Croteau v. Williams-Grand Canyon News et al
Plaintiff: Diana J Croteau
Defendant: Western News&Info Incorporated, Williams-Grand Canyon News, Williams GC Newspapers Incorporated, Navajo-Hopi Observer and Western News & Info Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2019cv08053
Filed: February 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2019 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Diana J Croteau: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on April 9, 2019 to Defendants . (Hill, Nathaniel)
April 9, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT First against All Defendants filed by Diana J Croteau.(Hill, Nathaniel)
April 9, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE re: Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons by Diana J Croteau . (Hill, Nathaniel)
April 5, 2019 Filing 7 *NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading pursuant to LRCiv 15.1(b) by Diana J Croteau (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint)(Hill, Nathaniel) *Modified to correct event on 4/8/2019 (GMP).
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER/NOTICE PURSUANT TOFED. R. CIV. P. 4(m) - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on May 22, 2019. See document for complete details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 2/20/19. (MSA)
February 20, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Navajo-Hopi Observer, Western News&Info Incorporated, Williams GC Newspapers Incorporated, Williams-Grand Canyon News. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(MFR). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
February 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MFR)
February 20, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16558053. This case has been assigned to the Honorable G Murray Snow. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-8053-PCT-GMS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MFR)
February 20, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Diana J Croteau. (Hill, Nathaniel) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(MFR)
February 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16558053 filed by Diana J Croteau. (Hill, Nathaniel) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MFR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Croteau v. Williams-Grand Canyon News et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western News&Info Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williams-Grand Canyon News
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williams GC Newspapers Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navajo-Hopi Observer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western News & Info Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana J Croteau
Represented By: Nathaniel James Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?