Argyros v. Antelope Point Holdings LLC et al
Plaintiff: George Argyros, Jr.
Defendant: Unknown Parties and Antelope Point Holdings LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv08109
Filed: April 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Property Damage Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE re: Non-Parties At Fault by Antelope Point Holdings LLC . (Guerrieri, Felice)
July 8, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by George Argyros, Jr. (Tokar, Paul)
July 8, 2019 Filing 40 AFFIDAVIT of Brian Olds Service of Subpoena on Golden Gate Petroleum by Defendant Antelope Point Holdings LLC. (Guerrieri, Felice)
July 8, 2019 Filing 39 AFFIDAVIT of Nancy Gotay Service of Subpoena on Intertek Testing Services by Defendant Antelope Point Holdings LLC. (Guerrieri, Felice)
July 8, 2019 Filing 38 AFFIDAVIT of Henry Flores Service of Subpoena on Intertek Testing Services by Defendant Antelope Point Holdings LLC. (Guerrieri, Felice)
July 8, 2019 Filing 37 AFFIDAVIT of Antonio Roque Service of Subpoena on Jacksons Energy by Defendant Antelope Point Holdings LLC. (Guerrieri, Felice)
July 8, 2019 Filing 36 AFFIDAVIT of Michael Cryan Service of Subpoena on Diamond Trucking by Defendant Antelope Point Holdings LLC. (Guerrieri, Felice)
July 8, 2019 Filing 35 AFFIDAVIT of Bill Bilyk Service of Subpoena on Hallum, Inc. by Defendant Antelope Point Holdings LLC. (Guerrieri, Felice)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 12/20/2019. Dispositive motions due by 5/29/2020. ORDERED vacating the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 7/11/2019. ORDERED denying as moot the #29 , #31 , Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 7/2/2019. (See Order for details.) (LFIG)
July 2, 2019 Filing 33 Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) Amended Joint Case Management Report filed by Plaintiff George Argyros, Jr. (Tokar, Paul)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER: The Court is in receipt of the parties' #30 Joint Case Management Report. As many of the proposed dates contained therein have already passed, the parties shall resubmit page 9 of their report with the dates they are proposing by July 3, 2019. ORDERED by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 7/2/2019. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LFIG)
July 2, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION Motion To Appear Telephonically At Scheduling Conference by George Argyros, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tokar, Paul)
July 2, 2019 Filing 30 Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) Joint Case Management Report filed by Plaintiff George Argyros, Jr. (Tokar, Paul)
July 1, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonic at Scheduling Conference by Antelope Point Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Guerrieri, Felice)
June 19, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) First filed by Defendant Antelope Point Holdings LLC. (Guerrieri, Felice)
June 12, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Antelope Point Holdings LLC. (Guerrieri, Felice)
June 11, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE re: Non-Party At Fault by Antelope Point Holdings LLC . (Guerrieri, Felice)
June 11, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Antelope Point Holdings LLC. (Guerrieri, Felice)
June 10, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff George Argyros, Jr. (Tokar, Paul)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Motion to Substitute Attorney. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED withdrawing Shanks Leonhardt of the law firm Sanders & Parks, P.C. as counsel of record for Plaintiff. The Clerk of the Court is kindly instructed to terminate Shanks Leonhardt of the law firm Sanders & Parks, P.C. as counsel of record. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED substituting Jesse Showalter of the law firm Robbins & Curtin, PLLC as counsel of record for Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 5/24/19. (CLB)
May 23, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by George Argyros, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Leonhardt, Shanks)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER denying without prejudice the #20 Motion to Substitute Counsel for Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 5/22/2019. (LFIG)
May 22, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by George Argyros, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Leonhardt, Shanks)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying without prejudice the #18 Motion to Substitute Counsel for Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 5/21/2019. (LFIG)
May 20, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by George Argyros, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Leonhardt, Shanks)
May 17, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE re: Substitution of Counsel for Plaintiff George Argyros, Jr. by George Argyros, Jr. (Leonhardt, Shanks)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Defendant having timely appeared and answered the Complaint, IT IS ORDERED granting the #14 Motion to Dismiss Application for Entry of Default. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED the #11 Application for Entry of Default is denied. ORDERED by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 5/14/2019. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LFIG)
May 13, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Paul Tokar on behalf of plaintiff. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
May 9, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Antelope Point Holdings LLC identifying Other Affiliate Jerry C Moyes Fam Trust for Antelope Point Holdings LLC. (Guerrieri, Felice) *Modified record on 5/10/2019 (DXD).
May 9, 2019 Filing 14 *MOTION to Dismiss Application re: #11 Application for Entry of Default by Defendant Antelope Point Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Guerrieri, Felice) *Modified to correct event on 5/10/2019 (DXD).
May 9, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Antelope Point Holdings LLC.(Guerrieri, Felice)
May 9, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Felice Franco Guerrieri on behalf of Antelope Point Holdings LLC. (Guerrieri, Felice)
May 8, 2019 Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for David P Beitchman on behalf of plaintiff. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
May 6, 2019 Filing 11 APPLICATION for Entry of Default by Plaintiff George Argyros, Jr against Defendant Antelope Point Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Leonhardt, Shanks)
May 6, 2019 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by George Argyros, Jr: Certificate of Service re: DKT 6 Court's Order dated April 16, 2019 upon Antelope Point Holdings, LLC on 4/16/2019. (Leonhardt, Shanks) *Modified text on 5/7/2019 (DXD).
May 1, 2019 Filing 9 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by George Argyros, Jr: Certificate of Service re: Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference upon Defendant Antelope Point Holdings on 4/19/2019. (Leonhardt, Shanks)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER setting a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 7/11/2019 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Diane J Humetewa. ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this order upon Defendant and file notice of service. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 4/17/2019. (See Order for details.) (LFIG)
April 16, 2019 Filing 7 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by George Argyros, Jr: Certificate of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon Antelope Point Holdings, LLC on 04/12/2019. (Leonhardt, Shanks)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. ORDERED that Plaintiff serve a copy of this Order upon Defendants and file a notice of service. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 4/11/2019. (LFIG)
April 11, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Antelope Point Holdings LLC. (DLC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
April 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (DLC)
April 11, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16773333. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-8109-PCT-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (DLC)
April 11, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by George Argyros, Jr. (Leonhardt, Shanks) (DLC)
April 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16773333 filed by George Argyros, Jr. (Leonhardt, Shanks) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Argyros v. Antelope Point Holdings LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antelope Point Holdings LLC
Represented By: Carl F Mariano
Represented By: Felice Franco Guerrieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Argyros, Jr.
Represented By: David P Beitchman
Represented By: Paul Tokar
Represented By: Shanks Leonhardt
Represented By: Jesse Morgan Showalter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?