion to Seal on 5/31/2018 (SCH). Modified on 3/26/2019 (SLQ).
May 30, 2018 Filing 196 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #191 Statement of Facts EX List and EXs 1 2 3 4 5 6 8 9 23 29 and 34 by Plaintiff Daniel Hamilton. (Harris, Richard)
May 30, 2018 Filing 195 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #191 Statement of Facts EXs 28 30 31 33 by Plaintiff Daniel Hamilton. (Harris, Richard)
May 30, 2018 Filing 194 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #191 Statement of Facts EXs 18 19 22 24 25 26 by Plaintiff Daniel Hamilton. (Harris, Richard)
May 30, 2018 Filing 193 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #191 Statement of Facts EXs 16 17 by Plaintiff Daniel Hamilton. (Harris, Richard) *Modified linkage on 5/31/2018 (DXD).
May 30, 2018 Filing 192 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #191 Statement of Facts EXs 10 11 13 14 by Plaintiff Daniel Hamilton. (Harris, Richard)
May 29, 2018 Filing 191 STATEMENT OF FACTS re: #190 Lodged Proposed Document Consolidated Response to Motions for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Daniel Hamilton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Harris, Richard)
May 29, 2018 Filing 190 LODGED Proposed Consolidated Response to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment re: #189 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Consolidated Response to Motions for Summary Judgment . Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation for Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Daniel Hamilton. (Harris, Richard)
May 29, 2018 Filing 189 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Consolidated Response to Motions for Summary Judgment by Daniel Hamilton. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Harris, Richard)
May 29, 2018 Filing 188 OBJECTION re: #176 Statement of Facts by Defendants NorthAire Aviation LLC, Angela Scott, Justin Scott. (Hendricks, Edwin)
May 29, 2018 Filing 187 RESPONSE to Motion re: #175 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, JOINDER re: #183 Response to Motion, #184 Statement of Facts, #185 Objection filed by NorthAire Aviation LLC, Angela Scott, Justin Scott. (Hendricks, Edwin) *Modified to add docket part on 5/30/2018 (DXD).
May 29, 2018 Filing 186 STATEMENT of Interest re: #169 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment , #173 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Movant United States of America. (Leavitt, Lon)
May 29, 2018 Filing 185 OBJECTION re: #176 Statement of Facts by Defendants April Morgan, John Morgan, Yavapai Community College District. (Staton, Georgia)
May 29, 2018 Filing 184 STATEMENT OF FACTS re: #183 Response to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Defendants April Morgan, John Morgan, Yavapai Community College District. (Attachments: #1 Errata Part 1, #2 Exhibit Part 2, #3 Exhibit Part 3)(Staton, Georgia)
May 29, 2018 Filing 183 RESPONSE to Motion re: #175 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment On Counts I and II filed by April Morgan, John Morgan, Yavapai Community College District. (Staton, Georgia) *Modified to add cross motion on 5/30/2018 (DXD).
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER granting #181 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Responses to the Motions for Summary Judgment and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Docs. #169 , #173 , #175 ) shall be due on or before 5/29/2018. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 5/11/18. (DXD)
May 10, 2018 Filing 181 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #175 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment , #169 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment , #173 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Daniel Hamilton. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Harris, Richard)
May 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER granting #179 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Responses to the Motions for Summary Judgment and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Docs. #169 , #173 , #175 ) shall be due on or before 5/18/2018. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 5/3/18. (DXD)
May 3, 2018 Filing 179 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #175 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment , #169 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment , #173 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Daniel Hamilton. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Harris, Richard)
April 10, 2018 Filing 178 Sealed Exhibit 24 to #170 Statement of Facts in Support of Motion For Summary Judgment by April Morgan, John Morgan, Yavapai Community College District. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 24 - Part 2, #2 Exhibit 24 - Part 3, #3 Exhibit 24 - Part 4)(MAP)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER granting #171 Motion to Seal Defendants Motion to File Exhibit 24 to its Statement of Facts in support of its Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 4/9/18. (MAP)
April 6, 2018 Filing 176 STATEMENT OF FACTS re: #175 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Daniel Hamilton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Harris, Richard)
April 6, 2018 Filing 175 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Daniel Hamilton. (Harris, Richard)
April 6, 2018 Filing 174 STATEMENT OF FACTS re: #173 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendants NorthAire Aviation LLC, Angela Scott, Justin Scott. (Cowles, David)
April 6, 2018 Filing 173 MOTION for Summary Judgment by NorthAire Aviation LLC, Angela Scott, Justin Scott. (Cowles, David)
April 6, 2018 Filing 172 *FILED at Doc. #178 *SEALED LODGED Proposed Exhibit 24 re: #171 Joint MOTION to Seal Document Joint Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit 24 to the Statement of Facts in Support of Motion For Summary Judgment by Yavapai Community College District and John and April Morgan. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation to Seal is granted. Filed by April Morgan, John Morgan, Yavapai Community College District. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Part 1, #2 Exhibit Part 2, #3 Exhibit Part 3, #4 Exhibit Part 4)(Staton, Georgia) *Modified on 4/10/2018 (MAP)*.
