Vasko v. Hacker-Agnew et al
Petitioner: |
Gary Vasko |
Respondent: |
Carla Hacker-Agnew and Attorney General of the State of Arizona |
Case Number: |
3:2017cv08001 |
Filed: |
January 9, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Arizona |
Office: |
Prescott Division Office |
County: |
Pima |
Presiding Judge: |
John Z Boyle (PS) |
Presiding Judge: |
Diane J Humetewa |
Nature of Suit: |
General |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 2254 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 18, 2019 |
Filing
30
ORDER that Magistrate Judge Boyle's Report and Recommendation 26 is ACCEPTED and ADOPTED as the Order of this Court. The Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2254 1 is DENIED and DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Pursuant to Rule 11(a) of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases, a Certificate of Appealability and leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal are DENIED because dismissal of the Petition is justified by a plain procedural bar and reasonable jurists would not find the ruling debatable. The Clerk of the Court shall terminate this action and enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 11/18/2019. (REK)
|
June 28, 2017 |
Filing
14
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - IT IS ORDERED that Magistrate Judge Boyle's R&R (Doc. 13 ) is accepted and adopted as the order of this Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Respondents' Motion to Stay (Doc. 9 ) and Petitioner&# 039;s Motion to Stay (Doc. 12 ) are GRANTED and that this matter is STAYED pending further order of the Court. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that, no later than July 28, 2017, Petitioner shall file a status report to inform the Court of the status of hi s state court proceedings. In addition, every 90 days after the initial status report, Petitioner shall file a supplemental status report regarding his state court proceedings. Lastly, Petitioner must notify the Court within 30 days after the stat e court review is completed by filing a notice. If relief is not granted by the state court, the stay will be lifted and the Court will set a deadline for Respondents to answer the Petition (Doc. 1 ). (See document for further details). Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 6/28/17. (SLQ)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?