Stypeck v. Clarkdale, City of et al

Plaintiff: Donna L Stypeck
Defendant: Clarkdale, City of, Clarkdale City Council, Jonathan A Millet, Richard Calvert and Kathy Parker
Case Number: 3:2015cv08163
Filed: August 31, 2015
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: Yavapai
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 10, 2016 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that the remaining claims in this case are dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk is directed to terminate this action. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/10/16. (EJA)
July 25, 2016 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting with prejudice 78 Clarkdale Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. No further amendments will be allowed. Defendant Calvert's motion to set aside default is granted 92 . Plaintiff's motion for default judgment (Doc. 93 ) is denied as moot. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/25/16. (EJA)
May 24, 2016 77 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER that the Defendant's motion to dismiss (Doc. 62 ) is granted without leave to amend. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/24/2016. (KMG)
May 20, 2016 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's motion for disqualification (Doc. 73 ) is denied. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/20/2016.(KMG)
May 16, 2016 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 62 Motion to Dismiss Defendant Kathy Parker (Assistant to Millet) without leave to amend. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/16/16. (LAD)
April 29, 2016 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER the motion to dismiss claims against the City of Clarkdale, Clarkdale City Council, Doug Von Gausig, Richard Dehnert, Curtiss Bohall, Bill Regner,and Scott Buckley (Doc. 45 ) is granted. Plaintiff may file a second amended complaint by May 20, 2016. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/29/2016.(KMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stypeck v. Clarkdale, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna L Stypeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarkdale, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarkdale City Council
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan A Millet
Represented By: Jonathan Alma Millet
Represented By: Donald Charles Zavala, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Calvert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Parker
Represented By: Jonathan Alma Millet
Represented By: Donald Charles Zavala, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?