April 6, 2018 Filing 171 Joint MOTION to Seal Document Joint Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit 24 to the Statement of Facts in Support of Motion For Summary Judgment by Yavapai Community College District and John and April Morgan by April Morgan, John Morgan, Yavapai Community College District. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Staton, Georgia)
April 6, 2018 Filing 170 STATEMENT OF FACTS re: #169 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendants April Morgan, John Morgan, Yavapai Community College District. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Part 1, #2 Exhibit Part 2, #3 Exhibit Part 3, #4 Exhibit Part 4, #5 Exhibit Part 5)(Staton, Georgia)
April 6, 2018 Filing 169 Joint MOTION for Summary Judgment by April Morgan, John Morgan, Yavapai Community College District. (Staton, Georgia)
March 21, 2018 Filing 168 NOTICE of Appearance by David Winthrop Cowles on behalf of NorthAire Aviation LLC, Angela Scott, Justin Scott. (Cowles, David)
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion to Compel (Doc. #118 ) and Joint Motion to Conduct Additional Discovery (Doc. #163 ) are denied. Dispositive Motions shall be due on 4/6/2018. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 2/16/18. (DXD)
January 3, 2018 Filing 166 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #163 Joint MOTION to Conduct Additional Discovery (Reply to Cross-motion to conduct additional discovery) filed by Daniel Hamilton. (Harris, Richard)
January 2, 2018 Filing 165 STATEMENT of Interest re: #164 Reply to Response to Motion to Conduct Additional Discovery by Movant United States of America. (Leavitt, Lon)
December 29, 2017 Filing 164 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #163 Joint MOTION to Conduct Additional Discovery filed by April Morgan, John Morgan, NorthAire Aviation LLC, Angela Scott, Justin Scott, Yavapai Community College District. (Gilbert, Elizabeth)
December 8, 2017 Filing 163 Joint MOTION to Conduct Additional Discovery by April Morgan, John Morgan, NorthAire Aviation LLC, Angela Scott, Justin Scott, Yavapai Community College District. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Staton, Georgia)
October 2, 2017 Filing 162 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Yavapai Community College District. (Gilbert, Elizabeth)
October 2, 2017 Filing 161 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by April Morgan, John Morgan. (Bohr, Jodi)
September 17, 2017 Filing 160 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by NorthAire Aviation LLC, Angela Scott, Justin Scott. (Hendricks, Edwin)
September 6, 2017 Filing 159 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by NorthAire Aviation LLC, Angela Scott, Justin Scott. (Hendricks, Edwin)
September 1, 2017 Filing 158 Exhibit B to #130 and #118 by Plaintiff Daniel Hamilton. (MAP)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER denying #131 Motion to Seal. Directing the Clerk of Court to file the lodged redacted transcript (Doc. #132 ). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 9/1/17. (MAP)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 156 IT IS ORDERED granting the parties' #154 Stipulation to Resolve Discovery Disputes contained and addressed within the stipulation. Signed by Judge G. Murray Snow on 9/1/17. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (GMS, ag)
August 25, 2017 Filing 155 WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT re: #152 First MOTION to Compel Privilege Log Documents by Defendants NorthAire Aviation LLC, Angela Scott, Justin Scott. (Hendricks, Edwin)
August 24, 2017 Filing 154 STIPULATION re: #152 First MOTION to Compel Privilege Log Documents to Resolve Defendants' Pending Disclovery Disputes in Hamilton I and Hamilton II by Daniel Hamilton. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Harris, Richard)
August 14, 2017 NOTICE of request for e-notices by Dan W. Goldfine. (Goldfine, Dan)
August 14, 2017 NOTICE of request for e-notices by Jamie L. Halavais. (Halavais, Jamie)
August 14, 2017 NOTICE of request for e-notices by Joshua Grabel. (Grabel, Joshua)
August 11, 2017 Filing 153 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #118 MOTION to Compel Deposition Testimony of Defendant Justin Scott filed by Daniel Hamilton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EX A)(Harris, Richard)
August 11, 2017 Filing 152 First MOTION to Compel Privilege Log Documents by NorthAire Aviation LLC, Angela Scott, Justin Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Hendricks, Edwin)
August 11, 2017 Filing 151 STATEMENT of Discovery Disputes re: #136 Order on Motion for Discovery, Order on Motion to Compel by Defendants NorthAire Aviation LLC, Angela Scott, Justin Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Hendricks, Edwin)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 150 IT IS ORDER denying #149 the Stipulation for Extension of Time re Privilege Log and Deposition MTC Briefing. Signed by Judge G. Murray Snow on 08/10/17. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (GMS, ag)
August 10, 2017 Filing 149 STIPULATION re: #136 Order on Motion for Discovery, Order on Motion to Compel Privilege Log and Deposition MTC Briefing by NorthAire Aviation LLC, Angela Scott, Justin Scott. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hendricks, Edwin)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER granting #144 Motion to extend the Deadline for the Joint Briefing in Order No. #136 . The parties shall have to and including 8/11/2017 to submit a joint brief outlining any remaining issues by that date. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 8/8/2017. (LMR)
August 7, 2017 Filing 147 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Daniel Hamilton. (Harris, Richard)
August 7, 2017 Filing 146 *NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by NorthAire Aviation LLC. (Hendricks, Edwin) *Modified to correct filer on 8/8/2017 (REK).
