Matthes v. Cascades Holding US Incorporated
Plaintiff: Vicky Matthes
Defendant: Cascades Holding US Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2019cv08094
Filed: April 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Dominic W Lanza
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2617
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: The Court having received notice that this case has settled (Doc. #10 ), IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall, without further notice, DISMISS this entire case on August 12, 2019, with prejudice, and shall enter judgment accordingly, unless prior thereto a party files a request for reinstatement on the Court's trial calendar. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED vacating any pending hearings and denying any pending motions as moot. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 6/21/19. (MAW)
June 12, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Settlement by Vicky Matthes. (Mazaheri, Bernard)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED granting the parties' stipulation (Doc. #8 ) and granting Defendant Cascades Holding US Incorporated a one-time extension of time until May 14, 2019 to respond to complaint. The parties' obligations to produce the information called for in the MIDP will be triggered by Defendant's answer to the complaint after the extension. No further extensions will be granted. Ordered by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 4/24/19. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW)
April 23, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Cascades Holding US Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Rayna)
April 3, 2019 Filing 7 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Vicky Matthes: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint & MIDP upon CT Corporation (Registered Agent) on April 2, 2019. (Mazaheri, Bernard)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRELIMINARY ORDER: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED: 1. That Plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this Order and its Attachments on Defendant(s) and file notice of service with the Clerk of Court; 2. That, unless the Court orders otherwise, on July 2, 2019, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure; 3. That, unless the Court orders otherwise, the parties shall file with the Clerk of Court a notice of service of MIDP Responses, supplemental MIDP Responses, and production of ESI, rather than copies of the actual disclosures [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 4/1/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice - MIDP, #2 MIDP User Manual)(MAW)
April 1, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Cascades Holding US Incorporated. (KEP). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
April 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (KEP)
April 1, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16727042. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Dominic W. Lanza. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-8094-PCT-DWL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KEP)
April 1, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Vicky Matthes. (Mazaheri, Bernard) (KEP)
April 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16727042 filed by Vicky Matthes. (Mazaheri, Bernard) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KEP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Matthes v. Cascades Holding US Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicky Matthes
Represented By: Bernard R Mazaheri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cascades Holding US Incorporated
Represented By: Rayna Habel Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?