Louks v. CVS Health Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Drake Louks
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation, Unknown Parties and CVS Pharmacy Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2018cv08355
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan M Brnovich
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Errata re: #17 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint to Join a Non-Diverse Defendant Proposed Order by Plaintiff Drake Louks.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Zerlaut, Scott)
February 12, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint to Join a Non-Diverse Defendant by Drake Louks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Zerlaut, Scott)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Discovery due by 11/15/2019. Dispositive motions due by 12/15/2019. Telephone Trial Conference set for 1/7/2020 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 506, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Susan M Brnovich. Scheduling conference set for 2/8/2019 is vacated. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 2/4/2019. (TCA)
January 30, 2019 Filing 15 Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) Joint Case Management Report filed by Plaintiff Drake Louks. (Zerlaut, Scott)
January 18, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendants CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy Incorporated. (Hunter, Jeffrey)
January 9, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Errata re: #12 Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery by Plaintiff Drake Louks.. (Zerlaut, Scott)
January 7, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Drake Louks. (Zerlaut, Scott)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: A Telephonic Case Management Conference is set for 2/8/2019 at 08:45 AM in Courtroom 506, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Susan M Brnovich. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 12/28/18. (CLB)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 12/28/18. (CLB)
December 26, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #7 Summons Submitted filed by Drake Louks. Party name does not match complaint. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
December 21, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS/FIRM NAME by Michael Day Morgan. (Morgan, Michael)
December 21, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Submitted by Drake Louks. (Zerlaut, Scott)
December 19, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy Incorporated.(Hunter, Jeffrey)
December 18, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy Incorporated. (Hunter, Jeffrey)
December 17, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy Incorporated. (MFR)
December 17, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MFR)
December 17, 2018 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16317389. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan M Brnovich. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-18-8355-PCT-SMB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MFR)
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Coconino County Superior Court, case number S0300CV201800471. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16317389 filed by CVS Pharmacy Incorporated, CVS Health Corporation. (Hunter, Jeffrey) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit)(MFR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Louks v. CVS Health Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey Stephen Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy Incorporated
Represented By: Jeffrey Stephen Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Drake Louks
Represented By: Scott Michael Zerlaut
Represented By: Brigham Allen Cluff
Represented By: Michael Day Morgan
Represented By: Thomas J Shorall, Jr.
Represented By: David H Cluff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?