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER granting #142 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply on Motion to Compel #118 : Plaintiff shall have through 8/11/2017 to file any (supplemental) reply on his Motion to Compel #118 . Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 8/3/2017.(LMR)
August 3, 2017 Filing 144 STIPULATION re: #136 Order on Motion for Discovery, Order on Motion to Compel by NorthAire Aviation LLC, Angela Scott, Justin Scott. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hendricks, Edwin)
August 3, 2017 Filing 143 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #142 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #118 MOTION to Compel Deposition Testimony of Defendant Justin Scott UNOPPOSED Corrected Proposed Order by Plaintiff Daniel Hamilton. (Harris, Richard)
August 3, 2017 Filing 142 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #118 MOTION to Compel Deposition Testimony of Defendant Justin Scott UNOPPOSED by Daniel Hamilton. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Harris, Richard)
July 31, 2017 Filing 141 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Daniel Hamilton. (Harris, Richard)
July 31, 2017 Filing 140 RESPONSE re: #130 Additional Attachments to Main Document Relator's LR 37.1 Statement of Discovery Dispute by Defendants NorthAire Aviation LLC, Angela Scott, Justin Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Hendricks, Edwin)
July 28, 2017 Filing 139 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Daniel Hamilton. (Harris, Richard)
July 27, 2017 Filing 138 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by NorthAire Aviation LLC. (Hendricks, Edwin)
July 19, 2017 Filing 137 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of MOTION HEARING proceedings held on 07/14/2017, before Judge G. Murray Snow. (Court Reporter: Charlotte A. Powers). The ordering party will have electronic access to the transcript immediately. All others may view the transcript at the court public terminal or it may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/9/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/21/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/17/2017. (RAP)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Deposition Testimony, #118 , is TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. Defendant North-Aire will have until July 31, 2017 to file a response to Mr. Hamilton's Rule 37.1 Statement, #130 . The Motion to Compel the Defendants to Respond to the Requests for Admissions, #119 , is GRANTED. Defendant North- Aire has until July 28, 2017 to appropriately admit or deny the RFAs. North-Aire's Motion Regarding the Presentment of Discovery Disputes, #116 , is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The Parties have until August 4, 2017 to complete their meet and confer process in regards to the written discovery disputes, and will submit a joint brief outlining any remaining disputes by that date. The United States and Mr. Hamilton have until July 28, 2017 to submit a privilege log. North-Aire will have until August 11, 2017 to file a motion to compel disclosure of any of the privileged communications. The dispositive motion deadline, as set forth in the Court's Order of March 14, 2017, #106 , is vacated. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT aside from the additional discovery steps authorized by this Order there shall be no additional discovery undertaken in this matter absent the explicit authorization of the Court. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 7/17/2017. (REK)
July 14, 2017 Filing 135 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST Re 7/14/17 Oral Argument by Yavapai Community College District for proceedings held on 7/14/17, Judge G Murray Snow hearing judge(s). (Gilbert, Elizabeth)
July 14, 2017 Filing 134 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge G Murray Snow: Motion Hearing held on 7/14/2017 re pending motions #116 , #118 , #119 . Order to follow. APPEARANCES: Richard Harris for Plaintiff. Elizabeth Gilbert for Defendant Yavapai Community College District. Jodi Bohr for Morgan Defendants. Edwin Hendricks, Jr. for NorthAire Aviation, LLC and Scott Defendants. Lon Leavitt (telephonically) for Defendant United States of America. Joshua Grabel for Defendant Guidance Academy, LLC (in CV-12-8193-PCT-GMS). (Court Reporter Charlotte Powers.) Hearing held 10:26 AM to 11:35 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KFZ)
July 13, 2017 Filing 133 MOTION to Strike #132 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document, #131 MOTION to Seal Document (Lodged Proposed EX B to Doc 130), #130 Additional Attachments to Main Document by NorthAire Aviation LLC, Angela Scott, Justin Scott. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hendricks, Edwin)
July 12, 2017 Filing 132 *Filed at Doc. #158 SEALED LODGED Proposed EX B to Docs 130 and 118 (Deposition Transcript of North-Aire 30(b)(6) Witness Justin Scott re: #131 MOTION to Seal Document (Lodged Proposed EX B to Doc 130). Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation to Seal is granted. Filed by Daniel Hamilton. (Harris, Richard) *Modified on 9/5/2017 (SCH).
July 12, 2017 Filing 131 MOTION to Seal Document (Lodged Proposed EX B to Doc 130) by Daniel Hamilton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EX A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Harris, Richard)
July 11, 2017 Filing 130 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #118 MOTION to Compel Deposition Testimony of Defendant Justin Scott LR 37.1 Separate Statement by Plaintiff Daniel Hamilton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Harris, Richard)
July 7, 2017 Filing 129 RESPONSE re: #121 Statement of Interest filed by United States of America by Defendants NorthAire Aviation LLC, Angela Scott, Justin Scott. (Hendricks, Edwin)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 128 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED granting #127 the United States of America's Motion to appear telephonically. Counsel for the United States, Ron Leavitt, shall call chambers five minutes before the hearing is scheduled to begin. Ordered by Judge G. Murray Snow. (GMS, ag)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
July 6, 2017 Filing 127 MOTION for Leave to Permit Telephonic Participation in Hearing by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Leavitt, Lon)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER Setting Hearing on Pending Motions #116 , #118 , #119 . Motion Hearing set for 7/14/2017 at 10:30AM before Judge G Murray Snow. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 7/6/17. (MAP)
June 30, 2017 Filing 125 *REPLY re: #116 NOTICE re: Presentment of Discovery Disputes Under Order #106 filed by NorthAire Aviation LLC, Angela Scott, Justin Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(Hendricks, Edwin) *Modified to correct event on 7/3/2017 (DXD).
