Broxton v. Western Arizona Regional Medical Center et al
Plaintiff: Paul Broxton
Defendant: Western Arizona Regional Medical Center, Irfam Mirza, Unknown Party, Bullhead City Hospital Corporation Western Arizona Regional Medical Center and Irfan Mirza
Case Number: 3:2019cv08005
Filed: January 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John J Tuchi
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1402
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER - Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (Doc. #9 ) is dismissed with permission to file a Second Amended Complaint by March 12, 2019, that complies with the provisions of this Order. FURTHER ORDERED that if Plaintiff does not file a Second Amended Complaint by March 12, 2019, the Clerk shall dismiss this action without further Order of this Court. See document for further details. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 2/26/2019. (RMV)
February 22, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Bullhead City Hospital Corporation Western Arizona Regional Medical Center, Irfan Mirza, Unknown Party filed by Paul Broxton. (5 pages) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(RMV)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend #1 Complaint. Plaintiff has until 2/22/2019, to file an Amended Complaint that conforms to the requirements of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. FURTHER ORDERED that if Plaintiff fails to comply, the Clerk shall dismiss this action without further Order of this Court. See document for further details. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 1/29/2019. (RMV)
January 23, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend #1 Complaint by Paul Broxton. (1 page) (RMV)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff's #1 Complaint is dismissed with permission to file an Amended Complaint by January 24, 2019. If Plaintiff does not file an Amended Complaint by January 24, 2019, the Clerk shall dismiss this action without further Order of this Court. If Plaintiff elects to file an Amended Complaint, it may not be served until and unless the Court screens the Amended Complaint pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). See document for complete details. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 1/9/19. (MSA)
January 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (SST)
January 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (SST)
January 4, 2019 Filing 3 This case has been assigned to the Honorable John J Tuchi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-08005-PCT-JJT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (SST)
January 4, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Paul Broxton. (SST)
January 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Paul Broxton.(SST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broxton v. Western Arizona Regional Medical Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Arizona Regional Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irfam Mirza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bullhead City Hospital Corporation Western Arizona Regional Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irfan Mirza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Broxton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?