Puhuyaoma v. Yokohama Tire Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Merlynn Puhuyaoma
Defendant: Unknown Parties, Accushine Incorporated, Yokohama Tire Corporation and Accushine Incorporated an Arizona corporation doing business as Accushine Auto Sales
Case Number: 3:2018cv08178
Filed: August 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Prescott Division Office
County: Navajo
Presiding Judge: Douglas L Rayes
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) Plaintiffs filed by Plaintiff Merlynn Puhuyaoma. (Clark, Shannon)
August 23, 2018 Filing 13 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Yokohama Tire Corporation. (Booker, Brian)
August 17, 2018 Filing 12 *Corporate Disclosure Statement by Yokohama Tire Corporation naming Yokohama Rubber Company Limited as a corporate party. (Booker, Brian) *Modified to add corporate party on 8/20/2018 (EJA).
August 14, 2018 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Jeffrey A Swedo on behalf of defendant Yokohama Tire Corporation. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 9, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Yokohama Tire Corporation. (KAS)
August 8, 2018 Filing 10 Yokohama Tire Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint by Yokohama Tire Corporation.(Booker, Brian)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 10/23/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 506, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Douglas L Rayes. The parties are directed to meet and confer at least 14 days before the Scheduling Conference as required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). (See Order for details.) Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 8/2/2018. (MMO)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 8/2/2018. (MMO)
August 2, 2018 Filing 7 *Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #1 Notice of Removal Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet by Defendant Yokohama Tire Corporation. (Booker, Brian) *Modified to correct document links on 8/3/2018 (KAS).
August 2, 2018 Filing 6 *Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #1 Notice of Removal Civil Cover Sheet by Defendant Yokohama Tire Corporation. (Booker, Brian) *Modified to correct document links on 8/3/2018 (KAS).
August 2, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by Yokohama Tire Corporation. Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MCO)
August 2, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by Yokohama Tire Corporation. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MCO)
August 2, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MCO)
August 1, 2018 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-15794543. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-18-08178-PCT-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MCO)
August 1, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Navajo County Superior Court, case number CV2018-00316. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-15794543 filed by Yokohama Tire Corporation. (Booker, Brian) (MCO) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/2/2018: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (MCO).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Puhuyaoma v. Yokohama Tire Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merlynn Puhuyaoma
Represented By: Shannon L Clark
Represented By: Robert W Boatman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accushine Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yokohama Tire Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey A Swedo
Represented By: Brian Ronald Booker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accushine Incorporated an Arizona corporation doing business as Accushine Auto Sales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?