June 23, 2017 Filing 124 RESPONSE to Motion re: #119 MOTION to Compel Responses to Requests for Admissions on Defendant North Aire filed by NorthAire Aviation LLC, Angela Scott, Justin Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Errata, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit)(Hendricks, Edwin)
June 23, 2017 Filing 123 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #118 MOTION to Compel Deposition Testimony of Defendant Justin Scott filed by Daniel Hamilton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Harris, Richard)
June 23, 2017 Filing 122 *RESPONSE re: #116 NOTICE re: Presentment of Discovery Disputes Under Order #106 filed by Daniel Hamilton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EX A, #2 Exhibit EX B, #3 Exhibit EX C, #4 Exhibit EX D, #5 Exhibit EX E)(Harris, Richard) *Modified to correct event/linkage on 6/26/2017 (DXD).
June 23, 2017 Filing 121 STATEMENT of Interest on Defendants North-Aire Aviation, LLC and the Scotts Motion re Presentment of Discovery Disputes under Order #106 by Movant United States of America. (Leavitt, Lon)
June 16, 2017 Filing 120 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #118 MOTION to Compel Deposition Testimony of Defendant Justin Scott filed by NorthAire Aviation LLC, Angela Scott, Justin Scott. (Hendricks, Edwin)
June 9, 2017 Filing 119 MOTION to Compel Responses to Requests for Admissions on Defendant North Aire by Daniel Hamilton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EX A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Harris, Richard)
June 9, 2017 Filing 118 MOTION to Compel Deposition Testimony of Defendant Justin Scott by Daniel Hamilton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EX A, #2 Exhibit EX B, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Harris, Richard)
June 9, 2017 Filing 117 NOTICE re: Good Faith Consultation Certification by NorthAire Aviation LLC, Angela Scott, Justin Scott re: #116 MOTION for Discovery Presentment of Discovery Disputes Under Order 106 . (Hendricks, Edwin)
June 9, 2017 Filing 116 *MOTION re: Presentment of Discovery Disputes Under Order #106 by NorthAire Aviation LLC, Angela Scott, Justin Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Hendricks, Edwin) *Modified to correct event type on 6/12/2017 (KAS). Modified text on 6/26/2017 (DXD)*.
June 8, 2017 Filing 115 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by April Morgan, John Morgan. (Bohr, Jodi)
June 5, 2017 Filing 114 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Yavapai Community College District. (Gilbert, Elizabeth)
May 27, 2017 Filing 113 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by NorthAire Aviation LLC, Angela Scott, Justin Scott. (Hendricks, Edwin)
May 25, 2017 Filing 112 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by NorthAire Aviation LLC, Angela Scott, Justin Scott. (Hendricks, Edwin)
May 25, 2017 Filing 111 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by NorthAire Aviation LLC, Angela Scott, Justin Scott. (Hendricks, Edwin)
May 25, 2017 Filing 110 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by NorthAire Aviation LLC, Angela Scott, Justin Scott. (Hendricks, Edwin)
May 18, 2017 Filing 109 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by NorthAire Aviation LLC, Angela Scott, Justin Scott. (Hendricks, Edwin)
April 24, 2017 Filing 108 *AMENDED NOTICE of Deposition of North-Aire Aviation, LLC, filed by Daniel Hamilton. (Harris, Richard) *Modified to add text on 4/24/2017 (KGM).
April 24, 2017 Filing 107 *AMENDED NOTICE of Deposition of Justin Scott, filed by Daniel Hamilton. (Harris, Richard) *Modified to add text on 4/24/2017 (KGM).
March 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER granting #105 Joint Motion. IT IS ORDERED that all dispositive motions in the North-Aire/Hamilton II Case be filed on or before 8/31/2017. FURTHER ORDERED that all discovery must be completed in the North-Aire/Hamilton II Case, which would include the parties presenting all discovery disputes to the Court, by 6/9/2017. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 3/14/2017.(KFZ)
March 10, 2017 Filing 105 Joint MOTION for Discovery and Re Order Re Dispositive Motion Deadline by NorthAire Aviation LLC, Angela Scott, Justin Scott. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hendricks, Edwin)
March 2, 2017 Filing 104 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Daniel Hamilton. Amendment to #98 Notice of Deposition of North-Aire 30(b)(6) Representative(s). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Harris, Richard)
March 2, 2017 Filing 103 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Daniel Hamilton. Amendment to #97 Notice of Deposition . (Harris, Richard)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting #100 Motion for Extension. The parties shall have until 4/28/2017 to complete depositions that relate only to the North-Aire/Hamilton II Case. FURTHER ORDERED directing the parties to file a joint proposed schedule by which dispositive motions pertaining to North-Aire/Hamilton II Case will be filed for the Court's approval, on or before 3/10/2017. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 2/24/2017.(KFZ)
February 23, 2017 Filing 101 RESPONSE to Motion re: #100 Second MOTION for Extension of Time Defendants' Joint Motion for Extension of Deadline to Complete Depositions as to North-Aire Witnesses filed by Daniel Hamilton. (Harris, Richard)
February 22, 2017 Filing 100 Second MOTION for Extension of Time Defendants' Joint Motion for Extension of Deadline to Complete Depositions as to North-Aire Witnesses by NorthAire Aviation LLC, Angela Scott, Justin Scott. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Hendricks, Edwin)
February 22, 2017 Filing 99 WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT re: #96 Notice of Deposition, #95 Notice of Deposition by Plaintiff Daniel Hamilton. (Harris, Richard)
February 20, 2017 Filing 98 *Amended NOTICE of Deposition of North-Aire Aviation, LLC, filed by Daniel Hamilton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Harris, Richard) *Modified to reflect amended document on 2/21/2017 (REK).
