Katz et al v. New Enchantment LLC et al

Plaintiff: Steven Katz and Gale Katz
Defendant: New Enchantment LLC, Enchantment Group and New Enchantment Group LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv08308
Filed: November 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER that, contemporaneous to filing the joint proposed case management plan (Doc. #18 ), the parties shall file a joint jurisdictional statement. Such statement must list every member of every LLC, consistent with Ninth Circuit law, and such member's citizenship. Any partnerships' or other entities' citizenship must also be listed consistent with Ninth Circuit law. None of the allegations in this document may be based on information and belief. (This deadline amends and supersedes the 4/15/2019 deadline in the Court's Order of 11/7/2018.) See attached order for additional information. Signed by Senior Judge James A. Teilborg on 12/20/2018. (RMW)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 1/17/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 503, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Senior Judge James A. Teilborg. (See attached order for further information.) Signed by Senior Judge James A. Teilborg on 12/4/2018. (RMW)
December 3, 2018 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by New Enchantment Group LLC. (Petri, Shawn)
December 3, 2018 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Enchantment Group. (Petri, Shawn)
December 3, 2018 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by New Enchantment LLC. (Petri, Shawn)
December 3, 2018 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Enchantment Group, New Enchantment Group LLC, New Enchantment LLC.(Petri, Shawn)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying #12 the stipulation for extension of time to file a responsive pleading. Signed by Senior Judge James A. Teilborg on 11/30/2018. (See attached order for additional information.) (RMW)
November 29, 2018 Filing 12 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re: #1 Complaint by Enchantment Group, New Enchantment Group LLC, New Enchantment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Petri, Shawn)
November 29, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Shawn Michael Petri on behalf of Enchantment Group, New Enchantment Group LLC, New Enchantment LLC. (Petri, Shawn)
November 13, 2018 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Gale Katz, Steven Katz: Certificate of Service re: Summons Notice re Magistrate Judge, Supp Complaint, Complaint, MIDP Notice to Parties, General Order, MIDP Checklist, Standard Track Civil Order upon Enchantment Group, New Enchantment LLC, New Enchantment Group LLC on 11/12/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit)(Frerichs, Scott)
November 7, 2018 Filing 9 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Senior Judge James A Teilborg: Order to Show Cause Hearing held on 11/7/2018. IT IS ORDERED that on or before April 15, 2019, Plaintiffs' counsel shall file a supplemental allegation with a factual basis for the allegation [see attached minute entry for details]. (Court Reporter Christine Coaly) Hearing held 2:55 PM to 3:10 PM.(MAW)
November 6, 2018 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENT Supplemental Complaint pursuant to Court Order re: #1 Complaint by Plaintiffs Gale Katz, Steven Katz. (Frerichs, Scott)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: By noon, 11/7/2018, Plaintiff shall file a supplement to the complaint properly alleging the citizenship of the limited liability companies and identifying the entity type and citizenship for the "Enchantment Group" or this case will be dismissed, without prejudice, for lack of federal subject matter jurisdiction. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that on 11/7/2018 at 3:00 p.m. counsel for Plaintiff shall appear and show cause why he should not be sanctioned for failing to plead federal subject matter jurisdiction repeatedly. (See CV 18-8044-PCT-JAT Doc. 10). (See attached order for additional information.) Signed by Senior Judge James A. Teilborg on 11/5/2018. (RMW)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDARD CIVIL TRACK INITIAL ORDER: IT IS ORDERED, if not already accomplished prior to the date of this Order, that Plaintiff(s) shall effect service of the Complaint and Summons upon all Defendants no later than 90 days after the filing of the Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties must comply with Gen. Ord. No. 17-08 (D. Ariz. Apr. 14, 2017) regarding the mandatory initial discovery responses. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve Defendant(s) with a copy of this Order [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 11/2/18. (MAW)
November 2, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (BAR)
November 2, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Enchantment Group, New Enchantment Group LLC, New Enchantment LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(BAR). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
November 2, 2018 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16152337. This case has been assigned to the Honorable James A Teilborg. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 18-08308-PCT-JAT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (BAR)
November 2, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Gale Katz, Steven Katz. (Frerichs, Scott) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(BAR)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16152337 filed by Steven Katz, Gale Katz. (Frerichs, Scott) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BAR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Katz et al v. New Enchantment LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Enchantment LLC
Represented By: Shawn Michael Petri
Represented By: Todd Arthur Rigby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enchantment Group
Represented By: Shawn Michael Petri
Represented By: Todd Arthur Rigby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Enchantment Group LLC
Represented By: Shawn Michael Petri
Represented By: Todd Arthur Rigby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Katz
Represented By: Scott Frazier Frerichs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gale Katz
Represented By: Scott Frazier Frerichs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?