Serlin v. Xanterra Parks & Resorts Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Todd Serlin
Defendant: Unknown Parties and Xanterra Parks & Resorts Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2019cv08090
Filed: March 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE AND ORDER FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: A Settlement Conference is set for 9/23/2019 at 01:15 PM in Courtroom 304, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine. A Telephonic Status Conference is set for 8/26/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine. See attachment for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine on 6/21/19. (CLB)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER referring this matter to United States Magistrate Judge Deborah M. Fine for a settlement conference. Counsel are directed to jointly contact the chambers of Judge Fine no later than ten (10) days from the date of this order to schedule a settlement conference to be held on or before October 11, 2019. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 6/4/2019. (See Order for details.) (LFIG)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 10/11/2019. Dispositive motions due by 4/10/2020. ORDERED vacating the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 6/18/2019. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 6/4/2019. (See Order for a details.) (LFIG)
June 5, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #12 Notice of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery filed by Todd Serlin, #13 Rule 26(f) Report re MIDP filed by Todd Serlin. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (EJA)
June 4, 2019 Filing 13 Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Todd Serlin. (Pantiliat, Eddie)
May 8, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) Requests filed by Plaintiff Todd Serlin. (Pantiliat, Eddie)
May 7, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE re: Service of Initial Disclosures Under MIDP Program by Xanterra Parks & Resorts Incorporated . (Bradford, Aaron)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER setting a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 6/18/2019 at 4:00 PM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Diane J Humetewa. ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this order upon any Defendant that has not been served and file notice of service. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 4/4/2019. (See Order for details.) (LFIG)
April 4, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #8 Answer to Complaint filed by Xanterra Parks & Resorts Incorporated. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (GMP)
April 3, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Xanterra Parks & Resorts Incorporated.(Bradford, Aaron)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. ORDERED that Plaintiff serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) who have not yet appeared and file a notice of service. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 4/1/2019. (LFIG)
March 29, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Xanterra Parks & Resorts Incorporated. (Bradford, Aaron)
March 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by Xanterra Parks & Resorts Incorporated. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KEP)
March 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Xanterra Parks & Resorts Incorporated. (KEP)
March 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (KEP)
March 28, 2019 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16713306. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J. Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-8090-PCT-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KEP)
March 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Coconino County Superior Court, case number S0300CV201900114. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16713306 filed by Xanterra Parks & Resorts Incorporated. (Bradford, Aaron) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Affidavit of L. Long, #4 Exhibit Complaint, #5 Exhibit Docket Sheet, #6 Exhibit Demand for Jury Trial, #7 Exhibit Certificate, #8 Exhibit Summons, #9 Exhibit Waiver)(KEP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Serlin v. Xanterra Parks & Resorts Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xanterra Parks & Resorts Incorporated
Represented By: Aaron P Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Serlin
Represented By: Lori Nadine Brown
Represented By: Eddie A Pantiliat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?