Platero v. United States of America

Plaintiff: Rosalynn Platero
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2018cv08305
Filed: October 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION to Stay of Case Due to Federal Government Shutdown by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sichi, Elizabeth)
December 21, 2018 Filing 15 * NOTICE of Erratare #14 Motion by Defendant United States of America. (Sichi, Elizabeth) * Modified to add document linkage 12/26/2018 (LAD).
December 21, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Sichi, Elizabeth)
November 26, 2018 Filing 13 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Rosalynn Platero : Certificate of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon United States of America on 11/5/2018, 11/6/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit to Cert of Service)(Borg, Scott)
November 20, 2018 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Scott E Borg on behalf of plaintiff. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
November 9, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #11 Summons Submitted filed by Rosalynn Platero. Summons submitted for non-party. Unable to issue summons. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
November 8, 2018 NOTICE of request for e-notices by Elizabeth K. Sichi. (Sichi, Elizabeth)
November 8, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Submitted by Rosalynn Platero. (Borg, Scott)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 10/30/18. (CLB)
October 30, 2018 Filing 9 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiff Rosalynn Platero. (Borg, Scott)
October 30, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to United States of America as to US Attorneys Office. (BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
October 30, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Rosalynn Platero. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAR)
October 30, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Rosalynn Platero. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile with correct PDF document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAR)
October 30, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (BAR)
October 30, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(BAR). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
October 30, 2018 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16132514. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 18-08305-PCT-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (BAR)
October 30, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Rosalynn Platero. (Borg, Scott) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(BAR)
October 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16132514 filed by Rosalynn Platero. (Borg, Scott) (BAR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Platero v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Elizabeth Kay Sichi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosalynn Platero
Represented By: Scott Eugene Borg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?