February 20, 2017 Filing 97 NOTICE of Deposition of Justin Scott, filed by Daniel Hamilton. (Harris, Richard)
February 16, 2017 Filing 96 ***Withdrawn by #99 ***NOTICE of Deposition of North-Aire Aviation, LLC, filed by Daniel Hamilton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EX A)(Harris, Richard) Modified on 2/23/2017 (REK).
February 16, 2017 Filing 95 ***Withdrawn by #99 ***NOTICE of Deposition of Justin Scott, filed by Daniel Hamilton. (Harris, Richard) Modified on 2/23/2017 (REK).
January 19, 2017 Filing 94 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by NorthAire Aviation LLC, Angela Scott, Justin Scott. (Hendricks, Edwin)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting #92 Stipulation for Extension. The parties shall have until 3/14/2017, to complete depositions that relate only to the North-Aire/Hamilton II Case. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 12/22/2016.(KFZ)
December 21, 2016 Filing 92 First MOTION for Extension of Time Extension of Time to Complete Depositions Joint Motion by NorthAire Aviation LLC, Angela Scott, Justin Scott. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hendricks, Edwin)
December 19, 2016 Filing 91 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by NorthAire Aviation LLC, Angela Scott, Justin Scott.(Hendricks, Edwin)
December 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #49 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 12/6/16. (LAD)
November 30, 2016 Filing 89 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by NorthAire Aviation LLC. (Hendricks, Edwin)
November 17, 2016 Filing 88 *NOTICE OF ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION: Lon R. Leavitt appearing for United States of America. Attorney Todd F. Lang terminated. (Leavitt, Lon) *Modified to correct event on 11/18/2016 (ATD).
November 1, 2016 Filing 87 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by NorthAire Aviation LLC. (Hendricks, Edwin)
October 30, 2016 Filing 86 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Daniel Hamilton. (Harris, Richard)
October 21, 2016 Filing 85 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Yavapai Community College District. (Gilbert, Elizabeth)
October 13, 2016 Filing 84 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Yavapai Community College District. (Gilbert, Elizabeth)
October 13, 2016 Filing 83 NOTICE re: Joinder and Service of Expert Disclosure by NorthAire Aviation LLC, Angela Scott, Justin Scott . (Hendricks, Edwin)
October 13, 2016 Filing 82 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by NorthAire Aviation LLC, Angela Scott, Justin Scott. (Hendricks, Edwin)
October 11, 2016 Filing 81 *SUPPLEMENT in Support of Guidance Academy, LLC, John L. Stonecipher and Amanda Stonecipher's Motion for An Order to Determine Privilege Regarding the Chronology by Defendants NorthAire Aviation LLC, Angela Scott, Justin Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Hendricks, Edwin) *Modified to reflect document should actually be filed in interim related case CV-12-8193-GMS on 10/12/2016 (KGM).
September 30, 2016 Filing 80 *NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by NorthAire Aviation LLC. (Hendricks, Edwin) *Modified to correct filer on 10/3/2016 (REK).
September 8, 2016 Filing 79 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Daniel Hamilton. (Harris, Richard)
September 7, 2016 Filing 78 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Yavapai Community College District. (Gilbert, Elizabeth)
September 7, 2016 Filing 77 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Yavapai Community College District. (Gilbert, Elizabeth)
September 7, 2016 Filing 76 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Yavapai Community College District. (Gilbert, Elizabeth)
August 11, 2016 Filing 75 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Yavapai Community College District. (Gilbert, Elizabeth)
August 5, 2016 Filing 74 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Yavapai Community College District. (Gilbert, Elizabeth)
July 27, 2016 Filing 73 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Yavapai Community College District. (Gilbert, Elizabeth)
June 30, 2016 Filing 72 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Daniel Hamilton. (Harris, Richard)
June 29, 2016 Filing 71 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Daniel Hamilton. (Harris, Richard)
June 16, 2016 Filing 70 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #49 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by NorthAire Aviation LLC, Angela Scott, Justin Scott. (REK)
June 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED granting the Motion to Exceed Page Limits (Doc. #67 ). The Clerk of Court is directed to file the lodged Reply (Doc. #68 ). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 6/15/2016. (REK)
June 13, 2016 Filing 68 ***Filed at #70 Per Order #69 ***LODGED Proposed Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss [Doc. #49 ] re: #67 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages . Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation for Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by NorthAire Aviation LLC, Angela Scott, Justin Scott. (Hendricks, Edwin) Modified on 6/16/2016 (REK).
