Jolly v. Mohave, County of et al
Plaintiff: Clifford Jolly
Defendant: Unknown Oehler, Unknown Gilbert, Mohave, County of, Amy Gardner, Danial J Oehler, City of Kingman Police Department, Heath Mosby, Unknown Gardner, Unknown Schoppmann, Unknown Parties, Ryan N Dooley, Unknown Mosby, Dennis Gilbert, Kingman, City of, Unknown Dooley, Mohave County Attorney's Office and James Schoppmann
Case Number: 3:2019cv08088
Filed: March 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: John J Tuchi
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2019 Filing 30 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #18 MOTION to Amend/Correct Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File and Serve Amended Complaint re Defendant City of Kingman filed by Clifford Jolly. (Felder, Lawrence)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED granting the First Stipulated Motion to Extend Plaintiff's Deadline for Filing and Serving Reply to Defendant City of Kingman's Response to Motion to Amend (Doc. #27 ). Plaintiff's deadline to file his Reply to the Kingman Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Amend (Doc. #18 ) is extended to June 14, 2019. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 6/12/19. (JAMA)
June 10, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #26 Reply to Response to Motion filed by Clifford Jolly. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. Please do not refile. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LAD)
June 10, 2019 Filing 27 STIPULATION First Stipulated Motion to Extend Plaintiffs Deadline for Filing and Serving Reply re to Defendant City of Kingmans Response to Motion to Amend by Clifford Jolly. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Felder, Lawrence)
June 10, 2019 Filing 26 * REPLY to Response to Motion re: #17 MOTION to Amend/Correct #15 Response to Motion Plainitff's Motion for Leave to File and Serve Amended Complaint re Oehler Defendants Plaintiffs Reply to Defendants Daniel and Jane Doe Oehlers Response to Motion for Leave to File and Serve Amended Complaint filed by Clifford Jolly. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Felder, Lawrence) * Document not in compliance with Local Rule; attorney noticed on 6/11/2019 (LAD).
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED granting the First Stipulated Motion to Extend Plaintiff's Deadline for Filing and Service Reply re Motion to Amend (Doc. #24 ). Plaintiff's deadline to file a Reply to the Oehler Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Amend (Doc. #17 ), is extended to June 10, 2019. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 6/6/19. (JAMA)
June 4, 2019 Filing 24 STIPULATION re: #18 MOTION to Amend/Correct Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File and Serve Amended Complaint re Defendant City of Kingman by Clifford Jolly. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order (proposed))(Felder, Lawrence)
June 3, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #18 MOTION to Amend/Correct Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File and Serve Amended Complaint re Defendant City of Kingman filed by Kingman, City of. (Jellison, James)
May 28, 2019 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by City of Kingman Police Department, Dennis Gilbert, Unknown Gilbert, Kingman, City of, Heath Mosby, Unknown Mosby. (Jellison, James)
May 28, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE to Motion re: #17 MOTION to Amend/Correct #15 Response to Motion Plainitff's Motion for Leave to File and Serve Amended Complaint re Oehler Defendants filed by Danial J Oehler. (McLaughlin, Jathan)
May 28, 2019 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss Party Danial J and Jane Doe Oehler filed by Danial J Oehler. (McLaughlin, Jathan)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED granting the Stipulated Motion to Extend Plaintiff's Deadline for Filing and Serving Response to Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #13 ) and the Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants City of Kingman, Kingman Police Department, Heath and Jane Doe Moseby and Dennis and Jane Doe Gilbert (Doc. #10 ). Plaintiff may have until May 20, 2019, to file a response to the Motions to Dismiss (Docs. #8 , #10 ). (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 5/21/19. (JAMA)
May 20, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Amend/Correct Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File and Serve Amended Complaint re Defendant City of Kingman by Clifford Jolly. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Felder, Lawrence)
May 20, 2019 Filing 17 * MOTION to Amend/Correct Plainitff's Motion for Leave to File and Serve Amended Complaint re Oehler Defendants by Clifford Jolly. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Felder, Lawrence) *Modified to remove document linkage on 5/21/2019 (GMP).
