Vargas v. Snowflake Unified School District No. 5 et al

Plaintiff: Oscar Vargas
Defendant: Snowflake Unified School District No. 5, Hollis Merrill and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 3:2017cv08035
Filed: February 24, 2017
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: Navajo
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 28, 2017 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion for leave to amend (Doc. 27 ) is granted. Because Plaintiff failed to lodge his proposed amended complaint, Plaintiff is further ordered to FILE the second amended complaint no later than September 1, 2017. If Plaintiff fails to file the second amended complaint by September 1, 2017, this Order permitting leave to amend will be deemed to be vacated and the case will proceed on the first amended complaint. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the to-be-filed second amended complaint within the time set by the rules [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 8/28/17.(MAW)
June 20, 2017 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Defendants' motion to dismiss (Doc. 12 ) is granted in part and denied in part. Specifically, the motion is granted with respect to the portion of Count 4 that is a procedural Due Process claim (as to all Defendants); the motion is denied in all other respects [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 6/20/17.(MAW)
March 17, 2017 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 7 Motion for Extend time to serve. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 3/17/2017.(TCA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vargas v. Snowflake Unified School District No. 5 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar Vargas
Represented By: Eduardo H Coronado
Represented By: Kai M Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Snowflake Unified School District No. 5
Represented By: Shelby Mae Exposito
Represented By: Robert D Haws
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hollis Merrill
Represented By: Shelby Mae Exposito
Represented By: Robert D Haws
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?