June 13, 2016 Filing 67 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by NorthAire Aviation LLC, Angela Scott, Justin Scott. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hendricks, Edwin)
June 10, 2016 Filing 66 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Yavapai Community College District.(Staton, Georgia)
June 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER that the Parties shall have until August 5, 2016 to designate experts and disclose expert reports to be used in the North-Aire/Hamilton II Case in accordance with the federal rules of civil procedure. No experts designated will be applicable to the Guidance case. The Parties shall have until August 26, 2016 to designate any rebuttal experts and disclose their reports. FURTHER ORDERED that the Parties shall have until August 26, 2016 to complete written discovery in the North-Aire/Hamilton II Case. Nothing in this stipulation is intended to modify the Court's Order of April 22, 2016 in CV 12-8193-PCT-GMS (the Guidance/Hamilton I Case) (Doc. 317) regarding the scope of discoveryin either case. FURTHER ORDERED that the Parties shall have until January 13, 2017 to complete depositions that relate only to the North-Aire/Hamilton II Case and are not duplicative of those depositions scheduled and completed in the Guidance/Hamilton I Case. FURTHER ORDERED that the limitations on use of information and documents designated as "Confidential" in the Guidance/Hamilton I Case (12-CV-8193-PCT-GMS) (Doc. 54, 50 and 222), shall extend to use in North-Aire/Hamilton II Case and those Orders are hereby modified accordingly. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 6/7/16. (See Order for complete details.)(KMG)
June 3, 2016 Filing 64 RESPONSE to #49 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Daniel Hamilton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (LAD)
June 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER - 1. Plaintiff's Motion to Exceed Page Limits (Doc. #60 ) is granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to file the proposed lodged Response (Doc. #61 ). 2. The parties Joint Motion (Doc. #62 ) is granted. Defendants NorthAire Aviation, LLC Justin and Angela Scott shall have to and including June 13, 2016 to file their reply in support of the Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #49 ). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 6/3/16. (LAD)
June 3, 2016 Filing 62 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #49 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (For North-Aire Defendants' Counsel) by Daniel Hamilton. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Harris, Richard)
May 27, 2016 Filing 61 * (Filed at Doc. #61 ) LODGED Proposed Response to Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 49) re: #49 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation for Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Daniel Hamilton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EX A, #2 Exhibit EX B)(Harris, Richard) Modified on 6/3/2016 (LAD).
May 27, 2016 Filing 60 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Response to Motion to Dismiss by Daniel Hamilton. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Harris, Richard)
May 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting #58 Stipulation/Joint Motion to Extend Time. Plaintiff shall have to and including 5/27/2016 in which to respond to the Motion to Dismiss #49 . Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 5/19/2016.(KFZ)
May 18, 2016 Filing 58 *Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Doc. #49 Motion to Dismiss by Daniel Hamilton. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Harris, Richard) *Modified to correct motion type on 5/19/2016 (REK).
May 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER: Pending before the Court is Defendants' North-Aire Aviation, LLC's and Justin and Angela Scott's Ex Parte Application for Substitution of Counsel with Client Consent (Doc. #56 ). The Court has reviewed the same, and good cause appearing, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED granting the Motion. William G. Fairbourn and the law firm of Bonnett, Fairbourn, Friedman & Balint, P.C. are permitted to withdraw as counsel of record for Defendants North-Aire Aviation, LLC and Justin and Angela Scott. Ed Hendricks, Jr. and Brendan Murphy of the law firm Hendricks Murphy, PLLC are substituted in as counsel of record for Defendants North-Aire Aviation, LLC and Justin and Angela Scott in this matter. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 5/16/2016. (REK)
May 13, 2016 Filing 56 EX PARTE MOTION to Substitute Attorney with Client Consent by NorthAire Aviation LLC, Angela Scott, Justin Scott. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fairbourn, William)
May 13, 2016 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Ann Gilbert on behalf of Yavapai Community College District. (Gilbert, Elizabeth)
May 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED granting the parties' Stipulation/Joint Motion (Doc. #53 ). Plaintiff's Response to the Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #49 ) shall be due on or before May 19, 2016. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 5/05/2016. (REK)
May 4, 2016 Filing 53 *Joint MOTION for Clarification of Response Deadline as to #49 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Daniel Hamilton. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Harris, Richard) *Modified to correct motion type on 5/5/2016 (REK).
May 2, 2016 Filing 52 REPORT of Certification of Conferral by Defendants NorthAire Aviation LLC, Angela Scott, Justin Scott. (Fairbourn, William)
April 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER pursuant to the Court's Order #22 . Defendants NorthAire, Justin Scott and Angela Scott shall take the action required by the Court's conferral Order within seven (7) days of this Order or the Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #49 ) will be stricken. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 4/25/2016. (KFZ)
April 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER: the Motion to Consolidate #34 is granted in part and denied in part, Case Nos. CV 12-08193-PCT-GMS and CV 15-08095-PCT-GMS are consolidated for discovery purposes only; the Notice re Exclusion of Pre-Summer 2013 Discovery 312 is denied to the extent it constitutes a request for this Court to revise its previous discovery orders; the Motion to Strike 314 is denied as moot (see order for complete details). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 4/22/16. (Associated Cases: 3:12-cv-08193-GMS, 3:15-cv-08095-GMS) (REW) Modified on 4/25/2016 (REW).