May 20, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Plaintiff's Response to Kingman Defendants Motion to Dismiss filed by Clifford Jolly. (Felder, Lawrence)
May 20, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re: #8 MOTION to Dismiss Party Danial J and Jane Doe Oehler Plaintiff's Response to Defendants Daniel and Jane Doe Oehler's Motion to Dismiss filed by Clifford Jolly. (Felder, Lawrence)
May 17, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Danial J Oehler. (McLaughlin, Jathan)
May 14, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #8 MOTION to Dismiss Party Danial J and Jane Doe Oehler Second Stipulated Motion to Extend Plaintiff's Deadline for Filing and Serving Response to Motion to Dismiss by Clifford Jolly. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Felder, Lawrence)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED granting the Stipulated Motion to Extend Plaintiff's Deadline for Filing and Serving Response to Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #11 ). Plaintiff may have until May 14, 2019, to file a response to Defendants Daniel J. and Jane Doe Oehler's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #8 ). (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 5/2/19. (JAMA)
May 1, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION Stipulated Motion to Extend Plaintiffs Deadline for Filing and Serving Response to Motion to Dismiss by Clifford Jolly. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilenchik, John)
April 30, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by City of Kingman Police Department, Dennis Gilbert, Unknown Gilbert, Kingman, City of, Heath Mosby, Unknown Mosby. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-C)(Jellison, James)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Stipulation of Dismissal: Defendants Mohave County, Mohave County Attorneys' Office, Ryan N. Dooley and Jane Doe Dooley, James Schoppmann and Jane Doe Schoppmann, and Amy Gardner and John Doe Gardner are dismissed without prejudice with the Parties bearing their own attorneys' fees and costs as to this dismissal only. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 4/22/19. (DXD)
April 17, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Party Danial J and Jane Doe Oehler by Danial J Oehler, Unknown Oehler. (McLaughlin, Jathan)
April 17, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Ryan N Dooley, Unknown Dooley, Amy Gardner, Unknown Gardner, Mohave County Attorney's Office, Mohave, County of, James Schoppmann, Unknown Schoppmann. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jellison, James)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting the Defendants' #5 Joint Motion to Extend the Time for Defendants to File an Answer or Other Response to Plaintiff's Complaint and extending Defendants' time to file an answer in response to the Complaint (Doc. ( #1 - #3 ) to May 2, 2019. No further extensions will be granted. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 4/4/19. (MSA)
April 1, 2019 Filing 5 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by City of Kingman Police Department, Ryan N Dooley, Unknown Dooley, Amy Gardner, Unknown Gardner, Dennis Gilbert, Unknown Gilbert, Kingman, City of, Mohave County Attorney's Office, Mohave, County of, Heath Mosby, Unknown Mosby, James Schoppmann, Unknown Schoppmann. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jellison, James)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that motions to dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (b) and motions to strike pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) are discouraged if the defect that would be the subject of the motion can be cured by filing an amended pleading. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order on Defendants. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 3/28/19. (JAMA)
March 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MCO)
March 26, 2019 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16700904. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John J Tuchi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-8088-PCT-JJT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MCO)
March 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Mohave County Superior Court, case number S8015CV201900164. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16700904 filed by Unknown Gardner, Unknown Dooley, Mohave, County of, Unknown Mosby, Ryan N Dooley, Mohave County Attorney's Office, Unknown Schoppmann, Heath Mosby, Dennis Gilbert, Unknown Gilbert, James Schoppmann, Kingman, City of, Amy Gardner, City of Kingman Police Department. (Jellison, James) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit, #4 Jury Demand)(MCO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jolly v. Mohave, County of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Oehler
Represented By: Donald Wilson, Jr.
Represented By: Jathan Paul McLaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Gilbert
Represented By: James M Jellison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohave, County of
Represented By: James M Jellison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Gardner
Represented By: James M Jellison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danial J Oehler
Represented By: Donald Wilson, Jr.
Represented By: Jathan Paul McLaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Kingman Police Department
Represented By: James M Jellison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heath Mosby
Represented By: James M Jellison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Gardner
Represented By: James M Jellison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Schoppmann
Represented By: James M Jellison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan N Dooley
Represented By: James M Jellison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Mosby
Represented By: James M Jellison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Gilbert
Represented By: James M Jellison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingman, City of
Represented By: James M Jellison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Dooley
Represented By: James M Jellison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohave County Attorney's Office
Represented By: James M Jellison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Schoppmann
Represented By: James M Jellison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford Jolly
Represented By: Lawrence James Felder
Represented By: Dennis Ira Wilenchik
Represented By: John Douglas Wilenchik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?