Lee v. Pinnacle Recovery Incorporated

Plaintiff: Lorraine Lee
Defendant: Pinnacle Recovery Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2019cv08057
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John Z Boyle
Referring Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Pinnacle Recovery Incorporated. (Fulton, Cynthia)
April 19, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Lorraine Lee. (Heieck, Robert)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar, IT IS ORDERED the Scheduling Conference, presently set for 5/6/19 at 11:00 a.m. is VACATED and RESET. Scheduling Conference set for 5/9/19 at 9:15 a.m. in Courtroom 602, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Chief Judge G. Murray Snow. Ordered by Chief Judge G. Murray Snow. (GMS, ag) ( This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.)
April 3, 2019 Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge G. Murray Snow. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-19-8057-PCT-GMS. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED The Scheduling Conference date is affirmed unless reset by separate order. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
April 2, 2019 Filing 17 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Case Management Conference set for 5/6/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 302, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle. See document for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle on 3/25/2019. (REK)
March 25, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER: That counsel having complied with this Court's Order, the Order to Show Cause Hearing scheduled for April 15, 2019 is hereby VACATED. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
March 22, 2019 Filing 13 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order that Lorraine Lee show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.7(b) before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. Show Cause Hearing set for 4/15/2019 at 04:30 PM before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. (Attachments: #1 Instructions, #2 Consent Form)(MAP)
March 20, 2019 Filing 10 Magistrate Election Form Deadline set as to Pinnacle Recovery Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(MAP)
March 20, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pinnacle Recovery Incorporated. (Fulton, Cynthia)
March 20, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Pinnacle Recovery Incorporated.(Fulton, Cynthia)
March 4, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Brian Parker on behalf of plaintiff. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
March 4, 2019 Filing 7 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Lorraine Lee: Proof of Service re: Summons upon Pinnacle Recovery, Inc. on 3/1/2019. (Heieck, Robert)
February 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Lorraine Lee. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MFR)
February 22, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Pinnacle Recovery Incorporated. (MFR). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
February 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MFR)
February 22, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16562897. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John Z Boyle. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-8057-PCT-JZB. Magistrate Election form attached. (MFR)
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Lorraine Lee. (Heieck, Robert) (MFR)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16562897 filed by Lorraine Lee. (Heieck, Robert) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A 1 of 2, #3 Exhibit A 2 of 2, #4 Exhibit B 1 of 2, #5 Exhibit B 2 of 2, #6 Exhibit C 1 of 2, #7 Exhibit C 2 of 2, #8 Exhibit D 1 of 2, #9 Exhibit D 2 of 2, #10 Exhibit E 1 of 2, #11 Exhibit E 2 of 2, #12 Exhibit F-K)(MFR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. Pinnacle Recovery Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pinnacle Recovery Incorporated
Represented By: Cynthia Lee Fulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorraine Lee
Represented By: Brian Parker
Represented By: Robert John Heieck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?