April 22, 2016 Filing 49 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by NorthAire Aviation LLC, Angela Scott, Justin Scott. (Fairbourn, William)
April 11, 2016 Filing 48 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Yavapai Community College District: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 4/11/16 to Yavapai Community College District . (Gilbert, Elizabeth)
April 6, 2016 Filing 47 REPLY to Response to Motion re: (248 in 3:12-cv-08193-GMS, 248 in 3:12-cv-08193-GMS) MOTION to Consolidate Cases (reformatted) MOTION to Stay filed by Daniel Hamilton. (Associated Cases: 3:15-cv-08095-GMS, 3:12-cv-08193-GMS) (Harris, Richard)
April 6, 2016 Filing 46 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by April Morgan, John Morgan.(Bohr, Jodi)
April 1, 2016 Filing 45 *MOTION to Consolidate Cases Reply on Motion to Stay Pending Ruling on Motion to Consolidate Cases by Daniel Hamilton. Associated Cases: 3:12-cv-08193-GMS, 3:15-cv-08095-GMS (Associated Cases: CV-12-08193-PCT-GMS; CV-15-08095-PCT-GMS) (Harris, Richard) *Incorrect category selected; attorney noticed to refile on 4/4/2016 (LSP).
March 28, 2016 Filing 44 REPLY to Response to Motion re: (248 in 3:12-cv-08193-GMS, 248 in 3:12-cv-08193-GMS) MOTION to Consolidate Cases (reformatted) MOTION to Stay filed by Daniel Hamilton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EX A, #2 Exhibit EX B) (Associated Cases: 3:12-cv-08193-GMS, 3:15-cv-08095-GMS) (Harris, Richard)
March 28, 2016 Filing 43 RESPONSE to Motion re: (248 in 3:12-cv-08193-GMS, 248 in 3:12-cv-08193-GMS, 248 in 3:12-cv-08193-GMS) MOTION to Consolidate Cases (reformatted) MOTION to Stay filed by NorthAire Aviation LLC, Angela Scott, Justin Scott. (Associated Cases: 3:15-cv-08095-GMS, 3:12-cv-08193-GMS) (Fairbourn, William)
March 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER: granting the Parties' #41 Stipulation; Defendants NorthAire Aviation LLC, Justin and Angela Scott may have up to and including 3/28/16 in which to file a response to Plaintiff-Relator's pending Motion to Consolidate this action with CV-12-08193-PCT-GMS; Defendants shall file their response in the appropriate action in which the Motion to Consolidate (Doc. 248) is pending, Case No. CV-12-08193-PCT-GMS. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 3/22/16. (REW)
March 21, 2016 Filing 41 STIPULATION by NorthAire Aviation LLC, Justin Scott. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fairbourn, William)
March 21, 2016 Filing 40 *RESPONSE to Motion re: (248 in 3:12-cv-08193-GMS)(reformatted) MOTION to Stay filed by Amanda Alsobrook, Guidance Academy LLC, John L Stonecipher. (Associated Cases: 3:12-cv-08193-GMS, 3:15-cv-08095-GMS) (Halavais, Jamie) *Modified text on 3/22/2016 (LSP).
March 21, 2016 Filing 39 *RESPONSE to Motion re: (248 in 3:12-cv-08193-GMS) MOTION to Consolidate Cases (reformatted) filed by Amanda Alsobrook, Guidance Academy LLC, John L Stonecipher. (Associated Cases: 3:12-cv-08193-GMS, 3:15-cv-08095-GMS) (Grabel, Joshua) *Modified text on 3/22/2016 (LSP).
March 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #37 Stipulation. Defendants NorthAire Aviation LLC and Scott may have up to and including 4/22/2016 in which to file a responsive pleading to the Complaint in this matter. No further extensions shall be granted absent extraordinary circumstances. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 3/16/2016. (KFZ)
March 15, 2016 Filing 37 * STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint by NorthAire Aviation LLC, Justin Scott. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fairbourn, William) * Modified to correct event; attorney noticed on 3/15/2016 (LAD).
March 9, 2016 Filing 36 NOTICE re: Service of Court Order Doc. 22 by Daniel Hamilton re: #22 Order . (Harris, Richard)
March 1, 2016 Filing 35 Summons Issued as to April Morgan, John Morgan, Yavapai Community College District. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(HLA)*** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
February 29, 2016 Filing 34 *AMENDED MOTION to Consolidate Cases (reformatted), EMERGENCY MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of the Motion to Consolidate by Daniel Hamilton. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Associated Cases: CV-12-08193-PCT-GMS; CV-15-08095-PCT-GMS) (Harris, Richard) *Added MOTION to Stay and modified to reflect Amended on 3/1/2016 (ATD).
