Steigleman v. Symetra Life Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Jill M Steigleman
Defendant: Symetra Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv08060
Filed: February 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Robert Luke Adams. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Associated Cases: cv-18-378-TUC-JGZ (LAB), CV-19-08060-DJH) (Dawson, Steven)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER setting a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 6/10/2019 at 4:30 PM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Diane J Humetewa. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 4/1/2019. (See Order for details.) (LFIG)
April 1, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Symetra Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Symetra Financial Corporation, Corporate Parent Sumitomo Life Insurance Company for Symetra Life Insurance Company. (True, Nicole)
April 1, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Symetra Life Insurance Company.(True, Nicole)
March 8, 2019 Filing 7 *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Jill M Steigleman: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Consent to Magistrate, MIDP Notice & Order, Notice of Related Filing, Order re Motions upon Symetra Life Insurance Co. c/o AZ Dept of Insurance on 03/01/2019. (Dawson, Steven) *Modified to correct date of service on 3/8/2019 (SLQ).
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. ORDERED that Plaintiff serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant and file a notice of service. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 2/28/2019. (LFIG)
February 27, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Symetra Life Insurance Company. (MFR). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
February 27, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MFR)
February 27, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16583627. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-8060-PCT-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MFR)
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Jill M Steigleman. (Dawson, Steven) (MFR)
February 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16583627 filed by Jill M Steigleman. (Dawson, Steven) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Related Filing)(MFR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steigleman v. Symetra Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill M Steigleman
Represented By: Steven C Dawson
Represented By: Anita Rosenthal
Represented By: Sander Ruggill Dawson
Represented By: Scott Edward Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Symetra Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Todd Daniel Erb
Represented By: Stephen M Bressler
Represented By: Nicole Marie True
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?