February 29, 2016 Filing 33 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Daniel Hamilton. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Associated Cases: CV-12-08193-PCT-GMS; CV-15-08095-PCT-GMS) (Harris, Richard)
February 29, 2016 Filing 32 SUMMONS Submitted by Daniel Hamilton. (Carman, Krista)
February 29, 2016 Filing 31 SUMMONS Submitted by Daniel Hamilton. (Carman, Krista)
February 29, 2016 Filing 30 SUMMONS Submitted by Daniel Hamilton. (Carman, Krista)
February 26, 2016 Filing 29 SUMMONS Submitted by Daniel Hamilton. (Carman, Krista)
February 26, 2016 Filing 28 SUMMONS Submitted by Daniel Hamilton. (Carman, Krista)
February 26, 2016 Filing 27 SUMMONS Submitted by Daniel Hamilton. (Carman, Krista)
February 25, 2016 Filing 26 Summons Issued as to Angela Scott, Justin Scott. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(HLA). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
February 24, 2016 Filing 25 SUMMONS Submitted by Daniel Hamilton. (Carman, Krista)
February 24, 2016 Filing 24 SUMMONS Submitted by Daniel Hamilton. (Carman, Krista)
February 24, 2016 Filing 23 Summons Issued as to NorthAire Aviation LLC. (HLA). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
February 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER that a motion pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) is discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. Therefore, the parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of a motion to dismiss to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file notice of service. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 2/23/2016. (KFZ)
February 23, 2016 Filing 21 SUMMONS Submitted by Daniel Hamilton. (Carman, Krista)
February 23, 2016 Filing 20 SUMMONS Submitted by Daniel Hamilton. (Carman, Krista)
February 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SEALED ORDER That the Complaint shall be unsealed and shall be served on the defendants by the relator. FURTHER ORDERED The seal shall be lifted as to all other matters occurring in this action after the date of this Order. See Order for Details. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 2/18/16. (cc: T Lang/ K Carman/ R Harris)(MAP)
February 17, 2016 Filing 18 *Sealed Ex Parte Notice of Election to Decline Intervention by United States of America. (MAP) *Modified on 2/18/2016 to correct text (MAP)*.
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SEALED ORDER granting #14 Sealed Motion to Transfer Case. ORDERED This case is reassigned to the Honorable G. Murray Snow. All future filings shall be under case number: CV 15-8095-PCT-GMS. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 2/4/16. (cc: R Harris/T Lang)(MAP)
January 28, 2016 Filing 14 SEALED MOTION to Transfer Case by Daniel Hamilton. (MAP)
January 13, 2016 Filing 13 SEALED Order that Daniel Hamilton show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.7(b) before Judge Susan R Bolton. Show Cause Hearing set for 2/8/2016 at 04:30 PM before Judge Susan R Bolton. (Attachments: #1 Instructions, #2 Consent Form) (cc: All Cnsl)(MAP)
December 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Unopposed Ex Parte Motion (Application) to Extend the Seal and Deadline for Election on Intervention. IT IS ORDERED that the United States shall have until and including February 18, 2016, to intervene in the above-captioned action or to notify the Court that it declines to do so. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the complaint and all other filings in this case shall remain under seal until and including February 18, 2016, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns on 12/21/15. (LAD) cc: Counsel of Record
December 18, 2015 Filing 10 SEALED EX PARTE UNOPPOSED MOTION (APPLICATION) to Extend the Seal and Deadline on Intervention by United States of America. (2nd request) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (LAD)
December 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF RECUSAL. ORDERED that the Honorable Paul G. Rosenblatt recuses himself from this action and that this action is reassigned by automated random selection to Magistrate Judge Michelle H. Burns for all further proceedings. FURTHER ORDERED that all future documents filed and/or served in this action shall be captioned with case number CV-15-8095-PCT-MHB. Signed by Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 12/18/15. (Attachments: #1 Instructions, #2 Consent Form) (cc: all counsel)(MAP)
August 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SEALED ORDER granting #7 Ex Parte Motion to Extend the Seal and Deadline for Election on Intervention. FURTHER ORDERED that the complaint and this case shall remain under seal, and that the United States' time to make a decision regarding intervention is extended, until and including December 18, 2015. Signed by Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 8/19/15. (cc: AUSA) (MAP)
August 17, 2015 Filing 7 SEALED EX PARTE MOTION to Extend the Seal and Deadline for Election on Intervention by United States of America. (MAP)
August 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SEALED ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. This matter has been reassigned to the Honorable Paul G. Rosenblatt. All future pleadings and papers submitted for filing shall bear the following complete case number: CV-15-8095 PCT PGR. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/5/15. (cc: Plaintiff Only)(MAP)
June 5, 2015 Filing 4 SEALED Notice of Related Case and MOTION for to Partially Lift Seal by Daniel Hamilton. (MAP)
June 1, 2015 Filing 2 SEALED NOTICE: Filing fee paid, receipt number PHX159138. This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-15-8095-PCT-DGC. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (cc: Counsel) (MAP)
June 1, 2015 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Daniel Hamilton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hamilton v. Yavapai Community College District, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Scott
Represented By: David Winthrop Cowles
Represented By: Laura Anne Van Buren
Represented By: Edwin F Hendricks, Jr.
Represented By: Brendan Andrew Murphy
Represented By: William G Fairbourn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Scott
Represented By: David Winthrop Cowles
Represented By: Laura Anne Van Buren
Represented By: Edwin F Hendricks, Jr.
Represented By: Brendan Andrew Murphy
Represented By: William G Fairbourn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Morgan
Represented By: Donald Peder Johnsen
Represented By: Jodi Renee Bohr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yavapai Community College District
Represented By: Eileen Dennis GilBride
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Gilbert
Represented By: Georgia A Staton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NorthAire Aviation LLC
Represented By: David Winthrop Cowles
Represented By: Laura Anne Van Buren
Represented By: Edwin F Hendricks, Jr.
Represented By: Brendan Andrew Murphy
Represented By: William G Fairbourn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: April Morgan
Represented By: Donald Peder Johnsen
Represented By: Jodi Renee Bohr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United States of America
Represented By: Todd Frederick Lang
Represented By: Adam Ryan Smart
Represented By: Lon R Leavitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Hamilton
Represented By: Richard James Harris
Represented By: Krista Michelle Carman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?